EP3557316 - DISPLAY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.10.2023 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.11.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.08.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.03.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.04.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 20.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AT | published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Diehl AKO Stiftung & Co. KG Pfannerstrasse 75-83 88239 Wangen / DE | [2019/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ratajska, Aleksandra Dabrowa 80C PL - 56-400 Olesnica / PL | [2019/43] | Representative(s) | Diehl Patentabteilung c/o Diehl Stiftung & Co. KG Stephanstraße 49 90478 Nürnberg / DE | [2022/51] |
Former [2019/43] | Diehl Patentabteilung c/o Diehl Stiftung & Co. KG Stephanstrasse 49 90478 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 18000386.5 | 20.04.2018 | [2019/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3557316 | Date: | 23.10.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3557316 | Date: | 21.12.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.10.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/13357 | [2022/35] | CPC: |
G02F1/133615 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2019/43] | G02F1/1335, G02B6/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/20] |
Former [2019/43] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG | [2019/43] | English: | DISPLAY DEVICE | [2019/43] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE | [2019/43] | Examination procedure | 06.04.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.04.2020 | Examination requested [2020/20] | 06.04.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.07.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.08.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.11.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 14.11.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.11.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 22.09.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 21.12.2022 | CZ | 21.12.2022 | DK | 21.12.2022 | EE | 21.12.2022 | ES | 21.12.2022 | FI | 21.12.2022 | HR | 21.12.2022 | IT | 21.12.2022 | LT | 21.12.2022 | LV | 21.12.2022 | MC | 21.12.2022 | NL | 21.12.2022 | RO | 21.12.2022 | RS | 21.12.2022 | SE | 21.12.2022 | SI | 21.12.2022 | SK | 21.12.2022 | SM | 21.12.2022 | NO | 21.03.2023 | GR | 22.03.2023 | AT | 20.04.2023 | GB | 20.04.2023 | IE | 20.04.2023 | LU | 20.04.2023 | IS | 21.04.2023 | PT | 21.04.2023 | BE | 30.04.2023 | CH | 30.04.2023 | FR | 30.04.2023 | LI | 30.04.2023 | [2024/35] |
Former [2024/26] | AL | 21.12.2022 | |
CZ | 21.12.2022 | ||
DK | 21.12.2022 | ||
EE | 21.12.2022 | ||
ES | 21.12.2022 | ||
FI | 21.12.2022 | ||
HR | 21.12.2022 | ||
IT | 21.12.2022 | ||
LT | 21.12.2022 | ||
LV | 21.12.2022 | ||
MC | 21.12.2022 | ||
NL | 21.12.2022 | ||
RO | 21.12.2022 | ||
RS | 21.12.2022 | ||
SE | 21.12.2022 | ||
SI | 21.12.2022 | ||
SK | 21.12.2022 | ||
SM | 21.12.2022 | ||
NO | 21.03.2023 | ||
GR | 22.03.2023 | ||
GB | 20.04.2023 | ||
IE | 20.04.2023 | ||
LU | 20.04.2023 | ||
IS | 21.04.2023 | ||
PT | 21.04.2023 | ||
BE | 30.04.2023 | ||
CH | 30.04.2023 | ||
