EP3657491 - DC VOLTAGE CONVERSION CIRCUIT, DC VOLTAGE CONVERSION METHOD AND LIQUID CRYSTAL DISPLAY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.10.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.09.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.04.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.10.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.11.2023 [2023/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shenzhen China Star Optoelectronics Semiconductor Display Technology Co., Ltd. No. 9-2 Tangming Road Gongming Street Guangming New District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518132 / CN | [2020/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Wenfang No. 9-2 Tangming Road Gongming Street Guangming New District Shenzhen Guangdong 518132 / CN | 02 /
CAO, Dan No. 9-2 Tangming Road Gongming Street Guangming New District Shenzhen Guangdong 518132 / CN | [2020/22] | Representative(s) | Zinkler, Franz, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler Zinkler, Schenk & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Radlkoferstrasse 2 81373 München / DE | [2020/22] | Application number, filing date | 17918457.7 | 04.12.2017 | [2020/22] | WO2017CN114389 | Priority number, date | CN201710592619 | 19.07.2017 Original published format: CN201710592619 | [2020/22] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019015215 | Date: | 24.01.2019 | Language: | ZH | [2019/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3657491 | Date: | 27.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 24.01.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G09G3/36, H02M3/156, // H02M3/158, H02M1/00, H02M3/07 | [2021/16] | CPC: |
H02M3/156 (EP);
G09G3/3696 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H02M3/07 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G09G2320/0204 (US);
G09G2330/028 (EP);
H02M1/0032 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2020/22] | G09G3/36 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/22] | Title | German: | GLEICHSPANNUNGSWANDLERSCHALTUNG, GLEICHSPANNUNGSWANDLUNGSVERFAHREN UND FLÜSSIGKRISTALLANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG | [2020/22] | English: | DC VOLTAGE CONVERSION CIRCUIT, DC VOLTAGE CONVERSION METHOD AND LIQUID CRYSTAL DISPLAY DEVICE | [2020/22] | French: | CIRCUIT DE CONVERSION DE TENSION CONTINUE, PROCÉDÉ DE CONVERSION DE TENSION CONTINUE ET DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE À CRISTAUX LIQUIDES | [2020/22] | Entry into regional phase | 17.02.2020 | Translation filed | 17.02.2020 | National basic fee paid | 17.02.2020 | Search fee paid | 17.02.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.02.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.02.2020 | Examination requested [2020/22] | 01.10.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.09.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.12.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 14.12.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.12.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 01.07.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/48] | 21.07.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2023/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2022 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2008150856 (NAM HYUN-WOO [KR]) [A] 1-8* figures 1, 5-8 *; | [I] - Maxim Integrated Products, "TFT-LCD Power-Supply Controllers", (20031001), pages 1 - 28, URL: https://www.yic-electronics.nl/datasheet/29/1060043078.pdf, (20210310), XP055784315 [I] 1-8 * figures 1-5 * | [I] - Texas Instruments Incorporated, "TI Designs Bipolar TFT LCD Supply Using TPS65131-Q1 and Charge Pumps", Dallas, Texas, (20150501), pages 1 - 11, URL: https://www.ti.com/lit/ug/tidu978/tidu978.pdf?ts=1615372600168&ref_url=https%253A%252F%252Fwww.google.com%252F, (20210310), XP055784351 [I] 1-8 * Chapters 2 and 2.6;; figure 1 * | [I] - Texas Instruments Incorporated, "TPS65131-Q1 Positive-and Negative-Output DC-DC Converter", (20170301), pages 1 - 35, URL: https://www.ti.com/lit/ds/symlink/tps65131-q1.pdf?ts=1615369176303&ref_url=https%253A%252F%252Fwww.ti.com%252Fproduct%252FTPS65131-Q1, (20210310), XP055784354 [I] 1-8 * Chapter 8.2 * |