EP3570027 - SULFIDE GAS CONCENTRATION MEASUREMENT DEVICE AND SULFIDE GAS CONCENTRATION MEASUREMENT METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.11.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.07.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.12.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.10.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, PL, PT, SK | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JMS Inc. 2-5-14 Higashi-Ohi Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 140-0011 / JP | For all designated states Saito, Junpei 2-106-2 Hourai-cho Fukushima-shi, Fukushima 960-8157 / JP | [2019/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAITO, Junpei 2-106-2 Hourai-cho Fukushima-shi Fukushima 960-8157 / JP | 02 /
HIGASHIDE, Kazusa c/o JMS Inc. 2-5-14 Higashi-Ohi Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 140-0011 / JP | 03 /
KAWAMOTO, Ken c/o JMS Inc. 2-5-14 Higashi-Ohi Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 140-0011 / JP | 04 /
YAMAMOTO, Yasumichi c/o JMS Inc. 2-5-14 Higashi-Ohi Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 140-0011 / JP | [2023/51] |
Former [2019/47] | 01 /
SAITO Junpei 2-106-2 Hourai-cho Fukushima-shi Fukushima 960-8157 / JP | ||
02 /
HIGASHIDE Kazusa c/o JMS Inc. 2-5-14 Higashi-Ohi Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 140-0011 / JP | |||
03 /
KAWAMOTO Ken c/o JMS Inc. 2-5-14 Higashi-Ohi Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 140-0011 / JP | |||
04 /
YAMAMOTO Yasumichi c/o JMS Inc. 2-5-14 Higashi-Ohi Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 140-0011 / JP | Representative(s) | Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [2019/47] | Application number, filing date | 17903001.0 | 30.03.2017 | [2019/47] | WO2017JP13137 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018179195 | Date: | 04.10.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3570027 | Date: | 20.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3570027 | Date: | 20.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.10.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/497, A61B5/08, A61B5/097 | [2020/09] | CPC: |
G01N33/497 (EP,US);
A61B5/097 (EP,US);
A61B5/08 (EP);
A61B5/082 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2019/47] | G01N33/497, A61B5/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/47] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR MESSUNG DER KONZENTRATION VON SCHWEFELWASSERSTOFFGAS | [2019/47] | English: | SULFIDE GAS CONCENTRATION MEASUREMENT DEVICE AND SULFIDE GAS CONCENTRATION MEASUREMENT METHOD | [2019/47] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE MESURE DE CONCENTRATION DE GAZ DE SULFURE ET PROCÉDÉ DE MESURE DE CONCENTRATION DE GAZ DE SULFURE | [2019/47] | Entry into regional phase | 12.08.2019 | Translation filed | 12.08.2019 | National basic fee paid | 12.08.2019 | Search fee paid | 12.08.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.08.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.08.2019 | Examination requested [2019/47] | 18.08.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.12.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.04.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.11.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 10.11.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.11.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 20.12.2023 | CZ | 20.12.2023 | EE | 20.12.2023 | ES | 20.12.2023 | FI | 20.12.2023 | HR | 20.12.2023 | IT | 20.12.2023 | LT | 20.12.2023 | LV | 20.12.2023 | PL | 20.12.2023 | RO | 20.12.2023 | RS | 20.12.2023 | SE | 20.12.2023 | SK | 20.12.2023 | SM | 20.12.2023 | BG | 20.03.2024 | NO | 20.03.2024 | GR | 21.03.2024 | IS | 20.04.2024 | PT | 22.04.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 20.12.2023 | |
CZ | 20.12.2023 | ||
EE | 20.12.2023 | ||
ES | 20.12.2023 | ||
FI | 20.12.2023 | ||
HR | 20.12.2023 | ||
LT | 20.12.2023 | ||
LV | 20.12.2023 | ||
RO | 20.12.2023 | ||
RS | 20.12.2023 | ||
