EP3379045 - DEVICE FOR OPTIMISING THE LUBRICATING OIL SIDE HEATING BEHAVIOUR OF A COMBUSTION ENGINE AND METHOD FOR OPERATING A COMBUSTION ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.03.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.04.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.12.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.06.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.03.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 24.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DEUTZ Aktiengesellschaft Ottostrasse 1 51149 Köln / DE | [2018/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Joisten-Pieritz, Joachim Hermann-Josefstr. 3 53925 Kall / DE | 02 /
Kopiniok, Martin Hauptstraße 62 50169 Kerpen / DE | [2018/39] | Application number, filing date | 18000200.8 | 01.03.2018 | [2018/39] | Priority number, date | DE20171002840 | 24.03.2017 Original published format: DE102017002840 | [2018/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3379045 | Date: | 26.09.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3379045 | Date: | 10.05.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.08.2018 | Classification | IPC: | F01M11/00, F01M5/02, H02N2/02 | [2018/39] | CPC: |
F01M11/0004 (EP);
F01M5/021 (EP);
F01M2005/023 (EP);
F01M2011/0037 (EP);
F01M2011/0045 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/18] |
Former [2018/39] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR OPTIMIERUNG DES SCHMIERÖLSEITIGEN AUFHEIZVERHALTENS EINER VERBRENNUNGSKRAFTMASCHINE SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUM BETREIBEN EINER BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE | [2018/39] | English: | DEVICE FOR OPTIMISING THE LUBRICATING OIL SIDE HEATING BEHAVIOUR OF A COMBUSTION ENGINE AND METHOD FOR OPERATING A COMBUSTION ENGINE | [2018/39] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'OPTIMISATION DE COMPORTEMENT DE CHAUFFAGE COTÉ D'HUILE LUBRIFIANTE D'UN MOTEUR À COMBUSTION INTERNE AINSI QUE PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT D'UN MOTEUR À COMBUSTION INTERNE | [2018/39] | Examination procedure | 26.03.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.03.2019 | Examination requested [2019/18] | 26.03.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.06.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.12.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.12.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.03.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 24.03.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.03.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 13.02.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 10.05.2023 | DK | 10.05.2023 | EE | 10.05.2023 | ES | 10.05.2023 | FI | 10.05.2023 | HR | 10.05.2023 | IT | 10.05.2023 | LT | 10.05.2023 | LV | 10.05.2023 | NL | 10.05.2023 | PL | 10.05.2023 | RO | 10.05.2023 | RS | 10.05.2023 | SE | 10.05.2023 | SI | 10.05.2023 | SK | 10.05.2023 | SM | 10.05.2023 | NO | 10.08.2023 | GR | 11.08.2023 | IS | 10.09.2023 | PT | 11.09.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/24] | CZ | 10.05.2023 | |
DK | 10.05.2023 | ||
EE | 10.05.2023 | ||
ES | 10.05.2023 | ||
FI | 10.05.2023 | ||
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
LT | 10.05.2023 | ||
LV | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RO | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
SI | 10.05.2023 | ||
SK | 10.05.2023 | ||
SM | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | CZ | 10.05.2023 | |
DK | 10.05.2023 | ||
EE | 10.05.2023 | ||
ES | 10.05.2023 | ||
FI | 10.05.2023 | ||
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
LT | 10.05.2023 | ||
LV | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RO | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
SK | 10.05.2023 | ||
SM | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | ES | 10.05.2023 | |
FI | 10.05.2023 | ||
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
LT | 10.05.2023 | ||
LV | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
SK | 10.05.2023 | ||
SM | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | ES | 10.05.2023 | |
FI | 10.05.2023 | ||
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
LT | 10.05.2023 | ||
LV | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | ES | 10.05.2023 | |
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
LT | 10.05.2023 | ||
LV | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | ES | 10.05.2023 | |
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | ES | 10.05.2023 | |
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | ES | 10.05.2023 | |
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 10.05.2023 | |
PT | 11.09.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE3235292 (GONTSCHAROW WALDEMAR) [X] 1-4,6-10 * the whole document *; | [X]DE10245357 (IAV GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,6-8,10 * abstract ** page 3, paragraph 16 - paragraph 18; figure 1 *; | [X]EP1806483 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-10 * abstract * * column 25, paragraph 114 - column 26, paragraph 121; figures 5A,B * * column 29, paragraph 133 - column 32, paragraph 154; figure 8 *; | [X]DE112013005540T (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-5 * abstract * * page 5, paragraph 41 - paragraph 45; figure 2 * | by applicant | DE1034401 | EP0717175 | WO2008142078 | EP1878884 | US8136488 | EP2154341 |