14.06.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] |
10.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] |
03.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] |
12.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] |
02.06.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.07.2023 [2023/27] |
19.05.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.06.2023 [2023/25] |
28.04.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.05.2023 [2023/22] |
21.04.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.05.2023 [2023/21] |
14.04.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.05.2023 [2023/20] |
20.01.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.02.2023 [2023/08] |
02.12.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.01.2023 [2023/01] |
04.11.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.12.2022 [2022/49] |
12.08.2022 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 14.09.2022 [2022/37] |
05.08.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.09.2022 [2022/36] |
29.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.08.2022 [2022/35] |
22.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.08.2022 [2022/34] |
15.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] |
27.05.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.06.2022 [2022/26] |
20.05.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.06.2022 [2022/25] |
13.05.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.06.2022 [2022/24] |
06.05.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.06.2022 [2022/23] |
29.04.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.06.2022 [2022/22] |
22.04.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.05.2022 [2022/21] |
15.04.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.05.2022 [2022/20] |
03.09.2021 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 06.10.2021 [2021/40] |
01.09.2021 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
01.09.2021 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
31.08.2021 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
30.06.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.04.2021 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
15.12.2020 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
28.08.2020 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 30.09.2020 [2020/40] |
28.08.2020 |
Change - extension states |
published on 30.09.2020 [2020/40] |
29.06.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
19.05.2020 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 17.06.2020 [2020/25] |
15.05.2020 |
Change - classification |
published on 17.06.2020 [2020/25] |
03.04.2020 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 06.05.2020 [2020/19] |
03.04.2020 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 06.05.2020 [2020/19] |
09.03.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.01.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.01.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.12.2019 |
Change - representative |
|
20.12.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.12.2019 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
20.12.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.01.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.01.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|