EP3648051 - METHOD FOR REMOVING OBJECT TO BE PROCESSED FROM IMAGE AND DEVICE FOR PERFORMING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 15.01.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.04.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.01.2021 | Withdrawal of application | published on 17.02.2021 [2021/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Linkflow Co., Ltd. 13th Floor, 5 Teheran-ro 69-gil Gangnam-gu, Seoul 06160 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2020/19] | For all designated states Linkflow Co. Ltd 13th Floor, 5 Teheran-ro 69-gil Gangnam-gu, Seoul 06160 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Yong Kuk 103-801 8 Gwongwang-ro 276beon-gil Paldal-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16534 / KR | 02 /
CHO, Sung Rae 104dong 309ho, (Dogokdong, Yeoksam Lucky Apt) 213 Nonhyeon-ro Gangnam-gu Seoul 06262 / KR | 03 /
KIM, Jun Se No.3, 62, Suresil-gil, Opo-eup Gwangju-Si Gyeonggi-do 12772 / KR | 04 /
KIM, Yong Jin 309-2504, 566, Sinseon-ro Nam-gu Busan 48515 / KR | [2020/19] | Representative(s) | AWA Sweden AB Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/19] | AWA Sweden AB P.O. Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | Application number, filing date | 17915895.1 | 12.12.2017 | [2020/19] | WO2017KR14514 | Priority number, date | KR20170082441 | 29.06.2017 Original published format: KR 20170082441 | [2020/19] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019004530 | Date: | 03.01.2019 | Language: | KO | [2019/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3648051 | Date: | 06.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 03.01.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G06T5/00, G06T7/10, G06F1/16 | [2021/02] | CPC: |
G06T7/10 (EP);
G06T5/80 (KR);
H04N23/698 (US);
G06F1/163 (EP,KR);
G06F1/1686 (EP);
G06F3/011 (EP);
G06F3/0325 (EP);
G06F3/04815 (EP);
G06T3/4007 (KR,US);
G06T5/77 (EP);
G06T2207/20081 (EP,KR);
G06T2207/20221 (EP);
G06T2207/30196 (EP,KR)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/19] | G06T5/00, G06T3/40, G06F1/16 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/19] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ENTFERNUNG EINES ZU VERARBEITENDEN OBJEKTS AUS EINEM BILD UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG DES VERFAHRENS | [2020/19] | English: | METHOD FOR REMOVING OBJECT TO BE PROCESSED FROM IMAGE AND DEVICE FOR PERFORMING METHOD | [2020/19] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE SUPPRESSION D'UN OBJET À TRAITER D'UNE IMAGE ET DISPOSITIF D'EXÉCUTION DUDIT PROCÉDÉ | [2020/19] | Entry into regional phase | 09.01.2020 | Translation filed | 09.01.2020 | National basic fee paid | 09.01.2020 | Search fee paid | 09.01.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.01.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.01.2020 | Examination requested [2020/19] | 29.12.2020 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2021/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2009294955 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE) [A] 1-11* the whole document *; | [A]US2014321771 (REINISCH GEORG [AT], et al) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A]US2015213595 (LEE GWANG-GOOK [KR], et al) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [XI]US2016156844 (OGAWA MASATO [JP]) [X] 1,6,11 * paragraphs [0039] - [0045] - [0057]; figure 9 * [I] 2-5,7-10 | International search | [Y]KR20010054914 (MUNHWA BROADCASTING CORP [KR]) [Y] 1-11; | [Y]JP2009294955 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE) [Y] 5, 10; | [Y]KR20140045834 (SK TELECOM CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 1-11; | [Y]KR20160003614 (WOO DEOK MYUNG [KR], et al) [Y] 3-4, 8-9; | [A]KR20160144149 (INDUSTRY-ACADEMIC COOP FOUND KUNSAN NAT UNIV [KR])[A] 1-11 |