FR | 30.04.2023 | ||
LI | 30.04.2023 | ||
Former [2024/21] | AL | 21.12.2022 | |
CZ | 21.12.2022 | ||
DK | 21.12.2022 | ||
EE | 21.12.2022 | ||
ES | 21.12.2022 | ||
FI | 21.12.2022 | ||
HR | 21.12.2022 | ||
LT | 21.12.2022 | ||
LV | 21.12.2022 | ||
MC | 21.12.2022 | ||
NL | 21.12.2022 | ||
RO | 21.12.2022 | ||
RS | 21.12.2022 | ||
SE | 21.12.2022 | ||
SI | 21.12.2022 | ||
SK | 21.12.2022 | ||
SM | 21.12.2022 | ||
NO | 21.03.2023 | ||
GR | 22.03.2023 | ||
GB | 20.04.2023 | ||
IE | 20.04.2023 | ||
LU | 20.04.2023 | ||
IS | 21.04.2023 | ||
PT | 21.04.2023 | ||
BE | 30.04.2023 | ||
CH | 30.04.2023 | ||
FR | 30.04.2023 | ||
LI | 30.04.2023 | ||
Former [2024/11] | AL | 21.12.2022 | |
CZ | 21.12.2022 | ||
DK | 21.12.2022 | ||
EE | 21.12.2022 | ||
ES | 21.12.2022 | ||
FI | 21.12.2022 | ||
HR | 21.12.2022 | ||
LT | 21.12.2022 | ||
LV | 21.12.2022 | ||
MC | 21.12.2022 | ||
NL | 21.12.2022 | ||
RO | 21.12.2022 | ||
RS | 21.12.2022 | ||
SE | 21.12.2022 | ||
SI | 21.12.2022 | ||
SK | 21.12.2022 | ||
SM | 21.12.2022 | ||
NO | 21.03.2023 | ||
GR | 22.03.2023 | ||
GB | 20.04.2023 | ||
LU | 20.04.2023 | ||
IS | 21.04.2023 | ||
PT | 21.04.2023 | ||
BE | 30.04.2023 | ||
CH | 30.04.2023 | ||
FR | 30.04.2023 | ||
LI | 30.04.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AL | 21.12.2022 | |
CZ | 21.12.2022 | ||
DK | 21.12.2022 | ||
EE | 21.12.2022 | ||
ES | 21.12.2022 | ||
FI | 21.12.2022 | ||
HR | 21.12.2022 | ||
LT | 21.12.2022 | ||
LV | 21.12.2022 | ||
MC | 21.12.2022 | ||
NL | 21.12.2022 | ||
RO | 21.12.2022 | ||
RS | 21.12.2022 | ||
SE | 21.12.2022 | ||
SK | 21.12.2022 | ||
SM | 21.12.2022 | ||
NO | 21.03.2023 | ||
GR | 22.03.2023 | ||
GB | 20.04.2023 | ||
LU | 20.04.2023 | ||
IS | 21.04.2023 | ||
PT | 21.04.2023 | ||
CH | 30.04.2023 | ||
LI | 30.04.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AL | 21.12.2022 | |
CZ | 21.12.2022 | ||
DK | 21.12.2022 | ||
EE | 21.12.2022 | ||
ES | 21.12.2022 | ||
FI | 21.12.2022 | ||
HR | 21.12.2022 | ||
LT | 21.12.2022 | ||
LV | 21.12.2022 | ||
MC | 21.12.2022 | ||
NL | 21.12.2022 | ||
RO | 21.12.2022 | ||
RS | 21.12.2022 | ||
SE | 21.12.2022 | ||
SK | 21.12.2022 | ||
SM | 21.12.2022 | ||
NO | 21.03.2023 | ||
GR | 22.03.2023 | ||
GB | 20.04.2023 | ||
LU | 20.04.2023 | ||
IS | 21.04.2023 | ||
PT | 21.04.2023 | ||
Former [2024/04] | AL | 21.12.2022 | |
CZ | 21.12.2022 | ||
DK | 21.12.2022 | ||
EE | 21.12.2022 | ||
ES | 21.12.2022 | ||
FI | 21.12.2022 | ||
HR | 21.12.2022 | ||
LT | 21.12.2022 | ||
LV | 21.12.2022 | ||
NL | 21.12.2022 | ||
RO | 21.12.2022 | ||
RS | 21.12.2022 | ||
SE | 21.12.2022 | ||
SK | 21.12.2022 | ||
SM | 21.12.2022 | ||
NO | 21.03.2023 | ||
GR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LU | 20.04.2023 | ||
IS | 21.04.2023 | ||
PT | 21.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | AL | 21.12.2022 | |
CZ | 21.12.2022 | ||
DK | 21.12.2022 | ||
EE | 21.12.2022 | ||
ES | 21.12.2022 | ||
FI | 21.12.2022 | ||
HR | 21.12.2022 | ||
LT | 21.12.2022 | ||
LV | 21.12.2022 | ||
NL | 21.12.2022 | ||
RO | 21.12.2022 | ||
RS | 21.12.2022 | ||
SE | 21.12.2022 | ||
SK | 21.12.2022 | ||
SM | 21.12.2022 | ||
NO | 21.03.2023 | ||
GR | 22.03.2023 | ||
IS | 21.04.2023 | ||
PT | 21.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/39] | AL | 21.12.2022 | |
CZ | 21.12.2022 | ||
EE | 21.12.2022 | ||
