EP3693238 - VEHICLE CONTROL METHOD AND CONTROL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.02.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.03.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.02.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.07.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.07.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nissan Motor Co., Ltd. 2 Takara-cho Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 221-0023 / JP | [2020/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HIRATA, Takeshi c/o Nissan Motor Co. Ltd. Intellectual Property Department 1-1 Morinosatoaoyama Atsugi-shi Kanagawa 243-0123 / JP | 02 /
NAKANE, Yusuke c/o Nissan Motor Co. Ltd. Intellectual Property Department 1-1 Morinosatoaoyama Atsugi-shi Kanagawa 243-0123 / JP | 03 /
SAWADA, Takanobu c/o Nissan Motor Co. Ltd. Intellectual Property Department 1-1 Morinosatoaoyama Atsugi-shi Kanagawa 243-0123 / JP | [2020/33] | Representative(s) | Global IP Europe Patentanwaltskanzlei Pfarrstraße 14 80538 München / DE | [2020/33] | Application number, filing date | 17927974.0 | 04.10.2017 | [2020/33] | WO2017JP36173 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019069409 | Date: | 11.04.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3693238 | Date: | 12.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3693238 | Date: | 19.04.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 11.04.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.09.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B60W10/02, B60K6/485, B60W10/04, B60W10/06, B60W10/08, B60W10/26, B60W20/12, B60W20/13, B60W30/18, F02D29/02, F02D29/06, B60W60/00, B60W50/00 | [2020/44] | CPC: |
B60W30/18072 (EP);
B60W20/14 (US);
B60W10/02 (EP);
B60W10/04 (US);
B60W10/06 (EP);
B60W10/08 (EP);
B60W10/26 (EP,US);
B60W20/12 (EP,US);
B60W20/13 (EP);
B60W30/181 (US);
B60W30/18127 (EP);
B60W50/0097 (EP);
B60W60/0023 (EP,US);
B60W2030/1809 (EP);
B60W2050/0014 (US);
B60W2510/1005 (EP);
B60W2510/244 (EP,US);
B60W2510/305 (EP);
B60W2520/10 (EP);
B60W2520/105 (EP);
B60W2540/10 (EP);
B60W2552/15 (EP);
B60W2554/406 (EP);
B60W2556/10 (US);
B60W2556/50 (EP);
B60W2556/65 (EP,US);
Y02T10/60 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2020/33] | B60W10/02, B60K6/485, B60W10/04, B60W10/06, B60W10/08, B60W10/26, B60W20/12, B60W20/13, B60W30/18, F02D29/02, F02D29/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/33] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FAHRZEUGSTEUERUNGSVERFAHREN UND -STEUERUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2020/33] | English: | VEHICLE CONTROL METHOD AND CONTROL DEVICE | [2020/33] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DE VÉHICULE ET DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE | [2020/33] | Entry into regional phase | 30.04.2020 | Translation filed | 30.04.2020 | National basic fee paid | 30.04.2020 | Search fee paid | 30.04.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.04.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.03.2018 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 30.04.2020 | Examination requested [2020/33] | 09.04.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.07.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.11.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.03.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 07.03.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.03.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 22.01.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 19.04.2023 | AT | 19.04.2023 | CZ | 19.04.2023 | DK | 19.04.2023 | EE | 19.04.2023 | ES | 19.04.2023 | FI | 19.04.2023 | HR | 19.04.2023 | IT | 19.04.2023 | LT | 19.04.2023 | LV | 19.04.2023 | MC | 19.04.2023 | NL | 19.04.2023 | PL | 19.04.2023 | RO | 19.04.2023 | RS | 19.04.2023 | SE | 19.04.2023 | SI | 19.04.2023 | SK | 19.04.2023 | SM | 19.04.2023 | NO | 19.07.2023 | GR | 20.07.2023 | IS | 19.08.2023 | PT | 21.08.2023 | LU | 04.10.2023 | BE | 31.10.2023 | CH | 31.10.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/34] | AL | 19.04.2023 | |
