Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2024181946 | Global Dossier | 06.06.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201715855132 | 27.12.2017 | US202016934114 | 21.07.2020 | US202318115038 | 28.02.2023 | JP2017147693 | 31.07.2017 | US202418443491 | 16.02.2024 | US202217689094 | 08.03.2022 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11938852 | Global Dossier | 26.03.2024 | B2 | US2023202365 | 29.06.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201715855132 | 27.12.2017 | US202016934114 | 21.07.2020 | US202318115038 | 28.02.2023 | JP2017147693 | 31.07.2017 | US202217689094 | 08.03.2022 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11628756 | Global Dossier | 18.04.2023 | B2 | US2022185156 | 16.06.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201715855132 | 27.12.2017 | US202016934114 | 21.07.2020 | JP2017147693 | 31.07.2017 | US202217689094 | 08.03.2022 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11299077 | Global Dossier | 12.04.2022 | B2 | US2020346568 | 05.11.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201715855132 | 27.12.2017 | US202016934114 | 21.07.2020 | JP2017147693 | 31.07.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4151464 | Global Dossier | 22.03.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP17919753 | 05.12.2017 | WO2017JP43543 | 05.12.2017 | JP2017147693 | 31.07.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN111497691B | Global Dossier | 09.05.2023 | B | CN111497691 | 07.08.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2017JP43543 | 05.12.2017 | JP2017147693 | 31.07.2017 | CN201780050272 | 05.12.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN111016743B | Global Dossier | 09.05.2023 | B | CN111016743 | 17.04.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2017JP43543 | 05.12.2017 | JP2017147693 | 31.07.2017 | CN201780050272 | 05.12.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN109641545B | Global Dossier | 17.04.2020 | B | CN109641545 | 16.04.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2017JP43543 | 05.12.2017 | JP2017147693 | 31.07.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3663129 | Global Dossier | 21.12.2022 | B1 | EP3663129 | 28.04.2021 | A4 | EP3663129 | 10.06.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2017JP43543 | 05.12.2017 | JP2017147693 | 31.07.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112020000455 | 24.01.2023 | B1 | BR112020000455 | 21.07.2020 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2017JP43543 | 05.12.2017 | JP2017147693 | 31.07.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2019009394 | 23.09.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2017JP43543 | 05.12.2017 | JP2017147693 | 31.07.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MY198183 | 09.08.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2017JP43543 | 05.12.2017 | JP2017147693 | 31.07.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2019026305 | Global Dossier | 07.02.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2017147693 | 31.07.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10752144 | Global Dossier | 25.08.2020 | B2 | US2019031065 | 31.01.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2017147693 | 31.07.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2019026081 | Global Dossier | 21.02.2019 | A | JP6356882B | 11.07.2018 | B1 | Priority number | Date | JP2017147693 | 31.07.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2021008770 | 24.08.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2017147693 | 31.07.2017 | Type | Divisional application | EP4151464 |