EP3684118 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR SELECTING RESOURCES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.04.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.01.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.06.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2024 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP., LTD. No. 18 Haibin Road Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2020/30] | For all designated states GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP., LTD. No. 18 Haibin Road Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan Guangdong 523860 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TANG, Hai No.18 Haibin Road Wusha Chang'an Dongguan Guangdong 523860 / CN | [2020/30] | Representative(s) | RGTH Patentanwälte PartGmbB Neuer Wall 10 20354 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/30] | Ziebig & Hengelhaupt Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei PartG mbB Leipziger Straße 49 10117 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 17925120.2 | 15.09.2017 | [2020/30] | WO2017CN101901 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019051782 | Date: | 21.03.2019 | Language: | ZH | [2019/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3684118 | Date: | 22.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 21.03.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.08.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/02, H04W74/0808 | [2024/10] | CPC: |
H04W72/02 (EP,RU,US);
H04W72/04 (RU);
H04W74/0808 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2020/30] | H04W72/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/30] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM AUSWÄHLEN VON RESSOURCEN | [2020/30] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR SELECTING RESOURCES | [2020/30] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE SÉLECTION DE RESSOURCES | [2020/30] | Entry into regional phase | 30.03.2020 | Translation filed | 30.03.2020 | National basic fee paid | 30.03.2020 | Search fee paid | 30.03.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.03.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/30] | 15.03.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.01.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.05.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.04.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.09.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2015327315 (XUE PENG [KR], et al); | [XYI]WO2017028044 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]); | [Y]US2017188391 (RAJAGOPAL SRIDHAR [US], et al); | [E]EP3322241 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]); |