EP3474555 - ADVERTISEMENT PUSH METHOD AND APPARATUS, AND COMPUTER READABLE STORAGE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 16.12.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.02.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.03.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.12.2022 | Refusal of application | published on 18.01.2023 [2023/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shenzhen Skyworth-RGB Electronic Co., Ltd. 13-16 F, Block A Skyworth Building Shennan Road Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2019/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
XU, Yaoling 13-16 F Block A Skyworth Building Shennan Road Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | 02 /
HONG, Wensheng 13-16 F Block A Skyworth Building Shennan Road Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2019/17] | Representative(s) | Osterhoff, Utz Bockermann Ksoll Griepenstroh Osterhoff Patentanwälte Bergstraße 159 44791 Bochum / DE | [2019/17] | Application number, filing date | 17917222.6 | 25.12.2017 | [2019/17] | WO2017CN118333 | Priority number, date | CN201710578657 | 14.07.2017 Original published format: CN201710578657 | [2019/17] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019010926 | Date: | 17.01.2019 | Language: | ZH | [2019/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3474555 | Date: | 24.04.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 17.01.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04N21/2668, H04N21/234, H04N21/472, H04N21/81, H04N21/239, H04N21/43, H04N21/431, H04N21/458, H04N21/462, H04N21/658, H04N21/858 | [2020/01] | CPC: |
H04N21/2393 (EP);
H04N21/2668 (CN,US);
H04N21/23424 (CN,US);
H04N21/23418 (EP);
H04N21/25825 (EP);
H04N21/43074 (EP,CN,US);
H04N21/4318 (EP);
H04N21/458 (EP,US);
H04N21/4622 (EP);
H04N21/472 (CN,US);
H04N21/47202 (EP,US);
H04N21/4755 (US);
|
Former IPC [2019/17] | H04N21/2668, H04N21/234, H04N21/472, H04N21/81 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/17] | Title | German: | PUSH-VERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG FÜR WERBUNG UND COMPUTERLESBARES SPEICHERMEDIUM | [2019/17] | English: | ADVERTISEMENT PUSH METHOD AND APPARATUS, AND COMPUTER READABLE STORAGE MEDIUM | [2019/17] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE PUSH (POUSSER) DE PUBLICITÉS, ET SUPPORT DE STOCKAGE LISIBLE PAR ORDINATEUR | [2019/17] | Entry into regional phase | 18.01.2019 | Translation filed | 18.01.2019 | National basic fee paid | 18.01.2019 | Search fee paid | 18.01.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.01.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.01.2019 | Examination requested [2019/17] | 25.03.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.06.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.08.2022 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 16.09.2022 | 02.09.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2023/03] | 12.09.2022 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2023/03] | 16.09.2022 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO2017101423 (LE HOLDINGS (BEIJING) CO LTD [CN], et al) [I] 1-15* the whole document * |