EP3496268 - GROUND PHOTOVOLTAIC POWER GENERATION MODULE UNIT AND GROUND PHOTOVOLTAIC POWER GENERATION MODULE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.10.2020 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.05.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.04.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 23.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.11.2020 [2020/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Beijing Apollo Ding Rong Solar Technology Co., Ltd. Room 3001 No. 6 Building No. 7 Rong Chang East Street Beijing Economic-Technological Development Area Beijing 100176 / CN | [2019/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LV, Hejiang Room 3001, No. 6 Building No. 7 Rong chang East Street Beijing Economic-Technological Development Area Beijing 100176 / CN | 02 /
JIANG, Wei Room 3001, No. 6 Building No. 7 Rong chang East Street Beijing Economic-Technological Development Area Beijing 100176 / CN | 03 /
WANG, Hong Room 3001, No. 6 Building No. 7 Rong chang East Street Beijing Economic-Technological Development Area Beijing 100176 / CN | 04 /
ZHANG, Xueliang Room 3001, No. 6 Building No. 7 Rong chang East Street Beijing Economic-Technological Development Area Beijing 100176 / CN | 05 /
QI, Weibin Room 3001, No. 6 Building No. 7 Rong chang East Street Beijing Economic-Technological Development Area Beijing 100176 / CN | 06 /
LIN, Junrong Room 3001, No. 6 Building No. 7 Rong chang East Street Beijing Economic-Technological Development Area Beijing 100176 / CN | [2019/24] | Representative(s) | Roman, Alexis SPE Roman-Andre 35 rue Paradis B.P. 30064 13484 Marseille / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2019/24] | Roman, Alexis Cabinet Roman 35 rue Paradis B.P. 30064 13484 Marseille Cedex 20 / FR | Application number, filing date | 17905909.2 | 28.11.2017 | [2019/24] | WO2017CN113238 | Priority number, date | CN201721320066U | 13.10.2017 Original published format: CN 201721320066 U | [2019/24] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019071757 | Date: | 18.04.2019 | Language: | ZH | [2019/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3496268 | Date: | 12.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 18.04.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H02S20/21 | [2020/04] | CPC: |
H02S20/21 (EP);
H02S20/10 (KR);
H02S30/10 (KR);
Y02E10/50 (EP,KR)
|
Former IPC [2019/24] | H02S20/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/24] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BODENMODULEINHEIT ZUR FOTOVOLTAISCHEN STROMERZEUGUNG UND BODENMODUL ZUR FOTOVOLTAISCHEN STROMERZEUGUNG | [2019/24] | English: | GROUND PHOTOVOLTAIC POWER GENERATION MODULE UNIT AND GROUND PHOTOVOLTAIC POWER GENERATION MODULE | [2019/24] | French: | UNITÉ DE MODULE DE PRODUCTION D'ÉLECTRICITÉ PHOTOVOLTAÏQUE AU SOL ET MODULE DE PRODUCTION D'ÉLECTRICITÉ PHOTOVOLTAÏQUE AU SOL | [2019/24] | Entry into regional phase | 23.10.2018 | Translation filed | 23.10.2018 | National basic fee paid | 23.10.2018 | Search fee paid | 23.10.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.10.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.10.2018 | Examination requested [2019/24] | 03.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/45] | 25.06.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2020/45] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2019 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2013027948 (KEE SEUNG-CHEOL [KR]) [X] 1 * figures 1, 2, 8-11 * * in the machine translation into English see: page 4, lines 12-15; page 4, lines 21-24 page 7, lines 5-29; * [I] 2-10; | [X]US2014159489 (CLOUGH BRADFORD A [US]) [X] 1 * figures 1, 6, 9, 23 * * paragraphs [0034] - [0037] - [0 54] , [0 55] , [0 57] - [0059] *; | [A]US2016365825 (POIVET ALAIN [US]) [A] 2 * figures 1, 1cont'd * * paragraph [0040] *; | [A]US2012103401 (KITAMURA TAKASHI [JP], et al) [A] 2 * figures 1,3 * * paragraphs [0084] , [0 96] , [0 97] *; | [A]US4433200 (JESTER THERESA L [US], et al) [A] 5 * column 3, lines 9-13; figures 2,3 *; | [A]DE102010022914 (HARLOS RUDOLF [DE]) [A] 3 * paragraph [0021]; figure 13 *; | [A]JP2010071046 (SANKO METAL IND) [A] 3 * paragraph [0022]; figure 4 *; | [A]US2011226335 (NAITOH KATSUYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 3 * paragraph [0093]; figure 13A *; | [A]DE202012011438U (JOOSTEN LILIANA [DE], et al) [A] 9 * paragraphs [0022] , [0 41]; figure 1 *; | [A]WO2011148107 (LR ETANCO ATEL [FR], et al) [A] 4 * page 14, lines 17-20; figures 1, 3 * |