EP3493390 - MOTOR CONTROL DEVICE AND ELECTRIC POWER STEERING DEVICE EQUIPPED WITH SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.04.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.07.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.05.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.03.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 28.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.04.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.05.2021 [2021/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NSK Ltd. 1-6-3, Ohsaki Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-8560 / JP | [2019/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
URYU, Kyosho c/o NSK LTD. 1-6-3 Ohsaki Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-8560 / JP | [2019/23] | Representative(s) | Luten, Martin Haaije, et al Arnold & Siedsma Bezuidenhoutseweg 57 2594 AC The Hague / NL | [2019/23] | Application number, filing date | 17918689.5 | 07.09.2017 | [2019/23] | WO2017JP32334 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019049284 | Date: | 14.03.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3493390 | Date: | 05.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 14.03.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H02M7/48, H02M7/00, H02P3/00, H05K7/20, H02K11/33 | [2019/50] | CPC: |
H02M7/003 (EP,US);
H02K11/225 (EP,US);
H02K11/24 (EP,US);
H02K11/25 (EP,US);
H02K11/33 (EP,US);
H02M7/48 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2019/23] | H02M7/48 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/23] | Title | German: | MOTORSTEUERUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND DAMIT AUSGESTATTETE ELEKTRISCHE SERVOLENKVORRICHTUNG | [2019/23] | English: | MOTOR CONTROL DEVICE AND ELECTRIC POWER STEERING DEVICE EQUIPPED WITH SAME | [2019/23] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE DE MOTEUR ET DISPOSITIF DE DIRECTION À ASSISTANCE ÉLECTRIQUE ÉQUIPÉ DUDIT DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE | [2019/23] | Entry into regional phase | 28.01.2019 | Translation filed | 28.01.2019 | National basic fee paid | 28.01.2019 | Search fee paid | 28.01.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.01.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.01.2019 | Examination requested [2019/23] | 27.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.12.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/20] | 14.01.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2020 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2010119298 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 1 * figures 1,2,3 *; | [A]EP2618464 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1 * figures 9,10 *; | [A]JP2017051047 (CALSONIC KANSEI CORP) [A] 1* figure 1 *; | [A]EP3148071 (NSK LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * figure 5 *; | [A]WO2017139872 (TM4 INC [CA]) [A] 1 * figure 1 *; | [E]JP2017163774 (NSK LTD) [E] 1 * figure 1 * | International search | [A]JP2002076868 (IBM) [A] 1-8 * , entire text, all drawings & US 2002/0021539 A1, entire text, all drawings *; | [A]US2005194635 (PFIRSCH FRANK [DE]) [A] 1-8* , entire text, all drawings & DE 10361714 A1 *; | [A]JP2017051047 (CALSONIC KANSEI CORP) [A] 1-8 * , entire text, all drawings (Family: none) * | by applicant | JP3889562B | JP2013062269 | JP2013187322 |