EP3657884 - SERVICE DATA TRANSMISSION METHOD AND APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2020/22] | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR TRANSMITTING SERVICE DATA | ||
[2021/45] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.02.2023 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.03.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.11.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.04.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2020/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Hejun Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
LI, Mingchao Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
YU, Yinghui Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 04 /
CAO, Zhenzhen Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 05 /
LIU, Hang Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2020/22] | Representative(s) | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Schloßschmidstraße 5 80639 München / DE | [2020/22] | Application number, filing date | 17920936.6 | 08.08.2017 | [2020/22] | WO2017CN96360 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019028649 | Date: | 14.02.2019 | Language: | ZH | [2019/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3657884 | Date: | 27.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3657884 | Date: | 13.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 14.02.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/02, // H04W72/06 | [2020/29] | CPC: |
H04W72/02 (EP,US);
H04L43/0852 (US);
H04L5/0048 (US);
H04L5/0053 (US);
H04W72/51 (US);
H04W72/53 (US);
|
Former IPC [2020/22] | H04W72/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/22] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ÜBERTRAGUNG VON DIENSTDATEN | [2020/22] | English: | SERVICE DATA TRANSMISSION METHOD AND APPARATUS | [2021/45] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE TRANSMISSION DE DONNÉES DE SERVICE | [2020/22] |
Former [2020/22] | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR TRANSMITTING SERVICE DATA | Entry into regional phase | 18.02.2020 | Translation filed | 18.02.2020 | National basic fee paid | 18.02.2020 | Search fee paid | 18.02.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.02.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.02.2020 | Examination requested [2020/22] | 12.10.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.11.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.02.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 17.02.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.02.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 16.01.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.08.2017 | AL | 13.04.2022 | AT | 13.04.2022 | CY | 13.04.2022 | CZ | 13.04.2022 | DK | 13.04.2022 | EE | 13.04.2022 | ES | 13.04.2022 | FI | 13.04.2022 | HR | 13.04.2022 | IT | 13.04.2022 | LT | 13.04.2022 | LV | 13.04.2022 | MC | 13.04.2022 | MK | 13.04.2022 | NL | 13.04.2022 | PL | 13.04.2022 | RO | 13.04.2022 | RS | 13.04.2022 | SE | 13.04.2022 | SI | 13.04.2022 | SK | 13.04.2022 | SM | 13.04.2022 | BG | 13.07.2022 | NO | 13.07.2022 | GR | 14.07.2022 | GB | 08.08.2022 | IE | 08.08.2022 | LU | 08.08.2022 | IS | 13.08.2022 | PT | 16.08.2022 | BE | 31.08.2022 | CH | 31.08.2022 | FR | 31.08.2022 | LI | 31.08.2022 | [2024/27] |
Former [2024/24] | HU | 08.08.2017 | |
AL | 13.04.2022 | ||
AT | 13.04.2022 | ||
CY | 13.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2022 | ||
DK | 13.04.2022 | ||
EE | 13.04.2022 | ||
ES | 13.04.2022 | ||
FI | 13.04.2022 | ||
HR | 13.04.2022 | ||
IT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LV | 13.04.2022 | ||
MC | 13.04.2022 | ||
NL | 13.04.2022 | ||
PL | 13.04.2022 | ||
RO | 13.04.2022 | ||
RS | 13.04.2022 | ||
SE | 13.04.2022 | ||
SI | 13.04.2022 | ||
SK | 13.04.2022 | ||
SM | 13.04.2022 | ||
BG | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.07.2022 | ||
GR | 14.07.2022 | ||
GB | 08.08.2022 | ||
IE | 08.08.2022 | ||
LU | 08.08.2022 | ||
IS | 13.08.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
BE | 31.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
FR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AL | 13.04.2022 | |
AT | 13.04.2022 | ||
CY | 13.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2022 | ||
DK | 13.04.2022 | ||
EE | 13.04.2022 | ||
ES | 13.04.2022 | ||
FI | 13.04.2022 | ||
HR | 13.04.2022 | ||
IT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LV | 13.04.2022 | ||
MC | 13.04.2022 | ||
NL | 13.04.2022 | ||
PL | 13.04.2022 | ||
RO | 13.04.2022 | ||
RS | 13.04.2022 | ||
SE | 13.04.2022 | ||
SI | 13.04.2022 | ||
SK | 13.04.2022 | ||
SM | 13.04.2022 | ||
