EP3499255 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR PROCESSING BATTERY CELL VOLTAGE DATA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.02.2024 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.03.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.11.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.11.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.05.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Energy Solution, Ltd. Tower 1, 108, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07335 / KR | [2022/13] |
Former [2022/03] | For all designated states LG Energy Solution Ltd. Tower 1, 108 Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu 07335 Seoul / KR | ||
Former [2019/25] | For all designated states LG Chem, Ltd. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PARK, Jun Cheol LG Chem Research Park 188 Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 02 /
LEE, Keunwook LG Chem Research Park 188 Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | [2019/25] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2019/25] | Application number, filing date | 17899307.7 | 28.11.2017 | [2019/25] | WO2017KR13668 | Priority number, date | KR20170028250 | 06.03.2017 Original published format: KR 20170028250 | [2019/25] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018164346 | Date: | 13.09.2018 | Language: | KO | [2018/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3499255 | Date: | 19.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3499255 | Date: | 19.04.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 13.09.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.06.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G01R31/36, B60L58/16, G01R31/3842, G01R31/392, B60L58/12, B60L50/50 | [2019/30] | CPC: |
B60L58/12 (EP,US);
G01R31/3648 (KR);
B60L50/64 (EP,US);
B60L58/10 (KR);
B60L58/16 (EP,US);
G01R19/003 (EP);
G01R31/36 (US);
G01R31/3835 (EP,US);
G01R31/3842 (US);
G01R31/385 (US);
G01R31/392 (US);
G01R31/396 (EP,KR);
|
Former IPC [2019/25] | G01R31/36, B60L11/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/25] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERARBEITUNG VON BATTERIEZELLENSPANNUNGSDATEN | [2019/25] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR PROCESSING BATTERY CELL VOLTAGE DATA | [2019/25] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ PERMETTANT DE TRAITER DES DONNÉES DE TENSION DE CELLULE DE BATTERIE | [2019/25] | Entry into regional phase | 14.03.2019 | Translation filed | 14.03.2019 | National basic fee paid | 14.03.2019 | Search fee paid | 14.03.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.03.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.03.2019 | Examination requested [2019/25] | 08.01.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.11.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.03.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.03.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 06.03.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.03.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 22.01.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 19.04.2023 | AT | 19.04.2023 | CZ | 19.04.2023 | DK | 19.04.2023 | EE | 19.04.2023 | ES | 19.04.2023 | FI | 19.04.2023 | HR | 19.04.2023 | IT | 19.04.2023 | LT | 19.04.2023 | LV | 19.04.2023 | MC | 19.04.2023 | NL | 19.04.2023 | PL | 19.04.2023 | RO | 19.04.2023 | RS | 19.04.2023 | SE | 19.04.2023 | SI | 19.04.2023 | SK | 19.04.2023 | SM | 19.04.2023 | NO | 19.07.2023 | GR | 20.07.2023 | IS | 19.08.2023 | PT | 21.08.2023 | [2024/32] |
Former [2024/26] | AL | 19.04.2023 | |
AT | 19.04.2023 | ||
CZ | 19.04.2023 | ||
DK | 19.04.2023 | ||
EE | 19.04.2023 | ||
ES | 19.04.2023 | ||
FI | 19.04.2023 | ||
HR | 19.04.2023 | ||
IT | 19.04.2023 | ||
LT | 19.04.2023 | ||
LV | 19.04.2023 | ||
NL | 19.04.2023 | ||
PL | 19.04.2023 | ||
RO | 19.04.2023 | ||
RS | 19.04.2023 | ||
SE | 19.04.2023 | ||
SI | 19.04.2023 | ||
SK | 19.04.2023 | ||
SM | 19.04.2023 | ||
NO | 19.07.2023 | ||
GR | 20.07.2023 | ||
IS | 19.08.2023 | ||
PT | 21.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/24] | AL | 19.04.2023 | |
