EP3654325 - AMOLED PIXEL DRIVER CIRCUIT AND PIXEL DRIVING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.01.2023 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.02.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.10.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.04.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shenzhen China Star Optoelectronics Semiconductor Display Technology Co., Ltd. No. 9-2 Tangming Road Gongming Street Guangming New District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518132 / CN | [2020/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEN, Xiaolong Li, Manli No.9-2 Tangming Road Gongming Street Guangming New District Shenzhen Guangdong 518132 / CN | [2020/21] | Representative(s) | Petraz, Gilberto Luigi, et al GLP S.r.l. Viale Europa Unita, 171 33100 Udine / IT | [2020/21] | Application number, filing date | 17917748.0 | 29.08.2017 | [2020/21] | WO2017CN99386 | Priority number, date | CN201710560647 | 11.07.2017 Original published format: CN201710560647 | [2020/21] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019010766 | Date: | 17.01.2019 | Language: | ZH | [2019/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3654325 | Date: | 20.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3654325 | Date: | 09.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 17.01.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.02.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G09G3/3266, G09G3/3225 | [2021/11] | CPC: |
G09G3/3233 (EP,CN);
G09G3/3258 (KR);
G09G3/3266 (CN);
G09G3/3291 (CN);
H10K50/81 (KR);
H10K50/82 (KR);
H10K59/12 (KR);
G09G2300/0819 (EP);
G09G2300/0852 (EP);
G09G2300/0861 (EP);
G09G2300/0866 (EP);
G09G2310/0251 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2020/21] | G09G3/3266 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AMOLED-PIXELTREIBERSCHALTUNG UND PIXELANSTEUERUNGSVERFAHREN | [2020/21] | English: | AMOLED PIXEL DRIVER CIRCUIT AND PIXEL DRIVING METHOD | [2020/21] | French: | CIRCUIT DE PILOTAGE DE PIXEL AMOLED ET PROCÉDÉ DE PILOTAGE DE PIXEL | [2020/21] | Entry into regional phase | 04.02.2020 | Translation filed | 04.02.2020 | National basic fee paid | 04.02.2020 | Search fee paid | 04.02.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.02.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.02.2020 | Examination requested [2020/21] | 01.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.10.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.01.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 28.01.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.01.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 12.12.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.08.2017 | AL | 09.03.2022 | AT | 09.03.2022 | CY | 09.03.2022 | CZ | 09.03.2022 | DK | 09.03.2022 | EE | 09.03.2022 | ES | 09.03.2022 | FI | 09.03.2022 | HR | 09.03.2022 | IT | 09.03.2022 | LT | 09.03.2022 | LV | 09.03.2022 | MC | 09.03.2022 | MK | 09.03.2022 | NL | 09.03.2022 | RO | 09.03.2022 | RS | 09.03.2022 | SE | 09.03.2022 | SI | 09.03.2022 | SK | 09.03.2022 | SM | 09.03.2022 | TR | 09.03.2022 | BG | 09.06.2022 | NO | 09.06.2022 | GR | 10.06.2022 | IS | 09.07.2022 | PT | 11.07.2022 | IE | 29.08.2022 | LU | 29.08.2022 | BE | 31.08.2022 | CH | 31.08.2022 | LI | 31.08.2022 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/27] | HU | 29.08.2017 | |
