EP3345886 - METHOD TO FABRICATE HIGH TEMPERATURE COMPOSITE WITH INTEGRATED BARRIER COATING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.06.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.01.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 08.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RTX Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | [2023/44] |
Former [2021/12] | For all designated states Raytheon Technologies Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | ||
Former [2018/28] | For all designated states United Technologies Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAGDEFRAU, Neal 47 Kate Lane Tolland, CT Connecticut 06084 / US | 02 /
SCHMIDT, Wayde R. 7 Amberg Drive Pomfret Center, CT Connecticut 06259 / US | 03 /
SHEEDY, Paul 32 Anthony Road Bolton, CT Connecticut 06043 / US | [2018/28] | Representative(s) | Dehns 10 Old Bailey London EC4M 7NG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/28] | Dehns St. Brides House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 18150348.3 | 04.01.2018 | [2018/28] | Priority number, date | US201715400583 | 06.01.2017 Original published format: US201715400583 | [2018/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3345886 | Date: | 11.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.05.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C04B41/86, C04B41/90, C04B41/50, C03C8/14, C03C14/00, C04B41/87 | [2018/28] | CPC: |
C04B41/86 (EP,US);
C03C14/00 (EP,US);
C03C14/008 (EP,US);
C03C8/02 (US);
C03C8/14 (EP,US);
C04B35/80 (US);
C04B41/009 (EP,US);
C04B41/5022 (EP,US);
C04B41/5024 (US);
F01D5/286 (EP,US);
F01D5/288 (EP,US);
C03C2209/00 (US);
C03C2214/20 (EP,US);
C04B2235/5208 (US);
F05D2230/22 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C04B41/009, C04B35/80, C04B38/00 (EP,US);
C04B41/5022, C04B41/0072, C04B41/4521, C04B41/4539, C04B41/5025 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/09] |
Former [2018/28] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON HOCHTEMPERATURBESTÄNDIGEM VERBUNDSTOFF MIT INTEGRIERTER SPERRBESCHICHTUNG | [2018/28] | English: | METHOD TO FABRICATE HIGH TEMPERATURE COMPOSITE WITH INTEGRATED BARRIER COATING | [2018/28] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN COMPOSITE HAUTE TEMPÉRATURE AYANT UN REVÊTEMENT DE BARRIÈRE INTÉGRÉ | [2018/28] | Examination procedure | 11.01.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.01.2019 | Examination requested [2019/09] | 11.01.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.06.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.12.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.08.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 09.11.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 10.11.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 10.11.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.11.2023 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]FR2684986 (MAN TECHNOLOGIE GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-4,8,10,12-15 * example 1 * [I] 5; | [X]EP0550305 (EUROP PROPULSION [FR]) [X] 1-3,5-8,10-12,14,15 * examples 1-6 *; | [X]EP2530062 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [X] 1-3,5-8,10-12,14,15 * paragraphs [0023] , [0024] , [0027] - [0030]; claims 1-6,11-13,15 *; | [X] - M. FERRARIS ET AL, "Oxidation Protective Glass-Ceramic Coating for SiC Fibre Reinforced Glass Matrix Composites", ADVANCED ENGINEERING MATERIALS., DE, (200411), vol. 6, no. 11, doi:10.1002/adem.200400106, ISSN 1438-1656, pages 910 - 914, XP055472685 [X] 1,2,5,8,9,14,15 * "Experimental" * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/adem.200400106 |