EP3587164 - SYSTEM WITH CENTRAL UNIT AND PLURALITY OF DIRECT VOLTAGE CHARGING COLUMNS FOR CHARGING ELECTRIC VEHICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2020/01] | DIRECT VOLTAGE CHARGING COLUMN FOR CHARGING AN ELECTRIC VEHICLE | ||
[2023/28] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.11.2023 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.07.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.12.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states eLoaded GmbH Feldstr. 1b 6020 Innsbruck / AT | [2020/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Steinbacher, Frank eLoaded GmbH Feldstr. 1b A-6020 Innsbruck / AT | [2020/01] | Representative(s) | Kimpfbeck, Thomas Haydstraße 2 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/01] | Kienle, Thomas Friedenstraße 1 89073 Ulm / DE | Application number, filing date | 18020275.6 | 22.06.2018 | [2020/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3587164 | Date: | 01.01.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3587164 | Date: | 20.12.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.12.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B60L3/00, B60L53/30, B60L53/31, B60L53/65, B60L53/68 | [2023/28] | CPC: |
B60L3/00 (EP,KR);
B60L53/11 (KR);
B60L53/305 (KR,US);
B60L3/04 (US);
B60L53/24 (KR);
B60L53/30 (EP);
B60L53/31 (EP,KR,US);
B60L53/65 (EP,KR,US);
B60L53/68 (EP,KR,US);
H02J7/00032 (US);
H02J7/0042 (US);
B60L2210/10 (EP,KR,US);
B60Y2200/91 (KR);
H02J2207/20 (US);
Y02T10/70 (EP);
Y02T10/7072 (EP);
Y02T10/72 (EP);
Y02T90/12 (EP,KR);
Y02T90/14 (EP);
Y02T90/16 (EP);
Y02T90/167 (EP,KR);
|
Former IPC [2020/01] | B60L3/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/01] | Title | German: | SYSTEM MIT ZENTRALEINHEIT UND MEHREREN GLEICHSPANNUNGSLADESÄULEN ZUM LADEN VON ELEKTROFAHRZUEGEN | [2023/28] | English: | SYSTEM WITH CENTRAL UNIT AND PLURALITY OF DIRECT VOLTAGE CHARGING COLUMNS FOR CHARGING ELECTRIC VEHICLES | [2023/28] | French: | SYSTÈME AVEC UNITÉ CENTRALE ET PLURALITÉ DES COLONNES DE CHARGE À COURANT CONTINU DESTINÉES À CHARGER DES VÉHICULES ÉLECTRIQUES | [2023/28] |
Former [2020/01] | GLEICHSPANNUNGSLADESÄULE ZUM LADEN EINES ELEKTROFAHRZEUGS | ||
Former [2020/01] | DIRECT VOLTAGE CHARGING COLUMN FOR CHARGING AN ELECTRIC VEHICLE | ||
Former [2020/01] | COLONNE DE CHARGE À COURANT CONTINU DESTINÉE À CHARGER UN VÉHICULE ÉLECTRIQUE | Examination procedure | 07.06.2019 | Examination requested [2020/01] | 07.06.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.12.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.04.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.08.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.02.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.05.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.07.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.11.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 13.11.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 13.11.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP23213856.0 / EP4353515 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2020 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   19.10.2020 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 20.12.2023 | HR | 20.12.2023 | RS | 20.12.2023 | GR | 21.03.2024 | IS | 20.04.2024 | [2024/32] |
Former [2024/24] | ES | 20.12.2023 | |
HR | 20.12.2023 | ||
RS | 20.12.2023 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 21.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2014084843 (PHAM THANH D [US], et al) [Y] 1-13 * abstract * * page 2 - page 5 *; | [A]EP2882066 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-13 * abstract * * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0069] *; | [Y]WO2017137234 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [Y] 1-13 * abstract * * page 5 - page 10 *; | [A]EP3321120 (ABB SCHWEIZ AG [CH]) [A] 1-13* the whole document * | Examination | JPH05276673 | WO03047904 | EP2388884 | WO2011145939 | DE102011079430 | EP2875985 | DE102014115019 | DE102015110023 | by applicant | DE102015110023 |