SE | 20.12.2023 | ||
SM | 20.12.2023 | ||
BG | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
IS | 20.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | EE | 20.12.2023 | |
ES | 20.12.2023 | ||
FI | 20.12.2023 | ||
HR | 20.12.2023 | ||
LT | 20.12.2023 | ||
LV | 20.12.2023 | ||
RS | 20.12.2023 | ||
SE | 20.12.2023 | ||
SM | 20.12.2023 | ||
BG | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
IS | 20.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | ES | 20.12.2023 | |
FI | 20.12.2023 | ||
HR | 20.12.2023 | ||
LT | 20.12.2023 | ||
LV | 20.12.2023 | ||
RS | 20.12.2023 | ||
SE | 20.12.2023 | ||
SM | 20.12.2023 | ||
BG | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
IS | 20.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | ES | 20.12.2023 | |
FI | 20.12.2023 | ||
HR | 20.12.2023 | ||
LT | 20.12.2023 | ||
LV | 20.12.2023 | ||
RS | 20.12.2023 | ||
SE | 20.12.2023 | ||
BG | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
IS | 20.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | ES | 20.12.2023 | |
FI | 20.12.2023 | ||
HR | 20.12.2023 | ||
LT | 20.12.2023 | ||
LV | 20.12.2023 | ||
RS | 20.12.2023 | ||
SE | 20.12.2023 | ||
BG | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | ES | 20.12.2023 | |
FI | 20.12.2023 | ||
HR | 20.12.2023 | ||
LT | 20.12.2023 | ||
RS | 20.12.2023 | ||
SE | 20.12.2023 | ||
BG | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | FI | 20.12.2023 | |
LT | 20.12.2023 | ||
BG | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 21.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2014305810 (VON BAHR PONTUS [SE], et al) [Y] 1-6 * paragraphs [0025] - [0028] *; | [Y]US2015032019 (ACKER JARON [US], et al) [Y] 1-6 * paragraph [0010] *; | [Y]WO2017040546 (CEDARS SINAI MEDICAL CENTER [US]) [Y] 1-6 * paragraphs [0001] , [0 45] , [0 52] , [0 70] - [0076]; figure 5 *; | [Y]US2017065208 (FURUSAKI KEIZO [JP], et al) [Y] 1-6* paragraphs [0067] , [0086]; figure 1 * | International search | [Y]JP2000506601 (Sievers Instruments, Inc.) [Y] 1-6 * , claims; page 10, lines 21 to 28; page 14, lines 5 to 9 & WO 1997/038307 A1 claims; page 8, lines 12 to 19; page 11, line 27 to page 12, line 3 & US 6010459 A *; | [Y]JP2005538819 (Aerocrine AB) [Y] 1-6 * , claims 1 to 2, 6 to 7; paragraphs [0001] to [0002], [0019], [0021], [0048] to [0049]; fig. 1 & US 2004/0082872 A1 claims 1 to 2, 6 to 7; paragraphs [0001] to [0002], [0023], [0025], [0058] to [0059]; fig. 1 & WO 2004/023997 A1 *; | [A]JP2010217016 (TOKAI DENSHI KK) [A] 1-6 * , claims 1 to 2; paragraph [0064]; fig. 11 (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2014522973 (Fred Hutchinson Cancer Research Center) [Y] 1-6 * , claims; paragraphs [0001] to [0009], [0020], [0026] to [0027], [0049], [0072] to [0077] & WO 2013/003429 A1 claims; paragraphs [0001] to [0009], [0021] to [0027] to [0028], [0050], [0073] to [0078] & US 2015/0032019 A1 *; | [A]WO2016200948 (UNIV LELAND STANFORD JUNIOR [US]) [A] 1-6 * , claims; figures (Family: none) *; | [A] - ZHANG, J. et al., "Exhaled Hydrogen Sulfide Predicts Airway Inflammation Phenotype in COPD", RESPIRATORY CARE, (20150000), vol. 60, no. 2, pages 251 - 258, XP055550555 [A] 1-6 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.4187/respcare.03519 | by applicant | JP2014522973 | JP2015526732 | JP2015526733 | - J. ZHANG et al., "Correlation between levels of exhaled hydrogen sulfide and airway inflammatory phenotype in patients with chronic persistent asthma", Respirology, (20140828), vol. 19, pages 1165 - 1169 | - J. ZHANG et al., "Exhaled Hydrogen Sulfide Predicts Airway Inflammation Phenotype in COPD", Respiratory Care, (20150129), vol. 60, no. 2, doi:doi:10.4187/respcare.03519, pages 251 - 258, XP055550555 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.4187/respcare.03519 | - FURTHERMORE, S. YUN et al., "Exhaled hydrogen sulfide in patients with chronic obstructive pulmonary disease and its correlation with exhaled nitric oxide", Chinese Medical Journal, (20130000), vol. 126, no. 17, pages 3240 - 3244 |