EP3584767 - DEPTH-BASED IMAGE PROCESSING METHOD, PROCESSING DEVICE AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.11.2021 Database last updated on 26.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.11.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP., LTD. No. 18 Haibin Road Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan Guangdong 523860 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2019/52] | For all designated states GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP., LTD. No. 18 Haibin Road Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan Guangdong 523860 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUN, Jianbo No. 18 Haibin Road Wusha Chang'an Dongguan Guangdong 523860 / CN | [2019/52] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | [2019/52] | Application number, filing date | 17900180.5 | 09.03.2017 | [2019/52] | WO2017CN76201 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018161322 | Date: | 13.09.2018 | Language: | ZH | [2018/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3584767 | Date: | 25.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 13.09.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.12.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G06T17/00, G06T7/11, G06T7/194, G06T7/593 | [2020/01] | CPC: |
G06T7/11 (EP,US);
G06T17/00 (EP);
G06T7/194 (EP);
G06T7/593 (EP);
H04N5/144 (US);
H04N5/2226 (US);
|
Former IPC [2019/52] | G06T17/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/52] | Title | German: | TIEFENBASIERTES BILDVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN, VERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG | [2019/52] | English: | DEPTH-BASED IMAGE PROCESSING METHOD, PROCESSING DEVICE AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE | [2019/52] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'IMAGE BASÉ SUR LA PROFONDEUR, DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT ET DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE | [2019/52] | Entry into regional phase | 18.09.2019 | Translation filed | 18.09.2019 | National basic fee paid | 18.09.2019 | Search fee paid | 18.09.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.09.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.09.2019 | Examination requested [2019/52] | 05.06.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.11.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.02.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.07.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2024 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2011293180 (CRIMINISI ANTONIO [GB], et al) [X] 1-3,7-10,14,15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0036] - [0044] * * paragraphs [0053] - [0069] * [I] 4-6,11-13; | [X]CN105791796 (LENOVO BEIJING CO LTD) [X] 1-3,7-11,14,15 * abstract *; | [X]CN105160650B (NANJING IMI SOFTWARE TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [X] 1-3,7-11,14,15 * abstract *; | [X] - CAMPLANI MASSIMO ET AL, "Background foreground segmentation with RGB-D Kinect data: An efficient combination of classifiers", JOURNAL OF VISUAL COMMUNICATION AND IMAGE REPRESENTATION, ACADEMIC PRESS, INC, US, (20130327), vol. 25, no. 1, doi:10.1016/J.JVCIR.2013.03.009, ISSN 1047-3203, pages 122 - 136, XP028804219 [X] 1-3,7-11,14,15 * abstract * * page 124, column l, lines 10-57 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jvcir.2013.03.009 | [X] - CRABB R ET AL, "Real-time foreground segmentation via range and color imaging", COMPUTER VISION AND PATTERN RECOGNITION WORKSHOPS, 2008. CVPR WORKSHOPS 2008. IEEE COMPUTER SOCIETY CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20080623), ISBN 978-1-4244-2339-2, pages 1 - 5, XP031285726 [X] 1-3,7-11,14,15 * abstract * * page 2, column r, lines 8-35 * | [X] - JOS?-JUAN HERN?NDEZ-L?PEZ ET AL, "Detecting objects using color and depth segmentation with Kinect sensor", PROCEDIA TECHNOLOGY, NL, (20120101), vol. 3, doi:10.1016/j.protcy.2012.03.021, ISSN 2212-0173, pages 196 - 204, XP055307680 [X] 1-3,7-11,14,15 * abstract * * page 197, lines 1-15 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.protcy.2012.03.021 | [I] - CLEMENS HOLZMANN ET AL, "Measuring Distance with Mobile Phones Using Single-Camera Stereo Vision", 32ND IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON DISTRIBUTED COMPUTING SYSTEMS WORKSHOPS, ICDCSW 2012, IEEE, (20120618), doi:10.1109/ICDCSW.2012.22, ISBN 978-1-4673-1423-7, pages 88 - 93, XP032217932 [I] 4-6,11-13 * abstract * * page 88, column l, line 1 - column r, line 28 * * page 90, column r, line 23 - page 91, column l, line 7 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICDCSW.2012.22 | [I] - KU J S ET AL, "Multi-image matching for a general motion stereo camera model", PATTERN RECOGNITION, ELSEVIER, GB, (20010901), vol. 34, no. 9, doi:10.1016/S0031-3203(00)00110-2, ISSN 0031-3203, pages 1701 - 1712, XP004362596 [I] 4-6,11-13 * abstract * * page 1701, column l, line 1 - column r, line 16 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0031-3203(00)00110-2 | International search | [A]EP2570962 (AXIS AB [SE]) [A] 1-20* , entire document *; | [A]CN104519259 (LENOVO BEIJING CO LTD) [A] 1-20 * , entire document *; | [X]CN105791796 (LENOVO BEIJING CO LTD) [X] 1-20 * , claims 1-10, and description, paragraphs [0013]-[0037] * |