EP3707206 - AIR CURABLE ETHYLENE/ALPHA-OLEFIN/DIENE INTERPOLYMER COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.06.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.08.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dow Global Technologies LLC 2040 Dow Center Midland, MI 48674 / US | [2020/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LYU, Bo Room 302 Building 9 Lane 800 Xiupu Rd. Pudong New District Shanghai 201203 / CN | 02 /
SUN, Yabin Room 201 Unit 234 No. 399 Nanliu Road PudongNew District Shanghai 201399 / CN | 03 /
HAN, Tao 699 Jinqiu Road 7-1528 Baoshan District Shanghai 200444 / CN | 04 /
DUN, Jozef Van Bachtobelstrasse 3 8810 Horgen / CH | 05 /
SHAN, Colin, Li Pi 230 Abner Jackson Parkway Lake Jackson, TX 77566 / US | [2020/38] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [2020/38] | Application number, filing date | 17931229.3 | 08.11.2017 | [2020/38] | WO2017CN104810 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019090448 | Date: | 16.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3707206 | Date: | 16.09.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.05.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 16.05.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.05.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C08K5/3435, C08L23/16, C08K5/14 | [2021/25] | CPC: |
C08K5/14 (EP,KR,US);
C08K5/3435 (EP,KR,US);
C08L23/16 (KR,US);
C08L2312/02 (US)
| C-Set: |
C08K5/14, C08L23/16 (EP);
C08K5/3435, C08L23/16 (EP) |
Former IPC [2020/38] | C08L23/16, C08L23/00, C08K5/3435, C08K5/34 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/38] | Title | German: | LUFTHÄRTBARE ETHYLEN-/ALPHA-OLEFIN-/DIENINTERPOLYMERZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2020/38] | English: | AIR CURABLE ETHYLENE/ALPHA-OLEFIN/DIENE INTERPOLYMER COMPOSITION | [2020/38] | French: | COMPOSITION D'INTERPOLYMÈRE ÉTHYLÈNE/ALPHA-OLÉFINE/DIÈNE DURCISSABLE À L'AIR | [2020/38] | Entry into regional phase | 29.05.2020 | National basic fee paid | 29.05.2020 | Search fee paid | 29.05.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.05.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.05.2020 | Examination requested [2020/38] | 25.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.06.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2007173613 (CHAUDHARY BHARAT I [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * paragraph [0047] ** example -; tables I-VII *; | [ID]US7829634 (DEBAUD FABIEN [FR], et al) [ID] 1-9 * column 2, line 64 - column 3, line 9 * * column 3, line 52 - line 67 * * examples 4,7,10,13; table 1 * * claim - * |