Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Legal status: EP3634728

Designated contracting statesAL 
AT 
BE 
BG 
CH 
CY 
CZ 
DE 
DK 
EE 
ES 
FI 
FR 
GB 
GR 
HR 
HU 
IE 
IS 
IT 
LI 
LT 
LU 
LV 
MC 
MK 
MT 
NL 
NO 
PL 
PT 
RO 
RS 
SE 
SI 
SK 
SM 
TR 
Examination procedure06.08.2024Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2024/49]
Entry into regional phase09.12.2019National basic fee paid 
09.12.2019Search fee paid 
09.12.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
09.12.2019Examination fee paid 
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.12.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
22.07.2020Renewal fee patent year 04
20.07.2021Renewal fee patent year 05
21.07.2022Renewal fee patent year 06
20.07.2023Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.202408   M06   Not yet paid
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:15.04.2020 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20191209
 
Event date:15.04.2020 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT
Validation States:BA ME
 
Event date:15.04.2020 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR
 
Event date:04.11.2020 
Event description:REQUEST FOR VALIDATION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (DELETED)
 
Event date:04.11.2020 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (DELETED)
 
Event date:06.01.2021 
Event description:SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT DRAWN UP AND DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20201209
 
Event date:06.01.2021 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:B33Y 30/00 20150101ALI20201203BHEP
 
Event date:06.01.2021 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:B29C 64/259 20170101ALI20201203BHEP
 
Event date:06.01.2021 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:B29C 64/165 20170101ALI20201203BHEP
 
Event date:06.01.2021 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:B33Y 40/00 20200101ALN20201203BHEP
 
Event date:06.01.2021 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:B29C 64/153 20170101ALI20201203BHEP
 
Event date:06.01.2021 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:B29C 64/357 20170101AFI20201203BHEP
 
Event date:06.01.2021 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:B29C 64/321 20170101ALN20201203BHEP
 
Event date:13.03.2020 
Event description:PUBLIC REFERENCE MADE UNDER ARTICLE 153(3) EPC TO A PUBLISHED INTERNATIONAL APPLICATION THAT HAS ENTERED THE EUROPEAN PHASE
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: 0009012
 
Event date:13.03.2020 
Event description:INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT
Free Format Text:STATUS: REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION WAS MADE
 
Event date:02.02.2019 
Event description:INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT
Free Format Text:STATUS: THE INTERNATIONAL PUBLICATION HAS BEEN MADE
 
Event date:13.07.2023 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R079
Code Expl.: AMENDMENT OF IPC MAIN CLASS
Free Format Text:PREVIOUS MAIN CLASS: B29C0064321000
IPC CLASSIFICATION:B29C0064357000
 
Event date:16.08.2023 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:B29C 64/357 20170101AFI20230713BHEP
 
Event date:16.08.2023 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:B29C 64/153 20170101ALI20230713BHEP
 
Event date:16.08.2023 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:B29C 64/165 20170101ALI20230713BHEP
 
Event date:16.08.2023 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:B33Y 30/00 20150101ALI20230713BHEP
 
Event date:16.08.2023 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:B29C 64/259 20170101ALI20230713BHEP
 
Event date:16.08.2023 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:B33Y 40/00 20200101ALI20230713BHEP
 
Event date:16.08.2023 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:B33Y 40/20 20200101ALI20230713BHEP
 
Event date:16.08.2023 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:B29C 64/321 20170101ALN20230713BHEP
 
Event date:14.03.2024 
Event description:INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT
Free Format Text:STATUS: EXAMINATION IS IN PROGRESS
 
Event date:17.04.2024 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20240313
 
Event date:01.11.2024 
Event description:INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT
Free Format Text:STATUS: THE APPLICATION IS DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN
 
Event date:04.12.2024 
Event description:APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN
Effective DATE:20240716