AT | 19.04.2023 | ||
CZ | 19.04.2023 | ||
DK | 19.04.2023 | ||
EE | 19.04.2023 | ||
ES | 19.04.2023 | ||
FI | 19.04.2023 | ||
HR | 19.04.2023 | ||
LT | 19.04.2023 | ||
LV | 19.04.2023 | ||
NL | 19.04.2023 | ||
PL | 19.04.2023 | ||
RO | 19.04.2023 | ||
RS | 19.04.2023 | ||
SE | 19.04.2023 | ||
SI | 19.04.2023 | ||
SK | 19.04.2023 | ||
SM | 19.04.2023 | ||
NO | 19.07.2023 | ||
GR | 20.07.2023 | ||
IS | 19.08.2023 | ||
PT | 21.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AL | 19.04.2023 | |
AT | 19.04.2023 | ||
CZ | 19.04.2023 | ||
DK | 19.04.2023 | ||
EE | 19.04.2023 | ||
ES | 19.04.2023 | ||
FI | 19.04.2023 | ||
HR | 19.04.2023 | ||
LT | 19.04.2023 | ||
LV | 19.04.2023 | ||
NL | 19.04.2023 | ||
PL | 19.04.2023 | ||
RO | 19.04.2023 | ||
RS | 19.04.2023 | ||
SE | 19.04.2023 | ||
SK | 19.04.2023 | ||
SM | 19.04.2023 | ||
NO | 19.07.2023 | ||
GR | 20.07.2023 | ||
IS | 19.08.2023 | ||
PT | 21.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AL | 19.04.2023 | |
AT | 19.04.2023 | ||
ES | 19.04.2023 | ||
FI | 19.04.2023 | ||
HR | 19.04.2023 | ||
LT | 19.04.2023 | ||
LV | 19.04.2023 | ||
NL | 19.04.2023 | ||
PL | 19.04.2023 | ||
RS | 19.04.2023 | ||
SE | 19.04.2023 | ||
SK | 19.04.2023 | ||
SM | 19.04.2023 | ||
NO | 19.07.2023 | ||
GR | 20.07.2023 | ||
IS | 19.08.2023 | ||
PT | 21.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | AL | 19.04.2023 | |
AT | 19.04.2023 | ||
ES | 19.04.2023 | ||
FI | 19.04.2023 | ||
HR | 19.04.2023 | ||
LT | 19.04.2023 | ||
LV | 19.04.2023 | ||
NL | 19.04.2023 | ||
PL | 19.04.2023 | ||
RS | 19.04.2023 | ||
SE | 19.04.2023 | ||
NO | 19.07.2023 | ||
GR | 20.07.2023 | ||
IS | 19.08.2023 | ||
PT | 21.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | AL | 19.04.2023 | |
AT | 19.04.2023 | ||
ES | 19.04.2023 | ||
HR | 19.04.2023 | ||
LT | 19.04.2023 | ||
LV | 19.04.2023 | ||
NL | 19.04.2023 | ||
PL | 19.04.2023 | ||
RS | 19.04.2023 | ||
SE | 19.04.2023 | ||
NO | 19.07.2023 | ||
GR | 20.07.2023 | ||
IS | 19.08.2023 | ||
PT | 21.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AL | 19.04.2023 | |
AT | 19.04.2023 | ||
ES | 19.04.2023 | ||
HR | 19.04.2023 | ||
NL | 19.04.2023 | ||
PL | 19.04.2023 | ||
RS | 19.04.2023 | ||
SE | 19.04.2023 | ||
NO | 19.07.2023 | ||
GR | 20.07.2023 | ||
IS | 19.08.2023 | ||
PT | 21.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AL | 19.04.2023 | |
AT | 19.04.2023 | ||
ES | 19.04.2023 | ||
NL | 19.04.2023 | ||
PL | 19.04.2023 | ||
SE | 19.04.2023 | ||
NO | 19.07.2023 | ||
GR | 20.07.2023 | ||
IS | 19.08.2023 | ||
PT | 21.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 19.04.2023 | |
ES | 19.04.2023 | ||
NL | 19.04.2023 | ||
SE | 19.04.2023 | ||
NO | 19.07.2023 | ||
PT | 21.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 19.04.2023 | |
NL | 19.04.2023 | ||
PT | 21.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/43] | NL | 19.04.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6359419 (VERBRUGGE MARK WILLIAM [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * column 3, line 23 - column 10, line 64 ** figures 1-4 *; | [I]KR20110111018 (SK INNOVATION CO LTD [KR]) [I] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [XI]US2014052396 (JIN SHAN SHAN [KR], et al) [X] 1,3,5,7 * abstract * * paragraphs [0009] - [0021] - [0 30] - [0077] * * figures 1-7 * [I] 2,4,6,8; | [A]KR20140094486 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A]KR101529515B (AGENCY DEFENSE DEV [KR]) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | KR101529515B [ ] (AGENCY DEFENSE DEV [KR]) | International search | [A]JPH05265072 (ASAHI OPTICAL CO., LTD.) [A] 1-8 * See claims 1, 2 and figure 1. *; | [Y]KR20110111018 (SK INNOVATION CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 1-8 * See claims 1, 4. *; | [A]KR20140094486 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) [A] 1-8 * See claims 1-6 and figure 2. *; | [Y]KR101529515B (AGENCY DEFENSE DEV [KR]) [Y] 1-8 * See paragraph [21], claim 1 and figures 1, 2. *; | [A]KR20160072410 (HYUNDAI AUTRON CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-8* See claims 1-16 and figure 1. * |