EP3425532 - INFORMATION MINING METHOD AND SYSTEM, ELECTRONIC DEVICE AND READABLE STORAGE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 16.07.2021 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.07.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.12.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.11.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 17.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.07.2021 | Refusal of application | published on 18.08.2021 [2021/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ping An Technology (Shenzhen) Co., Ltd. Ping An Building No. 3 Bagua Road Bagualing Futian District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518000 / CN | [2019/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JIN, Ge 23F, Ping'an financial Center No. 5033 Yitian Road Fu'an community of Futian Street Futian District, Shenzhen City Guangdong Province / CN | 02 /
XU, Liang 23F, Ping'an financial Center No. 5033 Yitian Road Fu'an community of Futian Street Futian District, Shenzhen City Guangdong Province / CN | 03 /
XIAO, Jing 23F, Ping'an financial Center No. 5033 Yitian Road Fu'an community of Futian Street Futian District, Shenzhen City Guangdong Province / CN | [2019/09] |
Former [2019/02] | 01 /
JIN, Ge Wu Dongqin Ping An Building No. 3 Bagua Road Bagualing, Futian District Shenzhen Guangdong 518000 / CN | ||
02 /
XU, Liang Wu Dongqin Ping An Building No. 3 Bagua Road Bagualing, Futian District Shenzhen Guangdong 518000 / CN | |||
03 /
XIAO, Jing Wu Dongqin Ping An Building No. 3 Bagua Road Bagualing, Futian District Shenzhen Guangdong 518000 / CN | Representative(s) | de Arpe Fernandez, Manuel Arpe Patentes y Marcas Edificio Aqua, Calle Agustín de Foxá 4-10 28036 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2019/02] | Inal, Aysegul Seda Yalciner Patent and Consulting Ltd. Tunus Cad. 85/4 06680 Kavaklidere, Ankara / TR | Application number, filing date | 17899234.3 | 30.06.2017 | [2019/02] | WO2017CN91360 | Priority number, date | CN201710313993 | 05.05.2017 Original published format: CN201710313993 | [2019/02] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018201600 | Date: | 08.11.2018 | Language: | ZH | [2018/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3425532 | Date: | 09.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 08.11.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.01.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/27, G06F16/34 | [2019/07] | CPC: |
G06F16/3344 (EP,CN,KR);
G06F16/374 (EP,CN,KR);
G06F16/2465 (US);
G06F16/2246 (US);
G06F16/24522 (US);
G06F16/345 (KR);
G06F16/90344 (EP,CN,KR);
G06F16/951 (KR);
G06F40/289 (US);
G06F40/30 (EP,CN,KR)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2019/02] | G06F17/30, G06F17/27 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/02] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR INFORMATIONSGEWINNUNG, ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG UND LESBARES SPEICHERMEDIUM | [2019/02] | English: | INFORMATION MINING METHOD AND SYSTEM, ELECTRONIC DEVICE AND READABLE STORAGE MEDIUM | [2019/02] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ D'EXTRACTION D'INFORMATIONS, DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE ET SUPPORT DE STOCKAGE LISIBLE | [2019/02] | Entry into regional phase | 14.09.2018 | Translation filed | 14.09.2018 | National basic fee paid | 14.09.2018 | Search fee paid | 14.09.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.09.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.09.2018 | Examination requested [2019/02] | 02.03.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.03.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 31.07.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.10.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.03.2021 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 24.03.2021 | 24.03.2021 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 01.04.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2021/33] | 11.04.2021 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2021/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US7315861 (SEIBEL JOHN C [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * column 2, line 1 - line 14 * * column 2, line 42 - column 5, line 54 ** column 9, line 1 - line 50 * | International search | [A]US8577924 (PEOPLES BRUCE E [US], et al) [A] 1-20* , entire document *; | [A]CN103678564 (NAT COMP NETWORK & INF SECURITY MAN CT, et al) [A] 1-20 * , entire document *; | [Y]CN102915299B (HISENSE GROUP CO LTD) [Y] 2, 7, 12, 17 * , claims *; | [XY]CN105224640 (HANGZHOU LANGHE TECHNOLOGY LTD) [X] 1, 3, 6, 8, 11, 13, 16, 18 * , description, paragraphs [0046]-[0064], and figures 3-4, description, paragraphs [0046]-[0064], and figures 3-4 * [Y] 2, 7, 12, 17; | [X]CN106202285 (BEIJING BAIDU NETCOM SCI & TEC) [X] 1, 3, 6, 8, 11, 13, 16, 18 * , description, paragraphs [0089]-[0097], and figures 5-6 * |