EP3614934 - DUAL-LUMEN ULTRASONIC CATHETERS, SYSTEMS, AND METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.12.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.01.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | 19.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states C.R. Bard, Inc. 730 Central Avenue Murray Hill, NJ 07974 / US | [2020/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOYE, Jessica, Lynn Roll 4638 East Aire Libre Avenue Phoenix, AZ 85032 / US | 02 /
YOUNG, Amanda 1025 East Highland Avenue 33 Phoenix, AZ 85014 / US | 03 /
PARMENTIER, William, E. 1420 North Roadrunner Drive Gilbert, AZ 85234 / US | [2020/10] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2020/10] | Application number, filing date | 17906920.8 | 28.04.2017 | [2020/10] | WO2017US30266 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018200004 | Date: | 01.11.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3614934 | Date: | 04.03.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.11.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 01.11.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.03.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/22, A61B17/32, A61B17/3207, A61M25/00 | [2020/10] | CPC: |
A61B17/22012 (EP,KR,US);
A61B17/3207 (KR);
A61M25/0009 (US);
A61M25/0026 (US);
A61M25/0028 (EP);
A61M25/0097 (EP);
A61M25/09 (US);
A61B2017/00199 (KR);
A61B2017/00526 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00778 (KR);
A61B2017/00973 (KR,US);
A61B2017/22014 (EP,KR);
A61B2017/22039 (EP,KR);
A61B2017/22072 (KR);
A61B2017/320741 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/10] | Title | German: | DOPPELLUMIGE ULTRASCHALLKATHETER, SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN | [2020/10] | English: | DUAL-LUMEN ULTRASONIC CATHETERS, SYSTEMS, AND METHODS | [2020/10] | French: | CATHÉTERS ULTRASONORES À DOUBLE LUMIÈRE, SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS | [2020/10] | Entry into regional phase | 15.11.2019 | National basic fee paid | 15.11.2019 | Search fee paid | 15.11.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.11.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.11.2019 | Examination requested [2020/10] | 18.09.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.12.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.04.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US6296620 (GESSWEIN DOUGLAS H [US], et al) [Y] 1-14 * column 1, line 6 - line 9; figures 1-6 * * column 2, line 26 - line 59 * * column 3, line 5 - line 52 * * column 4, line 55 - column 6, line 6 *; | [Y]US2007078437 (BORDEN JONATHAN R [US], et al) [Y] 1-14 * paragraphs [0013] - [0017] - [0020] , [0034] - [0042] - [0047]; figures 1,2,3C *; | [A]US2011046522 (CHAN HUEY [US], et al) [A] 1,8* paragraphs [0036] - [0038]; figures 1-4 *; | [A]US2017080181 (SHIONO JUNJI [JP], et al) [A] 1-14 * paragraphs [0039] - [0045] - [0049]; figures 1,2 * * paragraphs [0104] - [0114]; figures 10,12 * | International search | [A]US2006122507 (RULE PETER R [US], et al) [A] 1-3, 8-10, 15-18 * entire document *; | [A]US2008319376 (WILCOX ROBERT L [US], et al) [A] 1-3, 8-10, 15-18* entire document *; | [A]WO2016081026 (BARD INC C R [US]) [A] 1-3, 8-10, 15-18 * entire document *; | [A]US2016302762 (STIGALL JEREMY [US], et al) [A] 1-3, 8-10, 15-18 * entire document *; | [A]US2016361528 (KANZ WILLIAM RUSSELL [US], et al) [A] 1-3, 8-10, 15-18 * entire document * | by applicant | US6296620 | US2007078437 | US2017080181 |