EP3613990 - WATER PUMP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.09.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.01.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.09.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.10.2021 [2021/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TBK Co., Ltd. 4-21-1 Minaminaruse Machida-shi, Tokyo 194-0045 / JP | [2020/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAKAJIMA, Mitsuo c/o TBK CO. LTD. 4-21-1 Minaminaruse Machida-shi Tokyo 194-0045 / JP | 02 /
OHSAWA, Makoto c/o TBK CO. LTD. 4-21-1 Minaminaruse Machida-shi Tokyo 194-0045 / JP | [2020/09] | Representative(s) | Fink Numrich Patentanwälte PartmbB Paul-Gerhardt-Allee 24 81245 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/09] | Fink Numrich Patentanwälte PartmbB European Patent and Trademark Attorneys Wendl-Dietrich-Straße 14 80634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 17906209.6 | 17.04.2017 | [2020/09] | WO2017JP15417 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018193488 | Date: | 25.10.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3613990 | Date: | 26.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 25.10.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | F04D29/043, F01P7/08, F04D13/02, F01P5/12, F01P7/16, F16D13/76, F16D27/01, F16D27/112 | [2020/46] | CPC: |
F04D13/027 (EP);
F04D29/043 (US);
F01P5/12 (EP);
F01P7/084 (US);
F01P7/162 (EP);
F04D13/022 (EP);
F16D13/76 (EP);
F16D27/01 (EP);
F16D27/112 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2020/09] | F04D29/043, F01P7/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/09] | Title | German: | WASSERPUMPE | [2020/09] | English: | WATER PUMP | [2020/09] | French: | POMPE À EAU | [2020/09] | Entry into regional phase | 22.10.2019 | Translation filed | 22.10.2019 | National basic fee paid | 22.10.2019 | Search fee paid | 22.10.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.10.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.10.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.10.2019 | Examination requested [2020/09] | 07.05.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/41] | 31.05.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2012020812 (MEIRA JOAO LUIZ DE CARVALHO [BR], et al) [X] 1-3 * paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0032] * * figures 1, 4 *; | [X]EP2105624 (LINNIG TRUCKTEC GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-3 * paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0022] * * claim 1 * * figures 1, 2 *; | [X]CN104454486B (SUHOU RISING AUTO PARTS CO LTD) [X] 1-3 * abstract * * figure 1 *; | [A]US2015292576 (SETTINERI SAMUEL E [US], et al) [A] 1-3 * paragraph [0061] * * figure 9 * | International search | [X]JP2007285268 (MITSUBISHI MOTORS CORP) [X] 1-3 * , paragraphs [0058] to [0063]; fig. 6 (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2008163779 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP, et al) [A] 1-3 * , claims; paragraph [0003] & US 2009/0022606 A1 & WO 2008/078774 A1 & CN 101395354 A *; | [A]JP2011202594 (AISIN SEIKI) [A] 1-3 * , paragraph [0004] (Family: none) * | by applicant | JP2014109375 |