EP3657891 - DATA TRANSMISSION METHOD AND APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.12.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.04.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2020/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHAO, Yue Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
NAN, Fang Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
YU, Zheng Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 04 /
CHENG, Xingqing Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2020/22] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2020/22] | Application number, filing date | 17919059.0 | 28.07.2017 | [2020/22] | WO2017CN95072 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019019200 | Date: | 31.01.2019 | Language: | ZH | [2019/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3657891 | Date: | 27.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 31.01.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04W74/08 | [2020/22] | CPC: |
H04W74/0833 (EP,KR,US);
H04W72/1268 (US);
H04W74/002 (KR);
H04W80/02 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/22] | Title | German: | DATENÜBERTRAGUNGSVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG | [2020/22] | English: | DATA TRANSMISSION METHOD AND APPARATUS | [2020/22] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE TRANSMISSION DE DONNÉES | [2020/22] | Entry into regional phase | 17.02.2020 | Translation filed | 17.02.2020 | National basic fee paid | 17.02.2020 | Search fee paid | 17.02.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.02.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.02.2020 | Examination requested [2020/22] | 05.01.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.01.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.05.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.07.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.10.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]CN106961746 (ZTE CORP) [Y] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [E]WO2018185654 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [E] 1-13* page 7 line 16-page 8 line 18, page 14 lines 5-15, figs 2a, 2b, 7-9, 13-16 *; | EP3404989 [ ] (ZTE CORP [CN]) [ ] * paragraphs [0080] , [0 81] , [0 91] , [0 93] , [0 94] , [0 96] , [ 105] *; | [E]WO2018212699 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [E] 1-13 * pages 7-8, 16, 41-42, figs 14, 16, 18, 19;; figure 16 *; | [E]EP3611947 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [E] 1-13 * paragraphs 273- 278, figs 11-14 *; | [Y] - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Radio Access Network; Evolved Universal Terrestrial Radio Access (E-UTRA); Medium Access Control (MAC) protocol specification (Release 14)", 3GPP STANDARD ; TECHNICAL SPECIFICATION ; 3GPP TS 36.321, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20170623), vol. RAN WG2, no. V14.3.0, pages 1 - 107, XP051299019 [Y] 1-13 * section 6.1.5 * | International search | [X]CN106961746 (ZTE CORP) [X] 1-4, 13-17, 26-28; | [A]CN102158981 (ZTE CORP) [A] 1-28; | [A]CN103081379 (LG ELECTRONICS INC) [A] 1-28; | [A]CN102970761 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-28; | [A]WO2016144082 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 1-28 |