EP3591622 - THREE-DIMENSIONAL SPACE MODE COLLECTION METHOD AND APPARATUS BASED ON ELECTROMAGNETIC WAVES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 19.06.2020 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.12.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 22.07.2020 [2020/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2020/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHEN, Shaowu c/o ZTE CORPORATION ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park, Nanshan District Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2020/02] | Representative(s) | Rosenberg, Muriel Sylvie, et al Ipsilon Le Centralis 63, avenue du Général Leclerc 92340 Bourg-la-Reine / FR | [2020/02] | Application number, filing date | 17898873.9 | 31.08.2017 | [2020/02] | WO2017CN99835 | Priority number, date | CN201710111948 | 28.02.2017 Original published format: CN201710111948 | [2020/02] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018157571 | Date: | 07.09.2018 | Language: | ZH | [2018/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3591622 | Date: | 08.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 07.09.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G06T19/00 | [2020/02] | CPC: |
G06T17/05 (EP,CN);
G06T19/006 (CN);
G01S13/89 (EP);
G01S13/72 (EP);
G01S7/412 (EP);
G06T2207/10028 (CN)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/02] | Title | German: | SAMMELVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG MIT DREIDIMENSIONALEM RAUMMODELL AUF BASIS ELEKTROMAGNETISCHER WELLEN | [2020/02] | English: | THREE-DIMENSIONAL SPACE MODE COLLECTION METHOD AND APPARATUS BASED ON ELECTROMAGNETIC WAVES | [2020/02] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE COLLECTE DE MODE D'ESPACE TRIDIMENSIONNEL SUR LA BASE D'ONDES ÉLECTROMAGNÉTIQUES | [2020/02] | Entry into regional phase | 25.09.2019 | Translation filed | 25.09.2019 | National basic fee paid | 25.09.2019 | Search fee paid | 25.09.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.09.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.09.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.09.2019 | Examination requested [2020/02] | 15.06.2020 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2020/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]CN103927008 (BEIJING ZHIGU RUITUO TECHNOLOGY SERVICES CO LTD) [A] 1-15; | [A]US2015092178 (DEBRUNNER CHRISTIAN H [US], et al)[A] 1-15; | [A]CN104504748 (INST REMOTE SENSING & DIGITAL EARTH CAS) [A] 1-15; | [A]CN106054156 (4TH MILITARY MEDICAL UNIV CHINESE PLA) [A] 1-15; | [A]CN106295076 (SHANGHAI RADIO EQUIPMENT INST) [A] 1-15 * [0006]-[0034] * |