Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2018235146 | Global Dossier | 27.12.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2017JP22593 | 19.06.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2021220089 | Global Dossier | 22.07.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2017JP22593 | 19.06.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPWO2018235146 | Global Dossier | 27.06.2019 | A1 | JP6305666B | 04.04.2018 | B1 | Priority number | Date | WO2017JP22593 | 19.06.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3456285 | Global Dossier | 25.03.2020 | A4 | EP3456285 | 20.03.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2017JP22593 | 19.06.2017 |