EP3594742 - THIN FILM TRANSISTOR ARRAY SUBSTRATE, AND DISPLAY PANEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.12.2022 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.01.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.01.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.12.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.09.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.12.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shenzhen China Star Optoelectronics Technology Co., Ltd. No. 9-2 Tangming Rd. Guangming New District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518132 / CN | [2020/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AN, Liyang Tan Yu No.9-2 Tangming Rd. Guangming New District Shenzhen Guangdong 518132 / CN | [2020/03] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/03] | Murgitroyd & Company Murgitroyd House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 17899680.7 | 18.04.2017 | [2020/03] | WO2017CN80927 | Priority number, date | CN201710141466 | 10.03.2017 Original published format: CN201710141466 | [2020/03] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018161408 | Date: | 13.09.2018 | Language: | ZH | [2018/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3594742 | Date: | 15.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3594742 | Date: | 23.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 13.09.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/1345, G02F1/1362 | [2021/37] | CPC: |
G02F1/1345 (EP);
H01L27/124 (KR);
G02F1/13452 (CN,KR);
G02F1/136286 (EP,CN,KR);
G09G3/3648 (EP,KR);
G09G3/3666 (KR);
H01L29/786 (KR);
H10K59/131 (KR);
G09G2300/0426 (EP);
G09G2320/0223 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/46] | G02F1/1345, G02F1/1362, G09G3/20 | ||
Former IPC [2020/03] | G02F1/1345, G02F1/1362 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/03] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DÜNNSCHICHTTRANSISTORARRAY-SUBSTRAT UND ANZEIGETAFEL | [2020/03] | English: | THIN FILM TRANSISTOR ARRAY SUBSTRATE, AND DISPLAY PANEL | [2020/03] | French: | SUBSTRAT DE RÉSEAU DE TRANSISTORS À COUCHE MINCE ET PANNEAU D'AFFICHAGE | [2020/03] | Entry into regional phase | 03.10.2019 | Translation filed | 03.10.2019 | National basic fee paid | 03.10.2019 | Search fee paid | 03.10.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.10.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.10.2019 | Examination requested [2020/03] | 17.03.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.09.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.12.2021 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 11.01.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.01.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 18.01.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.01.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 24.11.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.04.2017 | AL | 23.02.2022 | AT | 23.02.2022 | CY | 23.02.2022 | CZ | 23.02.2022 | DK | 23.02.2022 | EE | 23.02.2022 | ES | 23.02.2022 | FI | 23.02.2022 | HR | 23.02.2022 | IT | 23.02.2022 | LT | 23.02.2022 | LV | 23.02.2022 | MC | 23.02.2022 | MK | 23.02.2022 | NL | 23.02.2022 | RO | 23.02.2022 | RS | 23.02.2022 | SE | 23.02.2022 | SI | 23.02.2022 | SK | 23.02.2022 | SM | 23.02.2022 | TR | 23.02.2022 | IE | 18.04.2022 | LU | 18.04.2022 | BE | 30.04.2022 | CH | 30.04.2022 | LI | 30.04.2022 | BG | 23.05.2022 | NO | 23.05.2022 | GR | 24.05.2022 | IS | 23.06.2022 | PT | 23.06.2022 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/24] | HU | 18.04.2017 | |
AL | 23.02.2022 | ||
AT | 23.02.2022 | ||
CY | 23.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2022 | ||
DK | 23.02.2022 | ||
EE | 23.02.2022 | ||
ES | 23.02.2022 | ||
FI | 23.02.2022 | ||
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
IT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LV | 23.02.2022 | ||
MC | 23.02.2022 | ||
MK | 23.02.2022 | ||
NL | 23.02.2022 | ||
RO | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SE | 23.02.2022 | ||
SI | 23.02.2022 | ||
SK | 23.02.2022 | ||
SM | 23.02.2022 | ||
IE | 18.04.2022 | ||
LU | 18.04.2022 | ||
BE | 30.04.2022 | ||
CH | 30.04.2022 | ||
LI | 30.04.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
GR | 24.05.2022 | ||
IS | 23.06.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AL | 23.02.2022 | |
AT | 23.02.2022 | ||
CY | 23.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2022 | ||
DK | 23.02.2022 | ||
EE | 23.02.2022 | ||
ES | 23.02.2022 | ||
FI | 23.02.2022 | ||
