EP3585106 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PROCESSING SERVICE SET IDENTIFIER, AND TERMINAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 25.09.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.11.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 28.10.2020 [2020/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2019/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DING, Ji Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
LU, Junxin Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2019/52] | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | [2019/52] | Application number, filing date | 17900446.0 | 22.06.2017 | [2019/52] | WO2017CN89533 | Priority number, date | CN201710147083 | 13.03.2017 Original published format: CN201710147083 | [2019/52] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018166093 | Date: | 20.09.2018 | Language: | ZH | [2018/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3585106 | Date: | 25.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 20.09.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04W48/16 | [2019/52] | CPC: |
H04W48/16 (EP,US);
H04L61/4541 (US);
H04L61/301 (US);
H04W48/10 (US);
H04W76/11 (US);
H04L2101/32 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/52] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR VERARBEITUNG EINES DIENSTSATZIDENTIFIKATORS UND ENDGERÄT | [2019/52] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PROCESSING SERVICE SET IDENTIFIER, AND TERMINAL | [2019/52] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DESTINÉS AU TRAITEMENT D'IDENTIFIANT D'ENSEMBLE DE SERVICES ET TERMINAL | [2019/52] | Entry into regional phase | 18.09.2019 | Translation filed | 18.09.2019 | National basic fee paid | 18.09.2019 | Search fee paid | 18.09.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.09.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.09.2019 | Examination requested [2019/52] | 30.04.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.09.2020 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2020/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2013201980 (RAHUL JAMMULA [IN], et al) [X] 1,2,4-6,8,9 * paragraphs [0003] - [0011] - [0 23] - [0037] * [A] 3,7; | [XA]CN103517385 (TCL GROUP CO LTD) [X] 1,3-5,7-9 * paragraphs [0001] - [0008] - [0 47] - [0100] * [A] 2,6; | [A]US2016119973 (ZHANG PENGFEI [CN], et al) [A] 1-9* paragraphs [0003] - [0005] - [0 20] - [0037] - [0 45] - [0055] * | International search | [A]WO02087135 (NOVARRA INC [US], et al) [A] 1-13* , entire document *; | [X]CN103517385 (TCL GROUP CO LTD) [X] 1-13 * , description, paragraphs 0020-0028 *; | [A]CN104283642 (BEIJING XIAOMI TECHNOLOGY CO) [A] 1-13 * , entire document *; | [X]CN104661285 (LENOVO BEIJING CO LTD) [X] 1-13 * , claims 1-11 *; | [A]CN105430712 (SHANGHAI FEIXUN COMMUNICATION CO LTD) [A] 1-13 * , entire document * |