EP3653380 - SCREEN PRINTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.10.2022 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.10.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.07.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.04.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fuji Corporation 19, Chausuyama Yamamachi Chiryu-shi, Aichi 472-8686 / JP | [2020/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TORII, Atsushi c/o FUJI MACHINE MFG.CO. LTD. 19 Chausuyama Yamamachi Chiryu-Shi Aichi 472-8686 / JP | 02 /
FURUICHI, Akira c/o FUJI MACHINE MFG.CO. LTD. 19 Chausuyama Yamamachi Chiryu-Shi Aichi 472-8686 / JP | [2020/21] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2020/21] | Application number, filing date | 17917450.3 | 14.07.2017 | [2020/21] | WO2017JP25653 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019012681 | Date: | 17.01.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3653380 | Date: | 20.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3653380 | Date: | 01.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 17.01.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B41F15/08, B41M1/12, H05K3/00 | [2020/31] | CPC: |
B41F15/0881 (EP);
H05K3/1225 (US);
B41F15/18 (US);
B41F15/44 (US);
B41M1/12 (EP);
H05K3/0085 (US);
H05K3/1233 (EP);
B41P2215/50 (EP);
H05K2203/0139 (US);
H05K3/3485 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/21] | B41F15/08, B41M1/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SIEBDRUCKER | [2020/21] | English: | SCREEN PRINTER | [2020/21] | French: | MACHINE DE SÉRIGRAPHIE | [2020/21] | Entry into regional phase | 10.01.2019 | Translation filed | 10.01.2020 | National basic fee paid | 10.01.2020 | Search fee paid | 10.01.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.01.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.01.2020 | Examination requested [2020/21] | 18.01.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.07.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.10.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 21.10.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.10.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 02.09.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.07.2017 | AL | 01.12.2021 | AT | 01.12.2021 | CY | 01.12.2021 | CZ | 01.12.2021 | DK | 01.12.2021 | EE | 01.12.2021 | ES | 01.12.2021 | FI | 01.12.2021 | HR | 01.12.2021 | IT | 01.12.2021 | LT | 01.12.2021 | LV | 01.12.2021 | MC | 01.12.2021 | MK | 01.12.2021 | NL | 01.12.2021 | PL | 01.12.2021 | RO | 01.12.2021 | RS | 01.12.2021 | SE | 01.12.2021 | SI | 01.12.2021 | SK | 01.12.2021 | SM | 01.12.2021 | TR | 01.12.2021 | BG | 01.03.2022 | NO | 01.03.2022 | GR | 02.03.2022 | IS | 01.04.2022 | PT | 01.04.2022 | GB | 14.07.2022 | IE | 14.07.2022 | LU | 14.07.2022 | BE | 31.07.2022 | CH | 31.07.2022 | FR | 31.07.2022 | LI | 31.07.2022 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/24] | HU | 14.07.2017 | |
AL | 01.12.2021 | ||
AT | 01.12.2021 | ||
CY | 01.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 01.12.2021 | ||
DK | 01.12.2021 | ||
EE | 01.12.2021 | ||
ES | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
IT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
MC | 01.12.2021 | ||
MK | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RO | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
SI | 01.12.2021 | ||
SK | 01.12.2021 | ||
SM | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
IS | 01.04.2022 | ||
PT | 01.04.2022 | ||
GB | 14.07.2022 | ||
IE | 14.07.2022 | ||
LU | 14.07.2022 | ||
BE | 31.07.2022 | ||
CH | 31.07.2022 | ||
FR | 31.07.2022 | ||
LI | 31.07.2022 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AL | 01.12.2021 | |
AT | 01.12.2021 | ||
CY | 01.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 01.12.2021 | ||
DK | 01.12.2021 | ||
EE | 01.12.2021 | ||
ES | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
IT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
MC | 01.12.2021 | ||
MK | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RO | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
SI | 01.12.2021 | ||
SK | 01.12.2021 | ||
SM | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
IS | 01.04.2022 | ||
PT | 01.04.2022 | ||
GB | 14.07.2022 | ||
IE | 14.07.2022 | ||
LU | 14.07.2022 | ||
BE | 31.07.2022 | ||
CH | 31.07.2022 | ||
FR | 31.07.2022 | ||
LI | 31.07.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AL | 01.12.2021 | |
AT | 01.12.2021 | ||
CY | 01.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 01.12.2021 | ||
DK | 01.12.2021 | ||
EE | 01.12.2021 | ||
ES | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
IT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
MC | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RO | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
SI | 01.12.2021 | ||
SK | 01.12.2021 | ||
SM | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
IS | 01.04.2022 | ||
PT | 01.04.2022 | ||
GB | 14.07.2022 | ||
IE | 14.07.2022 | ||
LU | 14.07.2022 | ||
BE | 31.07.2022 | ||
CH | 31.07.2022 | ||
FR | 31.07.2022 | ||
LI | 31.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AL | 01.12.2021 | |
AT | 01.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 01.12.2021 | ||
DK | 01.12.2021 | ||
EE | 01.12.2021 | ||
ES | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
IT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
MC | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RO | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
SI | 01.12.2021 | ||
SK | 01.12.2021 | ||
SM | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
IS | 01.04.2022 | ||
PT | 01.04.2022 | ||
GB | 14.07.2022 | ||
IE | 14.07.2022 | ||
LU | 14.07.2022 | ||
BE | 31.07.2022 | ||
CH | 31.07.2022 | ||
FR | 31.07.2022 | ||
LI | 31.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/27] | AL | 01.12.2021 | |
AT | 01.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 01.12.2021 | ||
DK | 01.12.2021 | ||
EE | 01.12.2021 | ||
ES | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
IT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
MC | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RO | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