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
IT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LV | 23.02.2022 | ||
MC | 23.02.2022 | ||
MK | 23.02.2022 | ||
NL | 23.02.2022 | ||
RO | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SE | 23.02.2022 | ||
SI | 23.02.2022 | ||
SK | 23.02.2022 | ||
SM | 23.02.2022 | ||
IE | 18.04.2022 | ||
LU | 18.04.2022 | ||
BE | 30.04.2022 | ||
CH | 30.04.2022 | ||
LI | 30.04.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
GR | 24.05.2022 | ||
IS | 23.06.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AL | 23.02.2022 | |
AT | 23.02.2022 | ||
CY | 23.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2022 | ||
DK | 23.02.2022 | ||
EE | 23.02.2022 | ||
ES | 23.02.2022 | ||
FI | 23.02.2022 | ||
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
IT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LV | 23.02.2022 | ||
MC | 23.02.2022 | ||
NL | 23.02.2022 | ||
RO | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SE | 23.02.2022 | ||
SI | 23.02.2022 | ||
SK | 23.02.2022 | ||
SM | 23.02.2022 | ||
IE | 18.04.2022 | ||
LU | 18.04.2022 | ||
BE | 30.04.2022 | ||
CH | 30.04.2022 | ||
LI | 30.04.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
GR | 24.05.2022 | ||
IS | 23.06.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AL | 23.02.2022 | |
AT | 23.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2022 | ||
DK | 23.02.2022 | ||
EE | 23.02.2022 | ||
ES | 23.02.2022 | ||
FI | 23.02.2022 | ||
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
IT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LV | 23.02.2022 | ||
MC | 23.02.2022 | ||
NL | 23.02.2022 | ||
RO | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SE | 23.02.2022 | ||
SI | 23.02.2022 | ||
SK | 23.02.2022 | ||
SM | 23.02.2022 | ||
IE | 18.04.2022 | ||
LU | 18.04.2022 | ||
BE | 30.04.2022 | ||
CH | 30.04.2022 | ||
LI | 30.04.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
GR | 24.05.2022 | ||
IS | 23.06.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | AL | 23.02.2022 | |
AT | 23.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2022 | ||
DK | 23.02.2022 | ||
EE | 23.02.2022 | ||
ES | 23.02.2022 | ||
FI | 23.02.2022 | ||
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LV | 23.02.2022 | ||
MC | 23.02.2022 | ||
NL | 23.02.2022 | ||
RO | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SE | 23.02.2022 | ||
SI | 23.02.2022 | ||
SK | 23.02.2022 | ||
SM | 23.02.2022 | ||
IE | 18.04.2022 | ||
LU | 18.04.2022 | ||
BE | 30.04.2022 | ||
CH | 30.04.2022 | ||
LI | 30.04.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
GR | 24.05.2022 | ||
IS | 23.06.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 23.02.2022 | |
AT | 23.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2022 | ||
DK | 23.02.2022 | ||
EE | 23.02.2022 | ||
ES | 23.02.2022 | ||
FI | 23.02.2022 | ||
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LV | 23.02.2022 | ||
MC | 23.02.2022 | ||
NL | 23.02.2022 | ||
RO | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SE | 23.02.2022 | ||
SI | 23.02.2022 | ||
SK | 23.02.2022 | ||
SM | 23.02.2022 | ||
LU | 18.04.2022 | ||
BE | 30.04.2022 | ||
CH | 30.04.2022 | ||
LI | 30.04.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
GR | 24.05.2022 | ||
IS | 23.06.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AL | 23.02.2022 | |
AT | 23.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2022 | ||
DK | 23.02.2022 | ||
EE | 23.02.2022 | ||
ES | 23.02.2022 | ||
FI | 23.02.2022 | ||
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LV | 23.02.2022 | ||
MC | 23.02.2022 | ||
NL | 23.02.2022 | ||
RO | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SE | 23.02.2022 | ||
SK | 23.02.2022 | ||
SM | 23.02.2022 | ||
LU | 18.04.2022 | ||
CH | 30.04.2022 | ||
LI | 30.04.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
GR | 24.05.2022 | ||
IS | 23.06.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AL | 23.02.2022 | |
AT | 23.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2022 | ||
DK | 23.02.2022 | ||
EE | 23.02.2022 | ||
ES | 23.02.2022 | ||
FI | 23.02.2022 | ||
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LV | 23.02.2022 | ||
MC | 23.02.2022 | ||
NL | 23.02.2022 | ||
RO | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SE | 23.02.2022 | ||
SK | 23.02.2022 | ||
SM | 23.02.2022 | ||
LU | 18.04.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
GR | 24.05.2022 | ||
IS | 23.06.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/06] | AL | 23.02.2022 | |
AT | 23.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2022 | ||