AL | 09.03.2022 | ||
AT | 09.03.2022 | ||
CY | 09.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2022 | ||
DK | 09.03.2022 | ||
EE | 09.03.2022 | ||
ES | 09.03.2022 | ||
FI | 09.03.2022 | ||
HR | 09.03.2022 | ||
IT | 09.03.2022 | ||
LT | 09.03.2022 | ||
LV | 09.03.2022 | ||
MC | 09.03.2022 | ||
MK | 09.03.2022 | ||
NL | 09.03.2022 | ||
RO | 09.03.2022 | ||
RS | 09.03.2022 | ||
SE | 09.03.2022 | ||
SI | 09.03.2022 | ||
SK | 09.03.2022 | ||
SM | 09.03.2022 | ||
BG | 09.06.2022 | ||
NO | 09.06.2022 | ||
GR | 10.06.2022 | ||
IS | 09.07.2022 | ||
PT | 11.07.2022 | ||
IE | 29.08.2022 | ||
LU | 29.08.2022 | ||
BE | 31.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
Former [2024/24] | HU | 29.08.2017 | |
AL | 09.03.2022 | ||
AT | 09.03.2022 | ||
CY | 09.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2022 | ||
DK | 09.03.2022 | ||
EE | 09.03.2022 | ||
ES | 09.03.2022 | ||
FI | 09.03.2022 | ||
HR | 09.03.2022 | ||
IT | 09.03.2022 | ||
LT | 09.03.2022 | ||
LV | 09.03.2022 | ||
MC | 09.03.2022 | ||
NL | 09.03.2022 | ||
RO | 09.03.2022 | ||
RS | 09.03.2022 | ||
SE | 09.03.2022 | ||
SI | 09.03.2022 | ||
SK | 09.03.2022 | ||
SM | 09.03.2022 | ||
BG | 09.06.2022 | ||
NO | 09.06.2022 | ||
GR | 10.06.2022 | ||
IS | 09.07.2022 | ||
PT | 11.07.2022 | ||
IE | 29.08.2022 | ||
LU | 29.08.2022 | ||
BE | 31.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | AL | 09.03.2022 | |
AT | 09.03.2022 | ||
CY | 09.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2022 | ||
DK | 09.03.2022 | ||
EE | 09.03.2022 | ||
ES | 09.03.2022 | ||
FI | 09.03.2022 | ||
HR | 09.03.2022 | ||
IT | 09.03.2022 | ||
LT | 09.03.2022 | ||
LV | 09.03.2022 | ||
MC | 09.03.2022 | ||
NL | 09.03.2022 | ||
RO | 09.03.2022 | ||
RS | 09.03.2022 | ||
SE | 09.03.2022 | ||
SI | 09.03.2022 | ||
SK | 09.03.2022 | ||
SM | 09.03.2022 | ||
BG | 09.06.2022 | ||
NO | 09.06.2022 | ||
GR | 10.06.2022 | ||
IS | 09.07.2022 | ||
PT | 11.07.2022 | ||
IE | 29.08.2022 | ||
LU | 29.08.2022 | ||
BE | 31.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/42] | AL | 09.03.2022 | |
AT | 09.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2022 | ||
DK | 09.03.2022 | ||
EE | 09.03.2022 | ||
ES | 09.03.2022 | ||
FI | 09.03.2022 | ||
HR | 09.03.2022 | ||
IT | 09.03.2022 | ||
LT | 09.03.2022 | ||
LV | 09.03.2022 | ||
MC | 09.03.2022 | ||
NL | 09.03.2022 | ||
RO | 09.03.2022 | ||
RS | 09.03.2022 | ||
SE | 09.03.2022 | ||
SI | 09.03.2022 | ||
SK | 09.03.2022 | ||
SM | 09.03.2022 | ||
BG | 09.06.2022 | ||
NO | 09.06.2022 | ||
GR | 10.06.2022 | ||
IS | 09.07.2022 | ||
PT | 11.07.2022 | ||
IE | 29.08.2022 | ||
LU | 29.08.2022 | ||
BE | 31.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AL | 09.03.2022 | |
AT | 09.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2022 | ||
DK | 09.03.2022 | ||
EE | 09.03.2022 | ||
ES | 09.03.2022 | ||
FI | 09.03.2022 | ||
HR | 09.03.2022 | ||
IT | 09.03.2022 | ||
LT | 09.03.2022 | ||
LV | 09.03.2022 | ||
MC | 09.03.2022 | ||
NL | 09.03.2022 | ||
RO | 09.03.2022 | ||
RS | 09.03.2022 | ||
SE | 09.03.2022 | ||
SI | 09.03.2022 | ||
SK | 09.03.2022 | ||
SM | 09.03.2022 | ||
BG | 09.06.2022 | ||
NO | 09.06.2022 | ||
GR | 10.06.2022 | ||
IS | 09.07.2022 | ||
