EP3711419 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR PROCESSING CONTROL INFORMATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.03.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.08.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.10.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2020/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Liguang ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | 02 /
XU, Jun ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | 03 /
XU, Jin ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2020/39] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2020/39] | Application number, filing date | 17931952.0 | 17.11.2017 | [2020/39] | WO2017CN111756 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019095336 | Date: | 23.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3711419 | Date: | 23.09.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.05.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 23.05.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.05.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/12, H03M13/11, H04L1/00 | [2021/22] | CPC: |
H03M13/35 (EP,CN);
H04L1/0009 (EP,CN);
H03M13/255 (CN,US);
H03M13/116 (EP,CN);
H03M13/1185 (CN,US);
H03M13/6306 (EP,CN);
H03M13/6393 (EP,CN);
H03M13/6516 (EP,CN);
H03M13/6522 (CN,US);
|
Former IPC [2020/39] | H04W72/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/39] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERARBEITUNG VON STEUERINFORMATIONEN | [2020/39] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR PROCESSING CONTROL INFORMATION | [2020/39] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS DE COMMANDE | [2020/39] | Entry into regional phase | 17.06.2020 | National basic fee paid | 17.06.2020 | Search fee paid | 17.06.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.06.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.06.2020 | Examination requested [2020/39] | 07.10.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.07.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IA] - RAN1, "LS on Channel Coding", vol. RAN WG4, no. Dubrovnik, Croatia; 20171009 - 20171013, (20170928), 3GPP DRAFT; R4-1710120_R1-1715317 LS ON CHANNEL CODING, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG4_Radio/TSGR4_84Bis/Docs/, (20170928), XP051357063 [I] 1-4,9-12,17,18 * page 8 - page 9 * [A] 5-8,13-16 | [IA] - QUALCOMM INCORPORATED, "LDPC base graph determination and indication", vol. RAN WG1, no. Prague, Czech Republic; 20170821 - 20170825, (20170820), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1713463 LDPC BASE GRAPH DETERMINATION AND INDICATION, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FR, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN1/Docs/, (20170820), XP051316264 [I] 1-4,9-12,17,18 * section 4. * [A] 5-8,13-16 | [IA] - SAMSUNG, "Code rate threshold for BG selection", vol. RAN WG1, no. Nagoya, Japan; 20170918 - 20170921, (20170917), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1716026_CODE RATE THRESHOLD FOR BG SELECTION_FINAL, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRAN, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN1/Docs/, (20170917), XP051339485 [I] 1-4,9-12,17,18 * page 1 - page 2 * [A] 5-8,13-16 |