EP3594633 - LASER BEAM IRRADIATION DETECTION DEVICE, LASER BEAM IRRADIATION DETECTION METHOD, AND LASER BEAM IRRADIATION DETECTION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.09.2024 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.10.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.06.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.09.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.12.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.10.2024 [2024/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JVCKenwood Corporation 3-12, Moriyacho Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 2210022 / JP | [2020/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YUFUNE Shuta c/o Intellectual Property Department JVCKENWOOD Corporation 3-12 Moriyacho Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 221-0022 / JP | 02 /
HIRATA Takuya c/o Intellectual Property Department JVCKENWOOD Corporation 3-12 Moriyacho Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 221-0022 / JP | 03 /
IGARASHI Takeshi c/o Intellectual Property Department JVCKENWOOD Corporation 3-12 Moriyacho Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 221-0022 / JP | [2023/46] |
Former [2020/03] | 01 /
YUFUNE Shuta c/o Intellectual Property Department JVC KENWOOD Corporation 3-12 Moriyacho Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 221-0022 / JP | ||
02 /
HIRATA Takuya c/o Intellectual Property Department JVC KENWOOD Corporation 3-12 Moriyacho Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 221-0022 / JP | |||
03 /
IGARASHI Takeshi c/o Intellectual Property Department JVC KENWOOD Corporation 3-12 Moriyacho Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 221-0022 / JP | Representative(s) | Emde, Eric Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [2020/03] | Application number, filing date | 17899963.7 | 05.10.2017 | [2020/03] | WO2017JP36300 | Priority number, date | JP20170041441 | 06.03.2017 Original published format: JP 2017041441 | [2020/03] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018163489 | Date: | 13.09.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3594633 | Date: | 15.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3594633 | Date: | 15.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 13.09.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G01D21/00, H01S3/00, G01S5/16, G01S3/784, B64D45/00 | [2020/12] | CPC: |
B64D45/0015 (EP);
H01S3/10023 (US);
B64D47/08 (EP,US);
G01N21/17 (US);
G01N21/63 (US);
G01S3/784 (EP);
G01S5/16 (EP);
H01S3/00 (EP);
H01S3/0007 (US);
|
Former IPC [2020/03] | G01D21/00, H01S3/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/03] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LASERSTRAHLBESTRAHLUNGSDETEKTIONSVORRICHTUNG, LASERSTRAHLBESTRAHLUNGSDETEKTIONSVERFAHREN UND LASERSTRAHLBESTRAHLUNGSDETEKTIONSSYSTEM | [2020/03] | English: | LASER BEAM IRRADIATION DETECTION DEVICE, LASER BEAM IRRADIATION DETECTION METHOD, AND LASER BEAM IRRADIATION DETECTION SYSTEM | [2020/03] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE DÉTECTION D'ÉMISSION DE FAISCEAU LASER, PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTECTION D'ÉMISSION DE FAISCEAU LASER ET SYSTÈME DE DÉTECTION D'ÉMISSION DE FAISCEAU LASER | [2020/03] | Entry into regional phase | 05.09.2019 | Translation filed | 05.09.2019 | National basic fee paid | 05.09.2019 | Search fee paid | 05.09.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.09.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.09.2019 | Examination requested [2020/03] | 05.08.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.09.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.01.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 09.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.10.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 19.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.11.2023 | CZ | 15.11.2023 | DK | 15.11.2023 | EE | 15.11.2023 | ES | 15.11.2023 | HR | 15.11.2023 | IT | 15.11.2023 | LT | 15.11.2023 | LV | 15.11.2023 | NL | 15.11.2023 | PL | 15.11.2023 | RO | 15.11.2023 | RS | 15.11.2023 | SE | 15.11.2023 | SK | 15.11.2023 | SM | 15.11.2023 | BG | 15.02.2024 | NO | 15.02.2024 | GR | 16.02.2024 | IS | 15.03.2024 | PT | 15.03.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 15.11.2023 | |
CZ | 15.11.2023 | ||
DK | 15.11.2023 | ||
EE | 15.11.2023 | ||
ES | 15.11.2023 | ||
HR | 15.11.2023 | ||
LT | 15.11.2023 | ||
LV | 15.11.2023 | ||
NL | 15.11.2023 | ||
PL | 15.11.2023 | ||
RO | 15.11.2023 | ||
RS | 15.11.2023 | ||
SE | 15.11.2023 | ||
SM | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
NO | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
PT | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | AT | 15.11.2023 | |
DK | 15.11.2023 | ||
EE | 15.11.2023 | ||
ES | 15.11.2023 | ||
HR | 15.11.2023 | ||
LT | 15.11.2023 | ||
LV | 15.11.2023 | ||
NL | 15.11.2023 | ||
PL | 15.11.2023 | ||
RS | 15.11.2023 | ||
SE | 15.11.2023 | ||
SM | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
NO | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
PT | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 15.11.2023 | |
DK | 15.11.2023 | ||
ES | 15.11.2023 | ||
HR | 15.11.2023 | ||
LT | 15.11.2023 | ||
LV | 15.11.2023 | ||
NL | 15.11.2023 | ||
PL | 15.11.2023 | ||
RS | 15.11.2023 | ||
SE | 15.11.2023 | ||
SM | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
NO | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
PT | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 15.11.2023 | |
ES | 15.11.2023 | ||
HR | 15.11.2023 | ||
LT | 15.11.2023 | ||
LV | 15.11.2023 | ||
NL | 15.11.2023 | ||
PL | 15.11.2023 | ||
RS | 15.11.2023 | ||
SE | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
NO | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
PT | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 15.11.2023 | |
ES | 15.11.2023 | ||
HR | 15.11.2023 | ||
LT | 15.11.2023 | ||
NL | 15.11.2023 | ||
PL | 15.11.2023 | ||
RS | 15.11.2023 | ||
SE | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
NO | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
PT | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | AT | 15.11.2023 | |
ES | 15.11.2023 | ||
HR | 15.11.2023 | ||
LT | 15.11.2023 | ||
NL | 15.11.2023 | ||
RS | 15.11.2023 | ||
SE | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
NO | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
PT | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 15.11.2023 | |
ES | 15.11.2023 | ||
LT | 15.11.2023 | ||
NL | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
PT | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 15.11.2023 | |
LT | 15.11.2023 | ||
NL | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 15.11.2023 | |
NL | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 16.02.2024 | |
IS | 15.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2014192367 (JUNGWIRTH DOUGLAS R [US]); | [Y]DE102015009353 (DIEHL BGT DEFENCE GMBH & CO KG [DE]) | International search | [A]JP2000101177 (KOMATSU MFG CO LTD); | [A]JP2011165732 (RENESAS ELECTRONICS CORP) | by applicant | JP2004054105 | JP2017041441 |