EP3709526 - ELECTRONIC DEVICE, WIRELESS COMMUNICATION METHOD, AND COMPUTER-READABLE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.09.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.08.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.07.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Group Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2021/30] |
Former [2020/38] | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CAO, Jianfei Room 701 Citychamp Building No.12 Taiyanggongzhonglu Chaoyang District Beijing 100028 / CN | [2020/38] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/38] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 17931537.9 | 07.11.2017 | [2020/38] | WO2017CN109691 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019090467 | Date: | 16.05.2019 | Language: | ZH | [2019/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3709526 | Date: | 16.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 16.05.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.08.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/04, H04B7/06, // H04B7/08 | [2020/38] | CPC: |
H04B7/0695 (EP,CN,KR);
H04B7/0408 (CN,KR,RU);
H04B7/0413 (CN,KR,RU);
H04B7/0456 (CN,KR,US);
H04L5/0048 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04B7/0417 (CN,KR,RU);
H04B7/0617 (CN,KR,US);
H04B7/0626 (EP,CN,US);
H04B7/0639 (CN,US);
H04L1/0026 (EP,CN);
H04L5/0023 (EP,CN);
H04L5/0082 (EP,CN);
H04L5/0091 (EP,CN);
H04W52/146 (CN,KR);
H04W52/325 (CN,KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/38] | Title | German: | ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG, DRAHTLOSES KOMMUNIKATIONSVERFAHREN UND COMPUTERLESBARES MEDIUM | [2020/38] | English: | ELECTRONIC DEVICE, WIRELESS COMMUNICATION METHOD, AND COMPUTER-READABLE MEDIUM | [2020/38] | French: | DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE, PROCÉDÉ DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL ET SUPPORT LISIBLE PAR ORDINATEUR | [2020/38] | Entry into regional phase | 09.04.2020 | Translation filed | 17.05.2020 | National basic fee paid | 17.05.2020 | Search fee paid | 17.05.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.05.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.05.2020 | Examination requested [2020/38] | 24.02.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.09.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.09.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.04.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.07.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2009041151 (KHAN FAROOQ [US], et al) [Y] 6-8 * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0034] * * paragraph [0070] - paragraph [0080] * * paragraph [0082] - paragraph [0088] * * paragraph [0094] - paragraph [0097] ** figures 5, 9, 11 *; | [XAI]US2013039319 (SHI ZHIHUA [CN], et al) [X] 9,11,15 * page 4, line 3 - line 26 * * page 5, line 9 - line 30 * * page 10, line 4 - line 25 * * figures 2-5 * [A] 1-8 [I] 10,12-14; | [XAYI]WO2017027055 (INTEL IP CORP [US]) [X] 1,3,4 * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0039] * * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0047] * * paragraph [0053] - paragraph [0057] * * paragraph [0098] - paragraph [0102] * * figures 2, 3 * [A] 9-14 [Y] 6-8 [I] 2,5 |