EP3339328 - ANTI-BIOTIN ANTIBODIES AND METHODS OF USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.03.2020 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.01.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 25.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | [2018/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRINKMANN, Ulrich c/o Roche Diagnostics GmbH Nonnenwald 2 82377 Penzberg / DE | 02 /
GEORGES, Guy c/o Roche Diagnostics GmbH Nonnenwald 2 82377 Penzberg / DE | 03 /
GROTE, Michael c/o Roche Diagnostics GmbH Nonnenwald 2 82377 Penzberg / DE | 04 /
HOFFMANN, Eike c/o Roche Diagnostics GmbH Nonnenwald 2 82377 Penzberg / DE | [2018/26] | Representative(s) | Burger, Alexander, et al Roche Diagnostics GmbH Patentabteilung Nonnenwald 2 82377 Penzberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/26] | Burger, Alexander, et al Roche Diagnostics GmbH Patent Department (LPP.....6164) P.O.Box 11 52 82372 Penzberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 18150996.9 | 04.07.2013 | [2018/26] | Priority number, date | EP20120174957 | 04.07.2012 Original published format: EP 12174957 | [2018/26] | Previously filed application, date | WO2013EP64099 | 04.07.2013 | [2018/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3339328 | Date: | 27.06.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.03.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/44 | [2018/26] | CPC: |
C07K16/44 (EP,KR,RU,US);
A61K47/6801 (KR,US);
A61K47/6835 (EP,US);
C07K2299/00 (EP,KR,RU,US);
C07K2317/24 (EP,KR,RU,US);
C07K2317/31 (KR,US);
C07K2317/55 (EP,KR,RU,US);
C07K2317/56 (US);
C07K2317/565 (EP,KR,US);
C07K2317/92 (EP,KR,RU,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/08] |
Former [2018/26] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ANTI-BIOTIN-ANTIKÖRPER UND VERWENDUNGSVERFAHREN | [2018/26] | English: | ANTI-BIOTIN ANTIBODIES AND METHODS OF USE | [2018/26] | French: | ANTICORPS ANTI-BIOTINE ET PROCÉDÉS D'UTILISATION | [2018/26] | Examination procedure | 02.01.2019 | Examination requested [2019/08] | 02.01.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.04.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.10.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 06.01.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.08.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.02.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.01.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.03.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP13734999.9 / EP2870180 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 11.01.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 11.01.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 22.01.2021 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 24.04.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 24.04.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.05.2019 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 11.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 20.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 23.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]WO0050088 (MILLENNIUM PHARM INC [US]); | [YD]WO0134651 (KS BIOMEDIX LTD [GB], et al); |