PT | 11.07.2022 | ||
IE | 29.08.2022 | ||
LU | 29.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AL | 09.03.2022 | |
AT | 09.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2022 | ||
DK | 09.03.2022 | ||
EE | 09.03.2022 | ||
ES | 09.03.2022 | ||
FI | 09.03.2022 | ||
HR | 09.03.2022 | ||
LT | 09.03.2022 | ||
LV | 09.03.2022 | ||
MC | 09.03.2022 | ||
NL | 09.03.2022 | ||
RO | 09.03.2022 | ||
RS | 09.03.2022 | ||
SE | 09.03.2022 | ||
SI | 09.03.2022 | ||
SK | 09.03.2022 | ||
SM | 09.03.2022 | ||
BG | 09.06.2022 | ||
NO | 09.06.2022 | ||
GR | 10.06.2022 | ||
IS | 09.07.2022 | ||
PT | 11.07.2022 | ||
IE | 29.08.2022 | ||
LU | 29.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | AL | 09.03.2022 | |
AT | 09.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2022 | ||
DK | 09.03.2022 | ||
EE | 09.03.2022 | ||
ES | 09.03.2022 | ||
FI | 09.03.2022 | ||
HR | 09.03.2022 | ||
LT | 09.03.2022 | ||
LV | 09.03.2022 | ||
MC | 09.03.2022 | ||
NL | 09.03.2022 | ||
RO | 09.03.2022 | ||
RS | 09.03.2022 | ||
SE | 09.03.2022 | ||
SI | 09.03.2022 | ||
SK | 09.03.2022 | ||
SM | 09.03.2022 | ||
BG | 09.06.2022 | ||
NO | 09.06.2022 | ||
GR | 10.06.2022 | ||
IS | 09.07.2022 | ||
PT | 11.07.2022 | ||
LU | 29.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/16] | AL | 09.03.2022 | |
AT | 09.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2022 | ||
DK | 09.03.2022 | ||
EE | 09.03.2022 | ||
ES | 09.03.2022 | ||
FI | 09.03.2022 | ||
HR | 09.03.2022 | ||
LT | 09.03.2022 | ||
LV | 09.03.2022 | ||
MC | 09.03.2022 | ||
NL | 09.03.2022 | ||
RO | 09.03.2022 | ||
RS | 09.03.2022 | ||
SE | 09.03.2022 | ||
SI | 09.03.2022 | ||
SK | 09.03.2022 | ||
SM | 09.03.2022 | ||
BG | 09.06.2022 | ||
NO | 09.06.2022 | ||
GR | 10.06.2022 | ||
IS | 09.07.2022 | ||
PT | 11.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 09.03.2022 | |
AT | 09.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2022 | ||
DK | 09.03.2022 | ||
EE | 09.03.2022 | ||
ES | 09.03.2022 | ||
FI | 09.03.2022 | ||
HR | 09.03.2022 | ||
LT | 09.03.2022 | ||
LV | 09.03.2022 | ||
NL | 09.03.2022 | ||
RO | 09.03.2022 | ||
RS | 09.03.2022 | ||
SE | 09.03.2022 | ||
SI | 09.03.2022 | ||
SK | 09.03.2022 | ||
SM | 09.03.2022 | ||
BG | 09.06.2022 | ||
NO | 09.06.2022 | ||
GR | 10.06.2022 | ||
IS | 09.07.2022 | ||
PT | 11.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | AL | 09.03.2022 | |
AT | 09.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2022 | ||
DK | 09.03.2022 | ||
EE | 09.03.2022 | ||
ES | 09.03.2022 | ||
FI | 09.03.2022 | ||
HR | 09.03.2022 | ||
LT | 09.03.2022 | ||
LV | 09.03.2022 | ||
NL | 09.03.2022 | ||
RO | 09.03.2022 | ||
RS | 09.03.2022 | ||
SE | 09.03.2022 | ||
SK | 09.03.2022 | ||
SM | 09.03.2022 | ||
BG | 09.06.2022 | ||
NO | 09.06.2022 | ||
GR | 10.06.2022 | ||
IS | 09.07.2022 | ||
PT | 11.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 09.03.2022 | |
AT | 09.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2022 | ||
EE | 09.03.2022 | ||
ES | 09.03.2022 | ||
FI | 09.03.2022 | ||
HR | 09.03.2022 | ||
LT | 09.03.2022 | ||
LV | 09.03.2022 | ||
NL | 09.03.2022 | ||
RO | 09.03.2022 | ||
RS | 09.03.2022 | ||
SE | 09.03.2022 | ||
SK | 09.03.2022 | ||
SM | 09.03.2022 | ||
BG | 09.06.2022 | ||
NO | 09.06.2022 | ||
GR | 10.06.2022 | ||
IS | 09.07.2022 | ||
