EP3627903 - SIGNAL TRANSMISSION METHOD AND TERMINAL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.02.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.01.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.02.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.02.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.03.2024 [2024/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP., LTD. No. 18 Haibin Road Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2020/13] | For all designated states GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP., LTD. No. 18 Haibin Road Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan Guangdong 523860 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEN, Wenhong No.18 Haibin Road Wusha Chang'an Dongguan Guangdong 523860 / CN | [2020/13] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | [2020/13] | Application number, filing date | 17921769.0 | 16.08.2017 | [2020/13] | WO2017CN97673 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019033302 | Date: | 21.02.2019 | Language: | ZH | [2019/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3627903 | Date: | 25.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 21.02.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04W52/00, H04W52/14, H04W52/36, H04W52/28, H04W52/16, H04W72/04, H04W52/10, H04W72/12 | [2020/22] | CPC: |
H04W52/146 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04B7/005 (RU);
H04W52/30 (KR);
H04W72/1268 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04W24/00 (RU);
H04W52/00 (EP,RU,US);
H04W52/10 (EP,CN,US);
H04W52/16 (EP,CN,US);
H04W52/281 (EP,CN,US);
H04W52/367 (EP,CN,US);
H04W72/04 (RU);
H04W72/0473 (CN,KR,US);
H04W72/569 (EP,CN,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/13] | H04W52/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/13] | Title | German: | SIGNALÜBERTRAGUNGSVERFAHREN UND ENDGERÄT | [2020/13] | English: | SIGNAL TRANSMISSION METHOD AND TERMINAL DEVICE | [2020/13] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'ÉMISSION DE SIGNAUX ET DISPOSITIF TERMINAL | [2020/13] | Entry into regional phase | 17.12.2019 | Translation filed | 17.12.2019 | National basic fee paid | 17.12.2019 | Search fee paid | 17.12.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.12.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.12.2019 | Examination requested [2020/13] | 30.11.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.01.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.05.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.06.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.10.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.12.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.05.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.06.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.11.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.11.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.03.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.05.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.10.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/10] | 31.10.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2024/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2023 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2015055454 (YANG RONGZHEN [CN], et al) [X] 1,2,6,7,9,10,14,15 * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0040] * [I] 3-5,8,11-13,16; | [XI]US9030980 (KIM SOENG-HUN [KR], et al) [X] 1-5,9-13 * column 17; paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0003]; figure 12 *[I] 6-8,14-16; | [XI]US2017013565 (PELLETIER GHYSLAIN [CA], et al) [X] 1,2,6,7,9,10,14,15 * paragraph [0228] - paragraph [0232] * [I] 3-5,8,11-13,16; | [XI]US2017111873 (KAKISHIMA YUICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-5,9-13 * paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0067] - paragraph [0069] * [I] 6-8,14-16; | [XA] - NTT DOCOMO, "SRS handling and its power-control", vol. RAN WG1, no. Ljubljana, Slovenia; 20141006 - 20141010, (20140927), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-144143, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_78b/Docs/, (20140927), XP050869789 [X] 1,2,6,7,9,10,14,15 * section 2; page 1 * [A] 3-5,8,11-13,16 | International search | [X]CN101998596 (SHARP KK) [X] 1-4, 18-21; | [A]US2011243007 (XIAO WEIMIN [US]) [A] 1-34; | [A]CN103369647 (ZTE CORP) [A] 1-34; | [A]CN103369657 (ZTE CORP) [A] 1-34; | [A]US2014146777 (SHIN SUNG-HYUK [US], et al) [A] 1-34; | [A] - "UL MIMO power control", R1-1707137 3GPP TSG RAN WG1 Meeting #89, (20170514), XP051272363 [A] 1-34 * , * |