EP3351759 - METHOD FOR THE CORRECTION OF A SHORTAGE OF AMMONIAC STORED IN A CATALYST FOR SELECTIVE CATALYTIC REACTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.06.2019 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 22.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.07.2019 [2019/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PSA Automobiles SA 2-10 Boulevard de l'Europe 78300 Poissy / FR | [2018/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BERNARD, Yoan 24 QUAI DE L'OISE 78570 ANDRESY / FR | 02 /
ZUMI, Michel 23 RUE DE NANTERRE 92600 ASNIERES SUR SEINE / FR | 03 /
MARECHAL, Patrice 101 RUE DE L'AIGLE 92250 LA GARENNE COLOMBES / FR | 04 /
HERICHON, Eliam 56 boulevard de l Evasion 95800 CERGY / FR | [2018/30] | Application number, filing date | 18150810.2 | 09.01.2018 | [2018/30] | Priority number, date | FR20170050558 | 24.01.2017 Original published format: FR 1750558 | [2018/30] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3351759 | Date: | 25.07.2018 | Language: | FR | [2018/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.04.2018 | Classification | IPC: | F01N3/08, F01N3/20, F01N9/00 | [2018/30] | CPC: |
F01N3/2066 (EP);
F01N3/0871 (EP);
F01N3/206 (EP);
F01N3/208 (EP);
F01N9/00 (EP);
F01N2240/18 (EP);
F01N2560/06 (EP);
F01N2560/14 (EP);
F01N2610/146 (EP);
F01N2900/1622 (EP);
Y02A50/20 (EP);
Y02T10/12 (EP);
Y02T10/40 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/30] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR KORREKTUR EINER MINDERMENGE AN IN EINEM KATALYSATOR FÜR SELEKTIVE KATALYTISCHE REDUKTION GESPEICHERTEM AMMONIAK | [2018/30] | English: | METHOD FOR THE CORRECTION OF A SHORTAGE OF AMMONIAC STORED IN A CATALYST FOR SELECTIVE CATALYTIC REACTION | [2018/30] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE CORRECTION D'UN DÉFICIT D'AMMONIAC STOCKÉ DANS UN CATALYSEUR D'UN SYSTÈME DE RÉDUCTION CATALYTIQUE SÉLECTIVE | [2018/30] | Examination procedure | 26.01.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/31] | 06.03.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2019/31] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2902139 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [X] 1-13 * abstract * * page 4, line 1 - page 10, line 4 * * page 10, line 21 - page 17, line 28 *; | [X]US2009049828 (WEI ZHIYONG [US], et al) [X] 1-13 * abstract * * paragraphs [0010] , [0011] , [0016] - [0018] - [0024] , [0028] , [0031] , [0037] , [0040] *; | [X]DE102008036885 (DAIMLER AG [DE]) [X] 1-13 * abstract * * paragraphs [0009] , [0013] - [0015] - [0032] - [0035] - [0037] , [0040] , [0041] *; | [X]EP2400124 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-13 * abstract ** paragraphs [0011] - [0040] - [0046] - [0102] *; | [X]DE102015103031 (GM GLOBAL TECH OPERATIONS INC [US]) [X] 1-13 * abstract * * paragraphs [0003] - [0005] - [0008] - [0018] - [0022] * |