ES | 21.12.2022 | ||
FI | 21.12.2022 | ||
HR | 21.12.2022 | ||
LT | 21.12.2022 | ||
LV | 21.12.2022 | ||
NL | 21.12.2022 | ||
RO | 21.12.2022 | ||
RS | 21.12.2022 | ||
SE | 21.12.2022 | ||
SK | 21.12.2022 | ||
SM | 21.12.2022 | ||
NO | 21.03.2023 | ||
GR | 22.03.2023 | ||
IS | 21.04.2023 | ||
PT | 21.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 21.12.2022 | |
CZ | 21.12.2022 | ||
EE | 21.12.2022 | ||
ES | 21.12.2022 | ||
FI | 21.12.2022 | ||
HR | 21.12.2022 | ||
LT | 21.12.2022 | ||
LV | 21.12.2022 | ||
NL | 21.12.2022 | ||
RO | 21.12.2022 | ||
RS | 21.12.2022 | ||
SE | 21.12.2022 | ||
SK | 21.12.2022 | ||
SM | 21.12.2022 | ||
NO | 21.03.2023 | ||
GR | 22.03.2023 | ||
PT | 21.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 21.12.2022 | |
CZ | 21.12.2022 | ||
EE | 21.12.2022 | ||
ES | 21.12.2022 | ||
FI | 21.12.2022 | ||
HR | 21.12.2022 | ||
LT | 21.12.2022 | ||
LV | 21.12.2022 | ||
NL | 21.12.2022 | ||
RO | 21.12.2022 | ||
RS | 21.12.2022 | ||
SE | 21.12.2022 | ||
SM | 21.12.2022 | ||
NO | 21.03.2023 | ||
GR | 22.03.2023 | ||
PT | 21.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | CZ | 21.12.2022 | |
EE | 21.12.2022 | ||
ES | 21.12.2022 | ||
FI | 21.12.2022 | ||
HR | 21.12.2022 | ||
LT | 21.12.2022 | ||
LV | 21.12.2022 | ||
NL | 21.12.2022 | ||
RO | 21.12.2022 | ||
RS | 21.12.2022 | ||
SE | 21.12.2022 | ||
SM | 21.12.2022 | ||
NO | 21.03.2023 | ||
GR | 22.03.2023 | ||
PT | 21.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | EE | 21.12.2022 | |
ES | 21.12.2022 | ||
FI | 21.12.2022 | ||
HR | 21.12.2022 | ||
LT | 21.12.2022 | ||
LV | 21.12.2022 | ||
NL | 21.12.2022 | ||
RS | 21.12.2022 | ||
SE | 21.12.2022 | ||
SM | 21.12.2022 | ||
NO | 21.03.2023 | ||
GR | 22.03.2023 | ||
PT | 21.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | ES | 21.12.2022 | |
FI | 21.12.2022 | ||
HR | 21.12.2022 | ||
LT | 21.12.2022 | ||
LV | 21.12.2022 | ||
NL | 21.12.2022 | ||
RS | 21.12.2022 | ||
SE | 21.12.2022 | ||
SM | 21.12.2022 | ||
NO | 21.03.2023 | ||
GR | 22.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/29] | FI | 21.12.2022 | |
HR | 21.12.2022 | ||
LT | 21.12.2022 | ||
LV | 21.12.2022 | ||
NL | 21.12.2022 | ||
RS | 21.12.2022 | ||
SE | 21.12.2022 | ||
NO | 21.03.2023 | ||
GR | 22.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/25] | FI | 21.12.2022 | |
HR | 21.12.2022 | ||
LT | 21.12.2022 | ||
LV | 21.12.2022 | ||
RS | 21.12.2022 | ||
SE | 21.12.2022 | ||
NO | 21.03.2023 | ||
GR | 22.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | FI | 21.12.2022 | |
LT | 21.12.2022 | ||
LV | 21.12.2022 | ||
SE | 21.12.2022 | ||
NO | 21.03.2023 | ||
GR | 22.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | FI | 21.12.2022 | |
LT | 21.12.2022 | ||
SE | 21.12.2022 | ||
NO | 21.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 21.12.2022 | |
NO | 21.03.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE10231255 (DIEHL AKO STIFTUNG GMBH & CO [DE]) [Y] 7 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2006128422 (OSRAM OPTO SEMICONDUCTORS GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-7* the whole document *; | [XY]EP2527892 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1-6 * paragraphs [0033] - [0040] - [0056]; figures 1,2,10 * [Y] 7 | Examination | JPH04136623 | EP1981147 | US2014119045 |