EP3646836 - POWER ASSIST WHEELCHAIR, POWER ASSIST UNIT FOR WHEELCHAIR, CONTROL DEVICE FOR POWER ASSIST WHEELCHAIR, CONTROL METHOD FOR POWER ASSIST WHEELCHAIR, AND PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.08.2022 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.09.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.04.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.04.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yamaha Hatsudoki Kabushiki Kaisha 2500 Shingai Iwata-shi, Shizuoka 438-8501 / JP | For all designated states Takahashi, Hisashi 5-3-19-604, Kamitsurumahoncho Minami-ku Sagamihara-shi, Kanagawa 252-0318 / JP | [2020/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKAHASHI, Hisashi 5-3-19-604 Kamitsurumahoncho Minami-ku Sagamiharashi Kanagawa 252-0318 / JP | 02 /
UEMURA, Tatsuki c/o YAMAHA HATSUDOKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2500 Shingai Iwata-shi Shizuoka 438-8501 / JP | 03 /
MIZUNO, Masamitsu c/o YAMAHA HATSUDOKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2500 Shingai Iwata-shi Shizuoka 438-8501 / JP | [2020/19] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2020/19] | Application number, filing date | 17916092.4 | 26.06.2017 | [2020/19] | WO2017JP23353 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019003260 | Date: | 03.01.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3646836 | Date: | 06.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3646836 | Date: | 06.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.01.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.05.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61G5/04 | [2020/19] | CPC: |
A61G5/04 (EP,US);
A61G5/048 (US);
A61G5/02 (EP,US);
B60L15/20 (EP,US);
B62M6/50 (US);
B60L2200/24 (EP,US);
B60L2200/34 (US);
B60L2240/421 (EP,US);
B60L2240/423 (EP,US);
B60L2240/429 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/19] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ROLLSTUHL MIT ELEKTRISCHEM HILFSANTRIEB, ELEKTRISCHE HILFSANTRIEBSEINHEIT FÜR ROLLSTUHL, STEUERVORRICHTUNG FÜR ROLLSTUHL MIT ELEKTRISCHEM HILFSANTRIEB, STEUERVERFAHREN FÜR ROLLSTUHL MIT ELEKTRISCHEM HILFSANTRIEB UND PROGRAMM | [2020/19] | English: | POWER ASSIST WHEELCHAIR, POWER ASSIST UNIT FOR WHEELCHAIR, CONTROL DEVICE FOR POWER ASSIST WHEELCHAIR, CONTROL METHOD FOR POWER ASSIST WHEELCHAIR, AND PROGRAM | [2020/19] | French: | FAUTEUIL ROULANT À ASSISTANCE MOTORISÉE, UNITÉ D'ASSISTANCE MOTORISÉE POUR FAUTEUIL ROULANT, DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE POUR FAUTEUIL ROULANT À ASSISTANCE MOTORISÉE, PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE POUR FAUTEUIL ROULANT À ASSISTANCE MOTORISÉE, ET PROGRAMME | [2020/19] | Entry into regional phase | 19.12.2019 | Translation filed | 19.12.2019 | National basic fee paid | 19.12.2019 | Search fee paid | 19.12.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.12.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.12.2019 | Examination requested [2020/19] | 15.12.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.04.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.08.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 31.08.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.08.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 07.07.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.06.2017 | AL | 06.10.2021 | AT | 06.10.2021 | CY | 06.10.2021 | CZ | 06.10.2021 | DK | 06.10.2021 | EE | 06.10.2021 | ES | 06.10.2021 | FI | 06.10.2021 | HR | 06.10.2021 | IT | 06.10.2021 | LT | 06.10.2021 | LV | 06.10.2021 | MC | 06.10.2021 | MK | 06.10.2021 | PL | 06.10.2021 | RO | 06.10.2021 | RS | 06.10.2021 | SI | 06.10.2021 | SK | 06.10.2021 | SM | 06.10.2021 | TR | 06.10.2021 | BG | 06.01.2022 | NO | 06.01.2022 | GR | 07.01.2022 | IS | 06.02.2022 | PT | 07.02.2022 | GB | 26.06.2022 | IE | 26.06.2022 | LU | 26.06.2022 | BE | 30.06.2022 | CH | 30.06.2022 | FR | 30.06.2022 | LI | 30.06.2022 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/24] | HU | 26.06.2017 | |
AL | 06.10.2021 | ||
AT | 06.10.2021 | ||
CY | 06.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.10.2021 | ||
DK | 06.10.2021 | ||
EE | 06.10.2021 | ||
ES | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
IT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
MC | 06.10.2021 | ||
MK | 06.10.2021 | ||
PL | 06.10.2021 | ||
RO | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
SI | 06.10.2021 | ||
SK | 06.10.2021 | ||
SM | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
NO | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
GB | 26.06.2022 | ||
IE | 26.06.2022 | ||
LU | 26.06.2022 | ||
BE | 30.06.2022 | ||
CH | 30.06.2022 | ||
FR | 30.06.2022 | ||
LI | 30.06.2022 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AL | 06.10.2021 | |
AT | 06.10.2021 | ||
CY | 06.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.10.2021 | ||
DK | 06.10.2021 | ||
EE | 06.10.2021 | ||
ES | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
IT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
MC | 06.10.2021 | ||
MK | 06.10.2021 | ||
PL | 06.10.2021 | ||
RO | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
SI | 06.10.2021 | ||
SK | 06.10.2021 | ||
SM | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
NO | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
GB | 26.06.2022 | ||
IE | 26.06.2022 | ||
LU | 26.06.2022 | ||
BE | 30.06.2022 | ||
CH | 30.06.2022 | ||
FR | 30.06.2022 | ||
LI | 30.06.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AL | 06.10.2021 | |
AT | 06.10.2021 | ||
CY | 06.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.10.2021 | ||
DK | 06.10.2021 | ||
EE | 06.10.2021 | ||
ES | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
IT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
MC | 06.10.2021 | ||
PL | 06.10.2021 | ||
RO | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
SI | 06.10.2021 | ||
SK | 06.10.2021 | ||
SM | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
NO | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
GB | 26.06.2022 | ||
IE | 26.06.2022 | ||
LU | 26.06.2022 | ||
BE | 30.06.2022 | ||
CH | 30.06.2022 | ||
FR | 30.06.2022 | ||
LI | 30.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/27] | AL | 06.10.2021 | |
AT | 06.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.10.2021 | ||
DK | 06.10.2021 | ||
EE | 06.10.2021 | ||
ES | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
IT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