SI | 01.12.2021 | ||
SK | 01.12.2021 | ||
SM | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
IS | 01.04.2022 | ||
PT | 01.04.2022 | ||
GB | 14.07.2022 | ||
LU | 14.07.2022 | ||
BE | 31.07.2022 | ||
CH | 31.07.2022 | ||
FR | 31.07.2022 | ||
LI | 31.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 01.12.2021 | |
AT | 01.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 01.12.2021 | ||
DK | 01.12.2021 | ||
EE | 01.12.2021 | ||
ES | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
IT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
MC | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RO | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
SI | 01.12.2021 | ||
SK | 01.12.2021 | ||
SM | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
IS | 01.04.2022 | ||
PT | 01.04.2022 | ||
LU | 14.07.2022 | ||
BE | 31.07.2022 | ||
CH | 31.07.2022 | ||
FR | 31.07.2022 | ||
LI | 31.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AL | 01.12.2021 | |
AT | 01.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 01.12.2021 | ||
DK | 01.12.2021 | ||
EE | 01.12.2021 | ||
ES | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
MC | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RO | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
SI | 01.12.2021 | ||
SK | 01.12.2021 | ||
SM | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
IS | 01.04.2022 | ||
PT | 01.04.2022 | ||
LU | 14.07.2022 | ||
CH | 31.07.2022 | ||
FR | 31.07.2022 | ||
LI | 31.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | AL | 01.12.2021 | |
AT | 01.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 01.12.2021 | ||
DK | 01.12.2021 | ||
EE | 01.12.2021 | ||
ES | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
MC | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RO | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
SI | 01.12.2021 | ||
SK | 01.12.2021 | ||
SM | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
IS | 01.04.2022 | ||
PT | 01.04.2022 | ||
LU | 14.07.2022 | ||
CH | 31.07.2022 | ||
LI | 31.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | AL | 01.12.2021 | |
AT | 01.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 01.12.2021 | ||
DK | 01.12.2021 | ||
EE | 01.12.2021 | ||
ES | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
MC | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RO | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
SI | 01.12.2021 | ||
SK | 01.12.2021 | ||
SM | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
IS | 01.04.2022 | ||
PT | 01.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 01.12.2021 | |
AT | 01.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 01.12.2021 | ||
DK | 01.12.2021 | ||
EE | 01.12.2021 | ||
ES | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RO | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
SI | 01.12.2021 | ||
SK | 01.12.2021 | ||
SM | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
IS | 01.04.2022 | ||
PT | 01.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AL | 01.12.2021 | |
AT | 01.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 01.12.2021 | ||
DK | 01.12.2021 | ||
EE | 01.12.2021 | ||
ES | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RO | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
SK | 01.12.2021 | ||
SM | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
IS | 01.04.2022 | ||
PT | 01.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/46] | AT | 01.12.2021 | |
CZ | 01.12.2021 | ||
DK | 01.12.2021 | ||
EE | 01.12.2021 | ||
ES | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RO | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
SK | 01.12.2021 | ||
SM | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
IS | 01.04.2022 | ||
PT | 01.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/42] | AT | 01.12.2021 | |
CZ | 01.12.2021 | ||
EE | 01.12.2021 | ||
ES | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RO | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
SK | 01.12.2021 | ||
SM | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
IS | 01.04.2022 | ||
PT | 01.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AT | 01.12.2021 | |
CZ | 01.12.2021 | ||
EE | 01.12.2021 | ||
ES | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RO | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
SK | 01.12.2021 | ||
SM | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
PT | 01.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AT | 01.12.2021 | |
EE | 01.12.2021 | ||
ES | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RO | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
SM | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
PT | 01.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AT | 01.12.2021 | |
ES | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
SM | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/30] | AT | 01.12.2021 | |
ES | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AT | 01.12.2021 | |
ES | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 01.12.2021 | |
ES | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 01.12.2021 | |
ES | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/22] | AT | 01.12.2021 | |
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 01.12.2021 | |
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/19] | BG | 01.03.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US5553538 (FREITAG BRANDON R [US]) [X] 1 * figures 1,4 * * column 2, line 17 - column 3, line 35 *[I] 2,3; | [XI]JP2016086144 (FUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD) [X] 1,2 * figure 1 * * paragraphs [0035] - [0044] * [I] 3 | International search | [A]JPH05261892 (Sharp Corp.) [A] 1-3 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2004001555 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1-3 * , entire text; all drawings & US 2001/0017086 A1 & WO 1997/008655 A2 *; | [A]US2007051255 (CHAN FOONGYOW [MY], et al) [A] 1-3* , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *; | [X]JP2016086144 (FUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD) [X] 1-3 * , paragraphs [0043] to [0044]; fig. 3 (Family: none) * | by applicant | JP2003211631 |