PT | 11.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/51] | AT | 09.03.2022 | |
CZ | 09.03.2022 | ||
EE | 09.03.2022 | ||
ES | 09.03.2022 | ||
FI | 09.03.2022 | ||
HR | 09.03.2022 | ||
LT | 09.03.2022 | ||
LV | 09.03.2022 | ||
NL | 09.03.2022 | ||
RO | 09.03.2022 | ||
RS | 09.03.2022 | ||
SE | 09.03.2022 | ||
SK | 09.03.2022 | ||
SM | 09.03.2022 | ||
BG | 09.06.2022 | ||
NO | 09.06.2022 | ||
GR | 10.06.2022 | ||
IS | 09.07.2022 | ||
PT | 11.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 09.03.2022 | |
CZ | 09.03.2022 | ||
EE | 09.03.2022 | ||
ES | 09.03.2022 | ||
FI | 09.03.2022 | ||
HR | 09.03.2022 | ||
LT | 09.03.2022 | ||
LV | 09.03.2022 | ||
NL | 09.03.2022 | ||
RO | 09.03.2022 | ||
RS | 09.03.2022 | ||
SE | 09.03.2022 | ||
SK | 09.03.2022 | ||
SM | 09.03.2022 | ||
BG | 09.06.2022 | ||
NO | 09.06.2022 | ||
GR | 10.06.2022 | ||
PT | 11.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AT | 09.03.2022 | |
CZ | 09.03.2022 | ||
EE | 09.03.2022 | ||
ES | 09.03.2022 | ||
FI | 09.03.2022 | ||
HR | 09.03.2022 | ||
LT | 09.03.2022 | ||
LV | 09.03.2022 | ||
NL | 09.03.2022 | ||
RO | 09.03.2022 | ||
RS | 09.03.2022 | ||
SE | 09.03.2022 | ||
SM | 09.03.2022 | ||
BG | 09.06.2022 | ||
NO | 09.06.2022 | ||
GR | 10.06.2022 | ||
PT | 11.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 09.03.2022 | |
ES | 09.03.2022 | ||
FI | 09.03.2022 | ||
HR | 09.03.2022 | ||
LT | 09.03.2022 | ||
LV | 09.03.2022 | ||
NL | 09.03.2022 | ||
RO | 09.03.2022 | ||
RS | 09.03.2022 | ||
SE | 09.03.2022 | ||
SM | 09.03.2022 | ||
BG | 09.06.2022 | ||
NO | 09.06.2022 | ||
GR | 10.06.2022 | ||
PT | 11.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/44] | FI | 09.03.2022 | |
HR | 09.03.2022 | ||
LT | 09.03.2022 | ||
LV | 09.03.2022 | ||
NL | 09.03.2022 | ||
RS | 09.03.2022 | ||
SE | 09.03.2022 | ||
BG | 09.06.2022 | ||
NO | 09.06.2022 | ||
GR | 10.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/39] | FI | 09.03.2022 | |
HR | 09.03.2022 | ||
LT | 09.03.2022 | ||
LV | 09.03.2022 | ||
RS | 09.03.2022 | ||
SE | 09.03.2022 | ||
BG | 09.06.2022 | ||
NO | 09.06.2022 | ||
GR | 10.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | HR | 09.03.2022 | |
LT | 09.03.2022 | ||
LV | 09.03.2022 | ||
RS | 09.03.2022 | ||
SE | 09.03.2022 | ||
BG | 09.06.2022 | ||
NO | 09.06.2022 | ||
GR | 10.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | HR | 09.03.2022 | |
LT | 09.03.2022 | ||
RS | 09.03.2022 | ||
SE | 09.03.2022 | ||
BG | 09.06.2022 | ||
NO | 09.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | LT | 09.03.2022 | |
NO | 09.06.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2009051628 (KWON OH-KYONG [KR]) [A] 1-14 * figures 8A-8F * * paragraph [0108] - paragraph [0165] *; | [A]US2016365030 (WU XIAOLING [CN]) [A] 1-14 * figures 3-7 ** paragraph [0079] - paragraph [0099] *; | [A]CN106448557 (SHENZHEN CHINA STAR OPTOELECT) [A] 1-14 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US2013194248 (KIM TAE-JIN [KR])[A] 1-19; | [A]CN104064149 (SHENZHEN CHINA STAR OPTOELECT) [A] 1-19; | [A]CN104200779 (SHANGHAI TIANMA ORGANIC LIGHT EMITTING DISPLAY TECHNOLOGY CO LTD, et al) [A] 1-19; | [A]CN104361857 (SHENZHEN CHINA STAR OPTOELECT) [A] 1-19; | [A]CN106531076 (BOE TECHNOLOGY GROUP CO LTD) [A] 1-19; | [A]CN106887210 (SHENZHEN CHINA STAR OPTOELECT) [A] 1-19 |