AT | 19.04.2023 | ||
CZ | 19.04.2023 | ||
DK | 19.04.2023 | ||
EE | 19.04.2023 | ||
ES | 19.04.2023 | ||
FI | 19.04.2023 | ||
HR | 19.04.2023 | ||
IT | 19.04.2023 | ||
LT | 19.04.2023 | ||
LV | 19.04.2023 | ||
MC | 19.04.2023 | ||
NL | 19.04.2023 | ||
PL | 19.04.2023 | ||
RO | 19.04.2023 | ||
RS | 19.04.2023 | ||
SE | 19.04.2023 | ||
SI | 19.04.2023 | ||
SK | 19.04.2023 | ||
SM | 19.04.2023 | ||
NO | 19.07.2023 | ||
GR | 20.07.2023 | ||
IS | 19.08.2023 | ||
PT | 21.08.2023 | ||
LU | 04.10.2023 | ||
CH | 31.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/30] | AL | 19.04.2023 | |
AT | 19.04.2023 | ||
CZ | 19.04.2023 | ||
DK | 19.04.2023 | ||
EE | 19.04.2023 | ||
ES | 19.04.2023 | ||
FI | 19.04.2023 | ||
HR | 19.04.2023 | ||
IT | 19.04.2023 | ||
LT | 19.04.2023 | ||
LV | 19.04.2023 | ||
MC | 19.04.2023 | ||
NL | 19.04.2023 | ||
PL | 19.04.2023 | ||
RO | 19.04.2023 | ||
RS | 19.04.2023 | ||
SE | 19.04.2023 | ||
SI | 19.04.2023 | ||
SK | 19.04.2023 | ||
SM | 19.04.2023 | ||
NO | 19.07.2023 | ||
GR | 20.07.2023 | ||
IS | 19.08.2023 | ||
PT | 21.08.2023 | ||
LU | 04.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/28] | AL | 19.04.2023 | |
AT | 19.04.2023 | ||
CZ | 19.04.2023 | ||
DK | 19.04.2023 | ||
EE | 19.04.2023 | ||
ES | 19.04.2023 | ||
FI | 19.04.2023 | ||
HR | 19.04.2023 | ||
IT | 19.04.2023 | ||
LT | 19.04.2023 | ||
LV | 19.04.2023 | ||
MC | 19.04.2023 | ||
NL | 19.04.2023 | ||
PL | 19.04.2023 | ||
RO | 19.04.2023 | ||
RS | 19.04.2023 | ||
SE | 19.04.2023 | ||
SI | 19.04.2023 | ||
SK | 19.04.2023 | ||
SM | 19.04.2023 | ||
NO | 19.07.2023 | ||
GR | 20.07.2023 | ||
IS | 19.08.2023 | ||
PT | 21.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AL | 19.04.2023 | |
AT | 19.04.2023 | ||
CZ | 19.04.2023 | ||
DK | 19.04.2023 | ||
EE | 19.04.2023 | ||
ES | 19.04.2023 | ||
FI | 19.04.2023 | ||
HR | 19.04.2023 | ||
IT | 19.04.2023 | ||
LT | 19.04.2023 | ||
LV | 19.04.2023 | ||
NL | 19.04.2023 | ||
PL | 19.04.2023 | ||
RO | 19.04.2023 | ||
RS | 19.04.2023 | ||
SE | 19.04.2023 | ||
SI | 19.04.2023 | ||
SK | 19.04.2023 | ||
SM | 19.04.2023 | ||
NO | 19.07.2023 | ||
GR | 20.07.2023 | ||
IS | 19.08.2023 | ||
PT | 21.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/24] | AL | 19.04.2023 | |
AT | 19.04.2023 | ||
CZ | 19.04.2023 | ||
DK | 19.04.2023 | ||
EE | 19.04.2023 | ||
ES | 19.04.2023 | ||
FI | 19.04.2023 | ||
HR | 19.04.2023 | ||
LT | 19.04.2023 | ||
LV | 19.04.2023 | ||
NL | 19.04.2023 | ||
PL | 19.04.2023 | ||
RO | 19.04.2023 | ||
RS | 19.04.2023 | ||
SE | 19.04.2023 | ||
SI | 19.04.2023 | ||
SK | 19.04.2023 | ||
SM | 19.04.2023 | ||
NO | 19.07.2023 | ||
GR | 20.07.2023 | ||
IS | 19.08.2023 | ||
PT | 21.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AL | 19.04.2023 | |
AT | 19.04.2023 | ||
CZ | 19.04.2023 | ||
DK | 19.04.2023 | ||
EE | 19.04.2023 | ||
ES | 19.04.2023 | ||
FI | 19.04.2023 | ||
HR | 19.04.2023 | ||
LT | 19.04.2023 | ||
LV | 19.04.2023 | ||
NL | 19.04.2023 | ||
PL | 19.04.2023 | ||
RO | 19.04.2023 | ||
RS | 19.04.2023 | ||
SE | 19.04.2023 | ||
SK | 19.04.2023 | ||
