EP3703419 - NETWORK ACCESS METHOD AND USER EQUIPMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2020/36] | NETWORK ACCESS METHOD AND APPARATUS, USER EQUIPMENT, AND BASE STATION | ||
[2024/35] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.08.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.02.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.07.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Beijing Xiaomi Mobile Software Co. No. 018, Floor 8, Building 6, Yard 33 Middle Xierqi Road Haidian District, Beijing 100085 / CN | [2020/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HONG, Wei No. 018, Floor 8, Building 6, Yard 33 Middle Xierqi Road Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | [2020/36] | Representative(s) | Gevers Patents De Kleetlaan 7A 1831 Diegem / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/36] | Gevers Patents Intellectual Property House Holidaystraat 5 1831 Diegem / BE | Application number, filing date | 17930967.9 | 03.11.2017 | [2020/36] | WO2017CN109269 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019084901 | Date: | 09.05.2019 | Language: | ZH | [2019/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3703419 | Date: | 02.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 09.05.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04W48/20, // H04W76/10, H04W36/00, H04W48/12, H04W48/16, H04W84/04 | [2024/35] | CPC: |
H04W48/20 (EP,CN,US);
H04W76/15 (US);
H04W36/00 (EP);
H04W48/12 (EP);
H04W48/16 (EP);
H04W76/10 (EP);
H04W84/045 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/26] | H04W48/20, // H04W76/10, H04W84/04, H04W88/02, H04W88/08 | ||
Former IPC [2020/36] | H04W36/00, H04W36/08, H04W36/30 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/36] | Title | German: | NETZWERKZUGRIFFSVERFAHREN UND BENUTZERGERÄT | [2024/35] | English: | NETWORK ACCESS METHOD AND USER EQUIPMENT | [2024/35] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'ACCÈS RÉSEAU ET ÉQUIPEMENT UTILISATEUR | [2024/35] |
Former [2020/36] | NETZWERKZUGRIFFSVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG, BENUTZERGERÄT UND BASISSTATION | ||
Former [2020/36] | NETWORK ACCESS METHOD AND APPARATUS, USER EQUIPMENT, AND BASE STATION | ||
Former [2020/36] | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL D'ACCÈS RÉSEAU, ÉQUIPEMENT UTILISATEUR ET STATION DE BASE | Entry into regional phase | 28.05.2020 | Translation filed | 28.05.2020 | National basic fee paid | 28.05.2020 | Search fee paid | 28.05.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.05.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.05.2020 | Examination requested [2020/36] | 17.12.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.06.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.08.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2009180428 (VISWANATH PRAMOD [US]); | [XY]US2010091651 (CHIN TOM [US], et al); | [A]EP2824971 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]); | [XY]WO2017063485 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]); | EP3322223 [ ] (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) |