EP3712932 - PACKAGE AND SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.08.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.10.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NGK Insulators, Ltd. 2-56, Suda-cho Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 467-8530 / JP | [2020/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WAKAZONO, Yoshitsugu c/o NGK INSULATORS LTD. 2-56 Suda-cho Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 467-8530 / JP | [2020/39] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/39] | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | Application number, filing date | 17931880.3 | 14.11.2017 | [2020/39] | WO2017JP40854 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019097564 | Date: | 23.05.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3712932 | Date: | 23.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 23.05.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H01L23/047, H01L23/66, H01L23/64, H01L23/15 | [2021/28] | CPC: |
H01L23/047 (EP,US);
H01L23/15 (EP);
H01L23/64 (EP,US);
H01L23/66 (EP);
H01L24/48 (EP,US);
H01L2223/6611 (EP);
H01L2223/6644 (EP);
H01L2223/6655 (EP,US);
H01L2224/32245 (EP);
H01L2224/45099 (EP);
H01L2224/48157 (US);
H01L2224/48195 (EP);
H01L2224/48227 (EP);
H01L2224/49175 (EP);
H01L2224/73265 (EP);
H01L24/32 (EP);
H01L24/49 (EP);
H01L2924/15192 (EP);
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/45099, H01L2924/00014 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2020/39] | H01L23/08, H01L23/04, H01L23/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/39] | Title | German: | GEHÄUSE UND HALBLEITERBAUELEMENT | [2020/39] | English: | PACKAGE AND SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE | [2020/39] | French: | DISPOSITIF À SEMI-CONDUCTEUR ET BOÎTIER | [2020/39] | Entry into regional phase | 06.05.2020 | Translation filed | 06.05.2020 | National basic fee paid | 06.05.2020 | Search fee paid | 06.05.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.05.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.05.2020 | Examination requested [2020/39] | 22.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5387888 (EDA KAZUO [JP], et al) [A] 1* column 5, line 35 - column 7, line 11; figure 3 *; | [A]US5717249 (YOSHIKAWA NORIYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * column 5, lines 1-37; figure 1a * * column 9, lines 11-26 *; | [A]US2012032190 (TAKAGI KAZUTAKA [JP]) [A] 1-8 * paragraphs [0035] , [0061] - [0068]; figure 3 *; | [IA]US2016373085 (BARBIERI TRAVIS A [US], et al) [I] 1,3,5-8 * paragraphs [0034] - [0050]; figure 3 * [A] 2,4; | [A] - ISHITSUKA F ET AL, "A NEW MULTILAYER CERAMIC-FRAME PACKAGE FOR HIGH-FREQUENCY MMIC MODULES", IEICE TRANSACTIONS, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRONICS INFORMATION AND COMM. ENG. TOKYO, JP, (19910801), vol. E74, no. 8, ISSN 0917-1673, pages 2344 - 2348, XP000268470 [A] 1-8 * "2. Structure"; page 2344; figure 1 * | International search | [A]JPS63257255 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES, et al) [A] 1-9 * , *; | [A]JP2000312103 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 1-9* , *; | [XA]JP2004311568 (SUMITOMO METAL ELECTRONICS DEV) [X] 3-8 * , * [A] 1-2, 9; | [A]JP2014107398 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 1-9 * , * | by applicant | JP2014107398 |