03.05.2024 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] |
01.05.2024 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
30.04.2024 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
30.04.2024 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
28.03.2024 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.01.2024 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
26.05.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.05.2023 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
19.01.2023 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
27.05.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.01.2022 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
01.10.2021 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
01.10.2021 |
First examination report |
|
15.06.2021 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
18.05.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.12.2020 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 06.01.2021 [2021/01] |
04.12.2020 |
Change - classification |
published on 06.01.2021 [2021/01] |
04.12.2020 |
Change - classification |
published on 06.01.2021 [2021/01] |
24.07.2020 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 26.08.2020 [2020/35] |
24.07.2020 |
Change - extension states |
published on 26.08.2020 [2020/35] |
25.05.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.03.2020 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] |
06.03.2020 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] |
12.02.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.11.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.10.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.10.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.10.2019 |
Change - representative |
|
11.10.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.12.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.11.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|