BG | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.07.2022 | ||
GR | 14.07.2022 | ||
GB | 08.08.2022 | ||
IE | 08.08.2022 | ||
LU | 08.08.2022 | ||
IS | 13.08.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
BE | 31.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
FR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
Former [2024/11] | AL | 13.04.2022 | |
AT | 13.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2022 | ||
DK | 13.04.2022 | ||
EE | 13.04.2022 | ||
ES | 13.04.2022 | ||
FI | 13.04.2022 | ||
HR | 13.04.2022 | ||
IT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LV | 13.04.2022 | ||
MC | 13.04.2022 | ||
NL | 13.04.2022 | ||
PL | 13.04.2022 | ||
RO | 13.04.2022 | ||
RS | 13.04.2022 | ||
SE | 13.04.2022 | ||
SI | 13.04.2022 | ||
SK | 13.04.2022 | ||
SM | 13.04.2022 | ||
BG | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.07.2022 | ||
GR | 14.07.2022 | ||
GB | 08.08.2022 | ||
IE | 08.08.2022 | ||
LU | 08.08.2022 | ||
IS | 13.08.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
BE | 31.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
FR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/47] | AL | 13.04.2022 | |
AT | 13.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2022 | ||
DK | 13.04.2022 | ||
EE | 13.04.2022 | ||
ES | 13.04.2022 | ||
FI | 13.04.2022 | ||
HR | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LV | 13.04.2022 | ||
MC | 13.04.2022 | ||
NL | 13.04.2022 | ||
PL | 13.04.2022 | ||
RO | 13.04.2022 | ||
RS | 13.04.2022 | ||
SE | 13.04.2022 | ||
SI | 13.04.2022 | ||
SK | 13.04.2022 | ||
SM | 13.04.2022 | ||
BG | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.07.2022 | ||
GR | 14.07.2022 | ||
GB | 08.08.2022 | ||
IE | 08.08.2022 | ||
LU | 08.08.2022 | ||
IS | 13.08.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
BE | 31.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
FR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/42] | AL | 13.04.2022 | |
AT | 13.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2022 | ||
DK | 13.04.2022 | ||
EE | 13.04.2022 | ||
ES | 13.04.2022 | ||
FI | 13.04.2022 | ||
HR | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LV | 13.04.2022 | ||
MC | 13.04.2022 | ||
NL | 13.04.2022 | ||
PL | 13.04.2022 | ||
RO | 13.04.2022 | ||
RS | 13.04.2022 | ||
SE | 13.04.2022 | ||
SI | 13.04.2022 | ||
SK | 13.04.2022 | ||
SM | 13.04.2022 | ||
BG | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.07.2022 | ||
GR | 14.07.2022 | ||
IE | 08.08.2022 | ||
LU | 08.08.2022 | ||
IS | 13.08.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
BE | 31.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
FR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AL | 13.04.2022 | |
AT | 13.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2022 | ||
DK | 13.04.2022 | ||
EE | 13.04.2022 | ||
ES | 13.04.2022 | ||
FI | 13.04.2022 | ||
HR | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LV | 13.04.2022 | ||
MC | 13.04.2022 | ||
NL | 13.04.2022 | ||
PL | 13.04.2022 | ||
RO | 13.04.2022 | ||
RS | 13.04.2022 | ||
SE | 13.04.2022 | ||
SI | 13.04.2022 | ||
SK | 13.04.2022 | ||
SM | 13.04.2022 | ||
BG | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.07.2022 | ||
GR | 14.07.2022 | ||
IE | 08.08.2022 | ||
LU | 08.08.2022 | ||
IS | 13.08.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
FR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AL | 13.04.2022 | |
AT | 13.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2022 | ||
DK | 13.04.2022 | ||
EE | 13.04.2022 | ||
ES | 13.04.2022 | ||
FI | 13.04.2022 | ||
HR | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LV | 13.04.2022 | ||
MC | 13.04.2022 | ||
NL | 13.04.2022 | ||
PL | 13.04.2022 | ||
RO | 13.04.2022 | ||
RS | 13.04.2022 | ||
SE | 13.04.2022 | ||
SI | 13.04.2022 | ||
SK | 13.04.2022 | ||
SM | 13.04.2022 | ||
BG | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.07.2022 | ||
GR | 14.07.2022 | ||
IE | 08.08.2022 | ||
LU | 08.08.2022 | ||
IS | 13.08.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 13.04.2022 | |
AT | 13.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2022 | ||
DK | 13.04.2022 | ||
EE | 13.04.2022 | ||
ES | 13.04.2022 | ||
FI | 13.04.2022 | ||
HR | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LV | 13.04.2022 | ||
MC | 13.04.2022 | ||
NL | 13.04.2022 | ||
PL | 13.04.2022 | ||
RO | 13.04.2022 | ||
RS | 13.04.2022 | ||
SE | 13.04.2022 | ||
SI | 13.04.2022 | ||
SK | 13.04.2022 | ||
SM | 13.04.2022 | ||
BG | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.07.2022 | ||
GR | 14.07.2022 | ||
LU | 08.08.2022 | ||
IS | 13.08.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | AL | 13.04.2022 | |
AT | 13.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2022 | ||
