EP3647084 - CONTROL DEVICE FOR SUSPENSION DEVICE AND SUSPENSION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2020/19] | CONTROL DEVICE FOR SUSPENSION DEVICE, DIFFERENTIAL CALCULATION DEVICE, RECORDING MEDIUM, AND SUSPENSION SYSTEM | ||
[2022/45] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.12.2022 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.04.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi Astemo, Ltd. 2520 Takaba Hitachinaka-shi Ibaraki 312-8503 / JP | [2022/22] |
Former [2022/16] | For all designated states Hitachi Automotive Systems, Ltd. 2520, Takaba Hitachinaka-shi Ibaraki 312-8503 / JP | ||
Former [2020/19] | For all designated states Showa Corporation 14-1 Fujiwara-cho 1-chome Gyoda-shi, Saitama 361-8506 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAKAMURA Junya c/o SHOWA CORPORATION Asaba Plant 2601 Matsubara Fukuroi City Shizuoka 437-1194 / JP | [2020/19] | Representative(s) | Nordmeyer, Philipp Werner df-mp Dörries Frank-Molnia & Pohlman Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Theatinerstraße 16 80333 München / DE | [2020/19] | Application number, filing date | 17915829.0 | 14.07.2017 | [2020/19] | WO2017JP25762 | Priority number, date | JP20170129224 | 30.06.2017 Original published format: JP 2017129224 | [2020/19] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019003455 | Date: | 03.01.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3647084 | Date: | 06.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.01.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.02.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B60G17/015, B60G17/018, B60G17/08, B60G15/06 | [2021/11] | CPC: |
B60G17/015 (EP);
B60G17/018 (EP,US);
B60G15/062 (EP);
B60G17/0164 (US);
B60G17/08 (EP,US);
B60W30/025 (US);
B60G17/019 (US);
B60G2202/312 (EP);
B60G2300/12 (EP);
B60G2400/204 (EP);
B60G2400/25 (US);
B60G2400/252 (EP);
B60G2500/10 (US);
B60G2500/114 (EP);
B60G2600/11 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2020/19] | B60G17/015, B60G17/018 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/19] | Title | German: | STEUERUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR AUFHÄNGUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND AUFHÄNGUNGSSYSTEM | [2022/45] | English: | CONTROL DEVICE FOR SUSPENSION DEVICE AND SUSPENSION SYSTEM | [2022/45] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE POUR DISPOSITIF DE SUSPENSION ET SYSTÈME DE SUSPENSION | [2022/45] |
Former [2020/19] | STEUERUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR AUFHÄNGUNGSVORRICHTUNG, DIFFERENZBERECHNUNGSVORRICHTUNG, AUFZEICHNUNGSMEDIUM UND AUFHÄNGUNGSSYSTEM | ||
Former [2020/19] | CONTROL DEVICE FOR SUSPENSION DEVICE, DIFFERENTIAL CALCULATION DEVICE, RECORDING MEDIUM, AND SUSPENSION SYSTEM | ||
Former [2020/19] | DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE POUR DISPOSITIF DE SUSPENSION, DISPOSITIF DE CALCUL DIFFÉRENTIEL, SUPPORT D'ENREGISTREMENT, ET SYSTÈME DE SUSPENSION | Entry into regional phase | 06.09.2019 | Translation filed | 06.09.2019 | National basic fee paid | 06.09.2019 | Search fee paid | 06.09.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.09.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.01.2018 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 06.09.2019 | Examination requested [2020/19] | 26.07.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.12.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.04.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [X]JPS6260369 (SANKYO SEIKI SEISAKUSHO KK) [X] 5, 10 * , *; | [Y]JPH02202602 (TOSHIBA CORP) [Y] 2-3, 7-9, 11- 13 * , *; | [A]JPH07285311 (NISSAN MOTOR) [A] 1 * , *; | [A]JP2003124825 (HITACHI UNISIA AUTOMOTIVE LTD) [A] 1 * , [0029]-[0034] *; | [XY]JP2005096671 (HITACHI UNISIA AUTOMOTIVE LTD) [X] 5-6, 10 * , [0030 * [Y] 13, 7-9, 11- 14; | [A]JP2016055697 (KYB CORP) [A] 1* , *; | [Y]JP2016150672 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [Y] 3, 8-9, 12-13 * . *; | [YA]JP2016175469 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [Y] 1-3, 14 * , * [A] 4; | [YA]WO2017033801 (NTN TOYO BEARING CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-3, 14 * , [00 4 0] & JP 2017-39439 A * [A] 4 | by applicant | JP2007267375 | JP2014172594 |