MC | 06.10.2021 | ||
PL | 06.10.2021 | ||
RO | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
SI | 06.10.2021 | ||
SK | 06.10.2021 | ||
SM | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
NO | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
GB | 26.06.2022 | ||
IE | 26.06.2022 | ||
LU | 26.06.2022 | ||
BE | 30.06.2022 | ||
CH | 30.06.2022 | ||
FR | 30.06.2022 | ||
LI | 30.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 06.10.2021 | |
AT | 06.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.10.2021 | ||
DK | 06.10.2021 | ||
EE | 06.10.2021 | ||
ES | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
IT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
MC | 06.10.2021 | ||
PL | 06.10.2021 | ||
RO | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
SI | 06.10.2021 | ||
SK | 06.10.2021 | ||
SM | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
NO | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
IE | 26.06.2022 | ||
LU | 26.06.2022 | ||
BE | 30.06.2022 | ||
CH | 30.06.2022 | ||
FR | 30.06.2022 | ||
LI | 30.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AL | 06.10.2021 | |
AT | 06.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.10.2021 | ||
DK | 06.10.2021 | ||
EE | 06.10.2021 | ||
ES | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
MC | 06.10.2021 | ||
PL | 06.10.2021 | ||
RO | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
SI | 06.10.2021 | ||
SK | 06.10.2021 | ||
SM | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
NO | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
IE | 26.06.2022 | ||
LU | 26.06.2022 | ||
CH | 30.06.2022 | ||
FR | 30.06.2022 | ||
LI | 30.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | AL | 06.10.2021 | |
AT | 06.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.10.2021 | ||
DK | 06.10.2021 | ||
EE | 06.10.2021 | ||
ES | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
MC | 06.10.2021 | ||
PL | 06.10.2021 | ||
RO | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
SI | 06.10.2021 | ||
SK | 06.10.2021 | ||
SM | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
NO | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
IE | 26.06.2022 | ||
LU | 26.06.2022 | ||
CH | 30.06.2022 | ||
LI | 30.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | AL | 06.10.2021 | |
AT | 06.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.10.2021 | ||
DK | 06.10.2021 | ||
EE | 06.10.2021 | ||
ES | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
MC | 06.10.2021 | ||
PL | 06.10.2021 | ||
RO | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
SI | 06.10.2021 | ||
SK | 06.10.2021 | ||
SM | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
NO | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
IE | 26.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AL | 06.10.2021 | |
AT | 06.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.10.2021 | ||
DK | 06.10.2021 | ||
EE | 06.10.2021 | ||
ES | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
MC | 06.10.2021 | ||
PL | 06.10.2021 | ||
RO | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
SI | 06.10.2021 | ||
SK | 06.10.2021 | ||
SM | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
NO | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 06.10.2021 | |
AT | 06.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.10.2021 | ||
DK | 06.10.2021 | ||
EE | 06.10.2021 | ||
ES | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
PL | 06.10.2021 | ||
RO | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
SI | 06.10.2021 | ||
SK | 06.10.2021 | ||
SM | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
NO | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AL | 06.10.2021 | |
AT | 06.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.10.2021 | ||
DK | 06.10.2021 | ||
EE | 06.10.2021 | ||
ES | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
PL | 06.10.2021 | ||
RO | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
SK | 06.10.2021 | ||
SM | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
NO | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AT | 06.10.2021 | |
CZ | 06.10.2021 | ||
DK | 06.10.2021 | ||
EE | 06.10.2021 | ||
ES | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
PL | 06.10.2021 | ||
RO | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
SK | 06.10.2021 | ||
SM | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
NO | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AT | 06.10.2021 | |
EE | 06.10.2021 | ||
ES | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
PL | 06.10.2021 | ||
RO | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
SM | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
NO | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AT | 06.10.2021 | |
ES | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
PL | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
SM | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
NO | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AT | 06.10.2021 | |
ES | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
PL | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
NO | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 06.10.2021 | |
ES | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
PL | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 06.10.2021 | |
ES | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
PL | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/22] | AT | 06.10.2021 | |
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 06.10.2021 | |
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/19] | BG | 06.01.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]KR20140065291 (UNIV GACHON IND ACAD COOP FOUND [KR]) [X] 1-5* the whole document * | International search | [A]JPH05310175 (YAMAHA MOTOR CO LTD) [A] 1-20 * , *; | [A]JPH0986476 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO) [A] 1-20 * , *; | [XYA]JP2004025913 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [X] 1-5, 17-20 * , * [Y] 10-16 [A] 6-9; | [A]JP2004120875 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD) [A] 1-20 * , *; | [A]JP2004113375 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD) [A] 1-20* , *; | [A]JP2007223579 (SOFUTORONIKUSU KK) [A] 1-20 * , *; | [Y]WO2017037898 (YAMAHA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 10-16 * , *; | [A]WO2017047333 (NIDEC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-20 * , * | by applicant | JP2006230421 |