EP3619994 - TECHNIQUES FOR COMMUNICATING BEAM INFORMATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.01.2021 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.02.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2020/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Yu Ngok c/o ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park, Nanshan Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | 02 /
GAO, Bo c/o ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park, Nanshan Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | 03 /
CHEN, Yijian c/o ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park, Nanshan Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | 04 /
XIAO, Huahua c/o ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park, Nanshan Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | 05 /
LU, Zhaohua c/o ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park, Nanshan Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2020/11] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2020/11] | Application number, filing date | 17908238.3 | 05.05.2017 | [2020/11] | WO2017CN83348 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018201495 | Date: | 08.11.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3619994 | Date: | 11.03.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.11.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 08.11.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/04, H04J11/00, H04B7/0404 | [2020/13] | CPC: |
H04J11/0036 (EP,CN);
H04B17/345 (CN,US);
H04L25/0224 (CN,US);
H04B17/364 (CN,US);
H04B7/0404 (EP,CN);
H04B7/0626 (CN,US);
H04B7/06966 (EP);
H04B7/0802 (CN,US);
H04B7/0857 (CN,US);
H04B7/0888 (CN,US);
H04J11/00 (EP,CN);
H04L25/0204 (CN,US);
|
Former IPC [2020/11] | H04W72/04, H04J11/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/11] | Title | German: | TECHNIKEN ZUR KOMMUNIKATION VON STRAHLINFORMATIONEN | [2020/11] | English: | TECHNIQUES FOR COMMUNICATING BEAM INFORMATION | [2020/11] | French: | TECHNIQUES DE COMMUNICATION D'INFORMATIONS DE FAISCEAU | [2020/11] | Entry into regional phase | 05.12.2019 | National basic fee paid | 05.12.2019 | Search fee paid | 05.12.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.12.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.12.2019 | Examination requested [2020/11] | 23.09.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.01.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.08.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.01.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.06.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2015036621 (SHIN JOON WOO [KR]) [X] 1-3,11-13,15 * paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0106] - paragraph [0120] * * paragraph [0135] * * table 3 * * figure 4 *[I] 4-10,14; | [XAI]US2015215061 (TSAI LUNG-SHENG [TW], et al) [X] 1-3,11,12,15 * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0049] * * figures 7, 8 * [A] 13 [I] 4-10,14 | International search | [A]WO2015115991 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [A] 1-32 * the whole document *; | [A]CN104995863 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M) [A] 1-32 * the whole document *; | [A]CN105792373 (CHINA ACADEMY TELECOMMUNICATIONS TECHNOLOGY) [A] 1-32 * the whole document *; | [A]US2016262161 (LI SHAOHUA [CN], et al) [A] 1-32 * claims 1, 16, and description, paragraphs [0045]-[0094] *; | [A]CN106464322 (MEDIATEK INC) [A] 1-32* the whole document * | by applicant | US2015036621 | US2015215061 |