EP3624098 - SPLICED DISPLAY SCREEN CONFIGURATION METHOD AND DEVICE, AND DISPLAY SCREEN CONTROL CARD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.12.2021 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.02.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xi'an Novastar Tech Co., Ltd. 401 Block D Qinfeng Pavilion Xi'an Software Park 68 2nd Keji Rd., Hi-Tech District Xi'an, Shaanxi 710075 / CN | [2020/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZONG, Jingguo 401 Block D Qinfeng Pavilion Xi'an Software Park 68 2nd Keji Rd. Hi-Tech District, Xi'an Shaanxi 710075 / CN | 02 /
WANG, Huorong 401 Block D Qinfeng Pavilion Xi'an Software Park 68 2nd Keji Rd. Hi-Tech District, Xi'an Shaanxi 710075 / CN | 03 /
LIANG, Wei 401 Block D Qinfeng Pavilion Xi'an Software Park 68 2nd Keji Rd. Hi-Tech District, Xi'an Shaanxi 710075 / CN | [2020/12] | Representative(s) | Herrero & Asociados, S.L. Edificio Aqua - Agustín de Foxá, 4-10 28036 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2020/12] | de Arpe Fernandez, Manuel Arpe Patentes y Marcas, S.L.P. C/Proción, 7 Edif. América II Portal 2, 1° C 28023 Madrid-Aravaca / ES | Application number, filing date | 17909200.2 | 19.10.2017 | [2020/12] | WO2017CN101298 | Priority number, date | CN201710326614 | 10.05.2017 Original published format: CN201710326614 | [2020/12] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018205475 | Date: | 15.11.2018 | Language: | ZH | [2018/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3624098 | Date: | 18.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 15.11.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.03.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G09G3/32, G09F9/302, G06F3/14 | [2020/17] | CPC: |
G11B27/036 (EP,US);
G09G3/32 (CN);
H04N21/23424 (US);
G06F3/1446 (EP,US);
H04N21/4312 (EP);
H04N21/8153 (EP);
G09G2300/026 (EP);
G09G2340/14 (EP);
G09G2356/00 (EP);
G09G2370/04 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/12] | G09G3/32 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/12] | Title | German: | KONFIGURATIONSVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG FÜR GESPLEISSTEN ANZEIGEBILDSCHIRM SOWIE STEUERKARTE FÜR ANZEIGEBILDSCHIRM | [2020/12] | English: | SPLICED DISPLAY SCREEN CONFIGURATION METHOD AND DEVICE, AND DISPLAY SCREEN CONTROL CARD | [2020/12] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE CONFIGURATION D'ÉCRAN D'AFFICHAGE ASSEMBLÉ, ET CARTE DE COMMANDE D'ÉCRAN D'AFFICHAGE | [2020/12] | Entry into regional phase | 12.11.2019 | Translation filed | 06.12.2019 | National basic fee paid | 06.12.2019 | Search fee paid | 06.12.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.12.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.12.2019 | Examination requested [2020/12] | 16.09.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.12.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.03.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.08.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.02.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]CN102097085 (VTRON TECHNOLOGIES LTD) [I] 1-15* paragraphs [0015] , [0021] , [0023] , [0025] , [0026]; figures 3,4 * |