DK | 23.02.2022 | ||
EE | 23.02.2022 | ||
ES | 23.02.2022 | ||
FI | 23.02.2022 | ||
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LV | 23.02.2022 | ||
MC | 23.02.2022 | ||
NL | 23.02.2022 | ||
RO | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SE | 23.02.2022 | ||
SK | 23.02.2022 | ||
SM | 23.02.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
GR | 24.05.2022 | ||
IS | 23.06.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 23.02.2022 | |
AT | 23.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2022 | ||
DK | 23.02.2022 | ||
EE | 23.02.2022 | ||
ES | 23.02.2022 | ||
FI | 23.02.2022 | ||
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LV | 23.02.2022 | ||
NL | 23.02.2022 | ||
RO | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SE | 23.02.2022 | ||
SK | 23.02.2022 | ||
SM | 23.02.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
GR | 24.05.2022 | ||
IS | 23.06.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 23.02.2022 | |
CZ | 23.02.2022 | ||
DK | 23.02.2022 | ||
EE | 23.02.2022 | ||
ES | 23.02.2022 | ||
FI | 23.02.2022 | ||
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LV | 23.02.2022 | ||
NL | 23.02.2022 | ||
RO | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SE | 23.02.2022 | ||
SK | 23.02.2022 | ||
SM | 23.02.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
GR | 24.05.2022 | ||
IS | 23.06.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AT | 23.02.2022 | |
CZ | 23.02.2022 | ||
DK | 23.02.2022 | ||
EE | 23.02.2022 | ||
ES | 23.02.2022 | ||
FI | 23.02.2022 | ||
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LV | 23.02.2022 | ||
NL | 23.02.2022 | ||
RO | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SE | 23.02.2022 | ||
SM | 23.02.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
GR | 24.05.2022 | ||
IS | 23.06.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 23.02.2022 | |
DK | 23.02.2022 | ||
ES | 23.02.2022 | ||
FI | 23.02.2022 | ||
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LV | 23.02.2022 | ||
NL | 23.02.2022 | ||
RO | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SE | 23.02.2022 | ||
SM | 23.02.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
GR | 24.05.2022 | ||
IS | 23.06.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/46] | AT | 23.02.2022 | |
DK | 23.02.2022 | ||
ES | 23.02.2022 | ||
FI | 23.02.2022 | ||
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LV | 23.02.2022 | ||
NL | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SE | 23.02.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
GR | 24.05.2022 | ||
IS | 23.06.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/42] | AT | 23.02.2022 | |
ES | 23.02.2022 | ||
FI | 23.02.2022 | ||
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LV | 23.02.2022 | ||
NL | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SE | 23.02.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
GR | 24.05.2022 | ||
IS | 23.06.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/39] | AT | 23.02.2022 | |
ES | 23.02.2022 | ||
FI | 23.02.2022 | ||
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LV | 23.02.2022 | ||
NL | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SE | 23.02.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
GR | 24.05.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AT | 23.02.2022 | |
ES | 23.02.2022 | ||
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LV | 23.02.2022 | ||
NL | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SE | 23.02.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
GR | 24.05.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | ES | 23.02.2022 | |
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
NL | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SE | 23.02.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | ES | 23.02.2022 | |
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
NL | 23.02.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | LT | 23.02.2022 | |
NO | 23.05.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2011096258 (SHIM SEOK HO [KR], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0092]; figures 1-5 *; | [A]US2012081410 (YEO DONG-HYUN [KR], et al) [A] 1-15* abstract *; | [A]EP3109852 (SAMSUNG DISPLAY CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0058]; figures 1-3 * | International search | [A]CN1885105 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-20; | [A]CN101738799 (BOE TECHNOLOGY GROUP CO LTD) [A] 1-20; | [A]CN103345095 (SHENZHEN HUAXING OPTOELECT TEC)[A] 1-20 |