EP3647842 - METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING OPTICAL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 14.08.2020 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.04.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.08.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 16.09.2020 [2020/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fujikura Ltd. 5-1, Kiba 1-chome Koto-Ku Tokyo 135-8512 / JP | [2020/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OHMORI Kenichi c/o Fujikura Ltd. Sakura Works 1440 Mutsuzaki Sakura-shi Chiba 285-8550 / JP | 02 /
ISHIKURA Norihiro c/o Fujikura Ltd. Sakura Works 1440 Mutsuzaki Sakura-shi Chiba 285-8550 / JP | 03 /
UEMURA Hitoshi c/o Fujikura Ltd. Sakura Works 1440 Mutsuzaki Sakura-shi Chiba 285-8550 / JP | [2020/19] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2020/19] | Plasseraud IP 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 17915764.9 | 23.10.2017 | [2020/19] | WO2017JP38171 | Priority number, date | JP20170126964 | 29.06.2017 Original published format: JP 2017126964 | [2020/19] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019003466 | Date: | 03.01.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3647842 | Date: | 06.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.01.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/255, G02B6/02, G02B6/26, G02B6/28 | [2020/19] | CPC: |
G02B6/02042 (EP);
G02B6/4471 (US);
G01M11/30 (US);
G02B6/04 (EP);
G02B6/255 (US);
G02B6/2552 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/19] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER OPTISCHEN VORRICHTUNG | [2020/19] | English: | METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING OPTICAL DEVICE | [2020/19] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN DISPOSITIF OPTIQUE | [2020/19] | Entry into regional phase | 24.01.2020 | Translation filed | 24.01.2020 | National basic fee paid | 24.01.2020 | Search fee paid | 24.01.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.01.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.01.2020 | Examination requested [2020/19] | 12.08.2020 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2020/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YA]WO2012121320 (FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP], et al); | [YA]JP2013054116 (KONICA MINOLTA ADVANCED LAYERS); | [YA]JP2014126575 (FUJIKURA LTD); | [YA]JP2015041078 (FUJIKURA LTD); | [A]US2016097903 (LI MING-JUN [US], et al) | by applicant | US7781724 | JP2015001673 | JP2015152774 | JP5782104B | JP2017126964 |