SM | 19.04.2023 | ||
NO | 19.07.2023 | ||
GR | 20.07.2023 | ||
IS | 19.08.2023 | ||
PT | 21.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AL | 19.04.2023 | |
AT | 19.04.2023 | ||
ES | 19.04.2023 | ||
FI | 19.04.2023 | ||
HR | 19.04.2023 | ||
LT | 19.04.2023 | ||
LV | 19.04.2023 | ||
NL | 19.04.2023 | ||
PL | 19.04.2023 | ||
RS | 19.04.2023 | ||
SE | 19.04.2023 | ||
SK | 19.04.2023 | ||
SM | 19.04.2023 | ||
NO | 19.07.2023 | ||
GR | 20.07.2023 | ||
IS | 19.08.2023 | ||
PT | 21.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | AL | 19.04.2023 | |
AT | 19.04.2023 | ||
ES | 19.04.2023 | ||
FI | 19.04.2023 | ||
HR | 19.04.2023 | ||
LT | 19.04.2023 | ||
LV | 19.04.2023 | ||
NL | 19.04.2023 | ||
PL | 19.04.2023 | ||
RS | 19.04.2023 | ||
SE | 19.04.2023 | ||
NO | 19.07.2023 | ||
GR | 20.07.2023 | ||
IS | 19.08.2023 | ||
PT | 21.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | AL | 19.04.2023 | |
AT | 19.04.2023 | ||
ES | 19.04.2023 | ||
HR | 19.04.2023 | ||
LT | 19.04.2023 | ||
LV | 19.04.2023 | ||
NL | 19.04.2023 | ||
PL | 19.04.2023 | ||
RS | 19.04.2023 | ||
SE | 19.04.2023 | ||
NO | 19.07.2023 | ||
GR | 20.07.2023 | ||
IS | 19.08.2023 | ||
PT | 21.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AL | 19.04.2023 | |
AT | 19.04.2023 | ||
ES | 19.04.2023 | ||
HR | 19.04.2023 | ||
NL | 19.04.2023 | ||
PL | 19.04.2023 | ||
RS | 19.04.2023 | ||
SE | 19.04.2023 | ||
NO | 19.07.2023 | ||
GR | 20.07.2023 | ||
IS | 19.08.2023 | ||
PT | 21.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AL | 19.04.2023 | |
AT | 19.04.2023 | ||
ES | 19.04.2023 | ||
NL | 19.04.2023 | ||
PL | 19.04.2023 | ||
SE | 19.04.2023 | ||
NO | 19.07.2023 | ||
GR | 20.07.2023 | ||
IS | 19.08.2023 | ||
PT | 21.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 19.04.2023 | |
ES | 19.04.2023 | ||
NL | 19.04.2023 | ||
SE | 19.04.2023 | ||
NO | 19.07.2023 | ||
PT | 21.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 19.04.2023 | |
NL | 19.04.2023 | ||
PT | 21.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/43] | NL | 19.04.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2015088349 (AKASHI YOHEI [JP], et al) [Y] 7* paragraphs [0047] , [0050] - [0053]; figure 2; claim 1 *; | [XY]DE102014208758 (CONTINENTAL AUTOMOTIVE GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,2,4-6,9 * paragraphs [0001] , [0023] , [0028] , [0029] , [0041]; claims 1-3,5 * [Y] 3,7,8; | [Y]DE102014220712 (CONTINENTAL AUTOMOTIVE GMBH [DE]) [Y] 3,8 * paragraphs [0017] , [0019] , [0025] , [0026] , [0041] - [0046] * | International search | [A]WO2011092855 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-8* , entire text, all drawings & US 2012/0330505 A1, entire text, all drawings & EP 2529972 A1 & CN 102725187 A *; | [YA]JP2015058783 (DAIMLER AG) [Y] 1-7, 9 * , paragraphs [0025]-[0027] (Family: none) * [A] 8; | [Y]JP2015113075 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [Y] 5-7 * , paragraphs [0026], [0034]-[0037], [0074]-[0075], [0080], fig. 12 (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2016088334 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [Y] 3-7 * , paragraph [0089] (Family: none) *; | [YA]JP2016179716 (DENSO CORP) [Y] 1-7, 9 * , paragraphs [0004]-[0008], [0017]-[0025], [0046]-[0063], fig. 1-4 (Family: none) * [A] 8; | [YA]JP2017024569 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [Y] 1-7, 9 * , paragraphs [0021], [0044]-[0045], [0073]-[0081], fig. 1, 4 & US 2017/0021823 A1, paragraphs [0029], [0068]-[0070], [0102]-[0111], fig. 1, 4 & DE 102016113458 A1 & CN 106364477 A * [A] 8 | by applicant | JP2012047148 |