EP3710851 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR SUPERVISING A PERSON [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.08.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.09.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.05.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.06.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.08.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dimeq AS Novelandet 6729 Kalvåg / NO | [2020/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAKKE, Ronny Novelandet 6729 Kalvåg / NO | [2020/39] | Representative(s) | Acapo AS Edvard Griegs vei 1 5059 Bergen / NO | [2023/40] |
Former [2020/39] | Acapo AS P.O. Box 1880 Nordnes 5817 Bergen / NO | Application number, filing date | 17932344.9 | 17.11.2017 | [2020/39] | WO2017NO50296 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019098841 | Date: | 23.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3710851 | Date: | 23.09.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.05.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3710851 | Date: | 04.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | XN | 23.05.2019 | Supplementary international search report - requested on: | EP | 26.07.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G01S5/02, G06K7/10, G07C1/10 | [2020/39] | CPC: |
G06K19/07762 (EP,KR,US);
G01S5/0018 (EP,KR);
G01S5/0295 (EP,KR,US);
G06K19/0717 (EP,KR,US);
G06K19/0718 (EP,KR);
G06K19/0723 (EP,KR,US);
G06K7/10009 (EP,KR);
G07C1/10 (EP,KR);
G07C9/22 (US);
G07C9/28 (EP,KR,US);
G08B21/0202 (EP,KR);
G08B21/023 (EP,KR);
G08B21/0272 (EP,KR);
G08B21/0275 (EP,KR);
G08B21/04 (EP,KR);
H04W4/023 (US);
H04W4/027 (US);
H04W4/029 (US);
H04W4/80 (US);
H04W4/90 (US);
G01S2205/01 (EP);
G01S2205/09 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/39] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR ÜBERWACHUNG EINER PERSON | [2020/39] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR SUPERVISING A PERSON | [2020/39] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ D'ENCADREMENT D'UNE PERSONNE | [2020/39] | Entry into regional phase | 17.06.2020 | National basic fee paid | 17.06.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.06.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.06.2020 | Examination requested [2020/39] | 17.06.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.11.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.06.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.09.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.03.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.04.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.07.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.11.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.08.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 24.08.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.08.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 05.07.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 04.10.2023 | HR | 04.10.2023 | MC | 04.10.2023 | PL | 04.10.2023 | RO | 04.10.2023 | RS | 04.10.2023 | SK | 04.10.2023 | SM | 04.10.2023 | CH | 30.11.2023 | GR | 05.01.2024 | IS | 04.02.2024 | [2024/40] |
Former [2024/36] | CZ | 04.10.2023 | |
HR | 04.10.2023 | ||
PL | 04.10.2023 | ||
RO | 04.10.2023 | ||
RS | 04.10.2023 | ||
SK | 04.10.2023 | ||
SM | 04.10.2023 | ||
CH | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | CZ | 04.10.2023 | |
HR | 04.10.2023 | ||
PL | 04.10.2023 | ||
RO | 04.10.2023 | ||
RS | 04.10.2023 | ||
SM | 04.10.2023 | ||
CH | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | HR | 04.10.2023 | |
PL | 04.10.2023 | ||
RS | 04.10.2023 | ||
SM | 04.10.2023 | ||
CH | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | HR | 04.10.2023 | |
PL | 04.10.2023 | ||
RS | 04.10.2023 | ||
SM | 04.10.2023 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | HR | 04.10.2023 | |
PL | 04.10.2023 | ||
RS | 04.10.2023 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | HR | 04.10.2023 | |
RS | 04.10.2023 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 05.01.2024 | |
IS | 04.02.2024 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2006044132 (ANCEL THOMAS [US]) [A] 1-13 * paragraph [0010]; figure 1 *; | [XA]WO2009117806 (TYCO SAFETY PROD CANADA LTD [CA], et al) [X] 14,15,21 * paragraph [0044]; figure 3 * [A] 17-20,22; | [X]KR20120091736 (GEIT CO LTD [KR]) [X] 15,21 * paragraph [0020]; figure 1 *; | [XA]WO2014169393 (MCDOWELL AIDAN [CA]) [X] 14,15,21 * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0042]; figures 1A,2 * [A] 17-20,22; | [A]WO2015186043 (ZIH CORP [US]) [A] 1-13* the whole document *; | [A]WO2016196675 (UNIV ILLINOIS [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US2012242481 (GERNANDT TASSILO [DE], et al) [A] 1-22* (Description, paragraphs [0057] - [0059]; Fig. 1 & 2) *; | [A]US2013300560 (HADSALL SR RICHARD A [US]) [A] 1-22 * (Description, paragraphs [0031] - [0037], [0060]) *; | [A]US2015015394 (HANSEN YNGVAR [NO], et al) [A] 1-22 * (Abstract; Description, paragraphs [0018] - [0022], [0026]; Fig. 1) * | Examination | WO2009058122 | WO2009117806 | KR20120091736 | WO2014169393 | by applicant | WO2006046068 | WO2006085056 | WO2012129368 | CN202842494U | WO2014197623 |