EP3572806 - ULTRASONIC FLAW DETECTION DEVICE AND ULTRASONIC FLAW DETECTION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.08.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.10.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.09.2021 [2021/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nippon Steel Corporation 6-1, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | [2019/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OGAWA, Takahisa c/o NIPPON STEEL CORPORATION 6-1 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | [2019/48] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2019/48] | Application number, filing date | 17899446.3 | 06.03.2017 | [2019/48] | WO2017JP08789 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018163248 | Date: | 13.09.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3572806 | Date: | 27.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 13.09.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.09.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G01N29/04, G01N29/22, G01N29/265, G01N29/27, G01N29/275, G01N29/28 | [2020/41] | CPC: |
G01N29/041 (EP,US);
G01N29/045 (KR);
G01N29/04 (EP);
G01N29/22 (EP);
G01N29/225 (EP,US);
G01N29/24 (KR);
G01N29/265 (EP,KR,US);
G01N29/27 (EP);
G01N29/275 (EP);
G01N29/28 (EP,US);
G01N2291/0234 (US);
G01N2291/028 (US);
G01N2291/0423 (EP);
G01N2291/045 (US);
G01N2291/101 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2019/48] | G01N29/04, G01N29/22, G01N29/265 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/48] | Title | German: | ULTRASCHALLFEHLERDETEKTIONSVORRICHTUNG UND ULTRASCHALLFEHLERDETEKTIONSVERFAHREN | [2019/48] | English: | ULTRASONIC FLAW DETECTION DEVICE AND ULTRASONIC FLAW DETECTION METHOD | [2019/48] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE DÉTECTION DE DÉFAUTS PAR ULTRASONS ET PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTECTION DE DÉFAUTS PAR ULTRASONS | [2019/48] | Entry into regional phase | 21.08.2019 | Translation filed | 21.08.2019 | National basic fee paid | 21.08.2019 | Search fee paid | 21.08.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.08.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.08.2019 | Examination requested [2019/48] | 10.04.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/39] | 04.05.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2021 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]JP2011027571 (BABCOCK HITACHI KK) [X] 1-13 * the whole document * [I] 14-16 | International search | [Y]JP2004003996 (OSAKA GAS CO LTD) [Y] 1, 4, 6-9, 12, 14-16 * , paragraphs [0044] to [0045], [0062] to [0063], [0081]; fig. 1 (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2005156333 (NISSHIN KOGYO KK) [Y] 1-16 * , paragraph [0014]; fig. 1, 5(a) (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2000180426 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [Y] 1-16 * , paragraphs [0003] to [0005]; fig. 10 to 11 (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2004301613 (IDEMITSU ENG KK, et al) [A] 1-16 * , paragraph [0015]; fig. 6 (Family: none) *; | [A]JPS63167254U (Daido Steel Co., Ltd.) [A] 1-16 * , (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2015219020 (MINATSU LTD) [A] 1-16 * , & JP 5647746 B1 *; | [A]JP2013124919 (KOBE STEEL LTD) [A] 1-16 * , (Family: none) *; | [A]WO2010011140 (TNO [NL], et al) [A] 1- 16 * , & JP 2011-529182 A & US 2011/0191035 A1 & EP 2304422 A1 & CA 2731796 A1 & CN 102105783 A & RU 2011106497 A * | by applicant | JP2004003996 | JP2013124919 |