EP3435038 - ARRANGEMENT COMPRISING A CONSUMPTION METER AND AN EXTERNAL RECEIVER AND METHOD FOR READING OUT A CONSUMPTION METER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.06.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.09.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.11.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.07.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 30.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.06.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.07.2021 [2021/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Diehl Metering GmbH Industriestrasse 13 91522 Ansbach / DE | For all designated states Diehl Metering S.A.S. 67, rue du Rhône 68300 Saint-Louis / FR | [2019/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wehrhausen, Dominik Amthausstr. 16 76227 Karlsruhe-Durlach / DE | 02 /
Reuter, Christof Karlstr. 123 76137 Karlsruhe / DE | 03 /
Biergans, Lukas Georg-Friedrich-Str. 13 76131 Karlsruhe / DE | 04 /
Migendt, Arnold Hauptstrasse 156 75223 Niefern / DE | 05 /
Kuessner, Jan-Hendrik Friedrich-von-Bodelschwingh-Str. 3 37075 Göttingen / DE | 06 /
Valiallah, Serajehhosseini Klosterweg 28 K1 A306 76131 Karlsruhe / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/05] | 01 /
Wehrhausen, Dominik Amthausstr. 16 DE - 76227 Karlsruhe - Durlach / DE | ||
02 /
Reuter, Christof Karlstr. 123 DE - 76137 Karlsruhe / DE | |||
03 /
Biergans, Lukas Georg-Friedrich-Str. 13 DE - 76131 Karlsruhe / DE | |||
04 /
Migendt, Arnold Hauptstraße 156 DE - 75223 Niefern / DE | |||
05 /
Kuessner, Jan-Hendrik Friedrich-von-Bodelschwingh-Str. 3 37075 Göttingen / DE | |||
06 /
Valiallah, Serajehhosseini Klosterweg 28 K1 A306 DE - 76131 Karlsruhe / DE | Representative(s) | Diehl Patentabteilung c/o Diehl Stiftung & Co. KG Stephanstraße 49 90478 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/05] | Diehl Patentabteilung c/o Diehl Stiftung & Co. KG Stephanstrasse 49 90478 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 18000568.8 | 29.06.2018 | [2019/05] | Priority number, date | DE20171007165 | 27.07.2017 Original published format: DE102017007165 | [2019/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3435038 | Date: | 30.01.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.01.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G01D4/00 | [2019/05] | CPC: |
G01D4/006 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/34] |
Former [2019/05] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANORDNUNG UMFASSEND EINEN VERBRAUCHSZÄHLER SOWIE EINEN EXTERNEN EMPFÄNGER UND VERFAHREN ZUM AUSLESEN EINES VERBRAUCHSZÄHLERS | [2019/05] | English: | ARRANGEMENT COMPRISING A CONSUMPTION METER AND AN EXTERNAL RECEIVER AND METHOD FOR READING OUT A CONSUMPTION METER | [2019/05] | French: | DISPOSITIF COMPRENANT UN COMPTEUR DE CONSOMMATION AINSI QU'UN RÉCEPTEUR EXTERNE ET PROCÉDÉ DE LECTURE D'UN COMPTEUR DE CONSOMMATION | [2019/05] | Examination procedure | 11.07.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.07.2019 | Examination requested [2019/34] | 11.07.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.11.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.03.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.07.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.09.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.02.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/29] | 02.03.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2021/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2016076909 (KLICPERA MICHAEL EDWARD [US]) [X] 1-7,9-15 * paragraphs [042 ] - [ 192] * [I] 8; | [X]DE102005034102 (HYDROMETER GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-5,9,10,12-14 * the whole document *; | [X]EP3184967 (ELSTER SOLUTIONS GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-7,9,14 * the whole document * |