EP3575968 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR SYNCHRONIZING ACTIVE TRANSACTION LISTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.12.2021 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.11.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.10.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2019/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEN, Jijun Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
SHANG, Bo Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
WANG, Wei Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2019/49] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2019/49] | Application number, filing date | 17898997.6 | 10.10.2017 | [2019/49] | WO2017CN105561 | Priority number, date | CN201710115023 | 28.02.2017 Original published format: CN201710115023 | [2019/49] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018157602 | Date: | 07.09.2018 | Language: | ZH | [2018/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3575968 | Date: | 04.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 07.09.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.03.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G06F16/23 | [2020/18] | CPC: |
G06F11/14 (EP);
G06F16/273 (US);
G06F16/2379 (US)
|
Former IPC [2019/49] | G06F11/14 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/49] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM SYNCHRONISIEREN VON AKTIVEN TRANSAKTIONSLISTEN | [2019/49] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR SYNCHRONIZING ACTIVE TRANSACTION LISTS | [2019/49] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE SYNCHRONISATION DE LISTES DE TRANSACTION ACTIVES | [2019/49] | Entry into regional phase | 29.08.2019 | Translation filed | 29.08.2019 | National basic fee paid | 29.08.2019 | Search fee paid | 29.08.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.08.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.08.2019 | Examination requested [2019/49] | 13.10.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.01.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.04.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US9280591 (KHARATISHVILI TENGIZ [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * column 3, line 20 - column 6, line 36 * * column 18, line 28 - column 20, line 17 * * column 27, line 27 - column 30, line 13 *; | [Y] - PAT HELLAND ET AL, Group commit timers and high volume transaction systems, HIGH PERFORMANCE TRANSACTION SYSTEMS, SPRINGER BERLIN HEIDELBERG, BERLIN, HEIDELBERG, PAGE(S) 301 - 329, (19870928), ISBN 978-3-540-51085-7, XP019179142 [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * page 1 * |