DK | 13.04.2022 | ||
EE | 13.04.2022 | ||
ES | 13.04.2022 | ||
FI | 13.04.2022 | ||
HR | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LV | 13.04.2022 | ||
MC | 13.04.2022 | ||
NL | 13.04.2022 | ||
PL | 13.04.2022 | ||
RO | 13.04.2022 | ||
RS | 13.04.2022 | ||
SE | 13.04.2022 | ||
SK | 13.04.2022 | ||
SM | 13.04.2022 | ||
BG | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.07.2022 | ||
GR | 14.07.2022 | ||
LU | 08.08.2022 | ||
IS | 13.08.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/17] | AL | 13.04.2022 | |
AT | 13.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2022 | ||
DK | 13.04.2022 | ||
EE | 13.04.2022 | ||
ES | 13.04.2022 | ||
FI | 13.04.2022 | ||
HR | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LV | 13.04.2022 | ||
MC | 13.04.2022 | ||
NL | 13.04.2022 | ||
PL | 13.04.2022 | ||
RO | 13.04.2022 | ||
RS | 13.04.2022 | ||
SE | 13.04.2022 | ||
SK | 13.04.2022 | ||
SM | 13.04.2022 | ||
BG | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.07.2022 | ||
GR | 14.07.2022 | ||
IS | 13.08.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/16] | AT | 13.04.2022 | |
CZ | 13.04.2022 | ||
DK | 13.04.2022 | ||
EE | 13.04.2022 | ||
ES | 13.04.2022 | ||
FI | 13.04.2022 | ||
HR | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LV | 13.04.2022 | ||
MC | 13.04.2022 | ||
NL | 13.04.2022 | ||
PL | 13.04.2022 | ||
RO | 13.04.2022 | ||
RS | 13.04.2022 | ||
SE | 13.04.2022 | ||
SK | 13.04.2022 | ||
SM | 13.04.2022 | ||
BG | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.07.2022 | ||
GR | 14.07.2022 | ||
IS | 13.08.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AT | 13.04.2022 | |
CZ | 13.04.2022 | ||
DK | 13.04.2022 | ||
EE | 13.04.2022 | ||
ES | 13.04.2022 | ||
FI | 13.04.2022 | ||
HR | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LV | 13.04.2022 | ||
NL | 13.04.2022 | ||
PL | 13.04.2022 | ||
RO | 13.04.2022 | ||
RS | 13.04.2022 | ||
SE | 13.04.2022 | ||
SK | 13.04.2022 | ||
SM | 13.04.2022 | ||
BG | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.07.2022 | ||
GR | 14.07.2022 | ||
IS | 13.08.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | AT | 13.04.2022 | |
DK | 13.04.2022 | ||
ES | 13.04.2022 | ||
FI | 13.04.2022 | ||
HR | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LV | 13.04.2022 | ||
NL | 13.04.2022 | ||
PL | 13.04.2022 | ||
RS | 13.04.2022 | ||
SE | 13.04.2022 | ||
BG | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.07.2022 | ||
GR | 14.07.2022 | ||
IS | 13.08.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/51] | AT | 13.04.2022 | |
ES | 13.04.2022 | ||
FI | 13.04.2022 | ||
HR | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LV | 13.04.2022 | ||
NL | 13.04.2022 | ||
PL | 13.04.2022 | ||
RS | 13.04.2022 | ||
SE | 13.04.2022 | ||
BG | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.07.2022 | ||
GR | 14.07.2022 | ||
IS | 13.08.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | AT | 13.04.2022 | |
ES | 13.04.2022 | ||
FI | 13.04.2022 | ||
HR | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LV | 13.04.2022 | ||
NL | 13.04.2022 | ||
PL | 13.04.2022 | ||
RS | 13.04.2022 | ||
SE | 13.04.2022 | ||
BG | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.07.2022 | ||
GR | 14.07.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 13.04.2022 | |
ES | 13.04.2022 | ||
FI | 13.04.2022 | ||
HR | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LV | 13.04.2022 | ||
NL | 13.04.2022 | ||
SE | 13.04.2022 | ||
BG | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.07.2022 | ||
GR | 14.07.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 13.04.2022 | |
ES | 13.04.2022 | ||
FI | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
NL | 13.04.2022 | ||
SE | 13.04.2022 | ||
NO | 13.07.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/44] | NL | 13.04.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2016323869 (XU FANGLI [CN], et al) [X] 1-3,5,7-10,13-15 * paragraphs [0098] - [0193] * * figure 1 * [I] 4,6,11,12; | [A] - NOKIA ET AL, "On congestion control for V2V communication", vol. RAN WG1, no. Lisbon, Portugal; 20161010 - 20161014, (20161001), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1609788-CONGESTIONCONTROL, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_86b/Docs/, (20161001), XP051159668 [A] 1-15 * abstract * | International search | [A]CN103747432 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-24 * , entire document *; | [X]CN104754748 (CHINA ACADEMY OF TELECOMM TECH) [X] 1-24 * , description, paragraphs 0098-0126 and 0147-0162 *; | [A]CN104936164 (CHINA ACADEMY OF TELECOMM TECH) [A] 1-24* , entire document *; | [A]CN105682237 (ZHUHAI MEIZU TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-24 * , entire document * |