EP3729903 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR LOW-LATENCY TRANSMISSION USING SHARED SR-LESS RESOURCES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 09.09.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.09.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.09.2022 | Withdrawal of application | published on 12.10.2022 [2022/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [2020/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STATHAKIS, Efthymios Arbetargatan 23 A 112 45 STOCKHOLM / SE | 02 /
BJÖRKEGREN, Håkan Manganvägen 32 187 46 TÄBY / SE | [2020/44] | Representative(s) | Zacco Sweden AB P.O. Box 5581 Löjtnantsgatan 21 114 85 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/44] | Zacco Sweden AB P.O. Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 17935314.9 | 20.12.2017 | [2020/44] | WO2017SE51312 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019125244 | Date: | 27.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3729903 | Date: | 28.10.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 27.06.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04W52/02, H04L5/00, H04W72/04, // H04W74/08 | [2021/27] | CPC: |
H04W52/0238 (EP);
H04W72/541 (US);
H04L5/0005 (EP);
H04L5/003 (EP);
H04L5/0055 (US);
H04L5/0082 (US);
H04L5/0092 (EP);
H04W72/044 (EP);
H04W72/0446 (US);
|
Former IPC [2020/44] | H04W74/08, H04W74/02, H04W52/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/44] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ÜBERTRAGUNG MIT NIEDRIGER LATENZ UNTER VERWENDUNG VON GEMEINSAM GENUTZTEN SR-LOSEN RESSOURCEN | [2020/44] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR LOW-LATENCY TRANSMISSION USING SHARED SR-LESS RESOURCES | [2020/44] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE TRANSMISSION À FAIBLE LATENCE UTILISANT DES RESSOURCES SANS SR PARTAGÉES | [2020/44] | Entry into regional phase | 15.05.2020 | National basic fee paid | 15.05.2020 | Search fee paid | 15.05.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.05.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.05.2020 | Examination requested [2020/44] | 08.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.09.2022 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2022/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [E]WO2018144433 (INTEL CORP [US]); |