Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
24.07.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 26.08.2020 [2020/35] |
27.02.2020 | Supplementary search report | published on 25.03.2020 [2020/13] |
21.02.2020 | Change - classification | published on 25.03.2020 [2020/13] |
02.07.2019 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
10.04.2019 | Deletion - The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
15.02.2019 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 20.03.2019 [2019/12] |
15.02.2019 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
15.02.2019 | Request for examination filed | published on 20.03.2019 [2019/12] |
13.02.2019 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
09.02.2019 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
26.01.2019 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
24.01.2019 | Change - representative | |
24.01.2019 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
10.01.2019 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
31.12.2018 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
14.12.2018 | PCT data prior to European publication |