EP3355069 - CLAMP SENSOR SYSTEMS AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.09.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.12.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.05.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.02.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 29.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.09.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.10.2022 [2022/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sensorlink Corporation 1360 Stonegate Way Ferndale 98248 / US | [2018/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HEFELFINGER, Kelly R. Sensorlink Corporation 1360 Stonegate Way Ferndale, WA 98248 / US | 02 /
PENDERGRASS, Robert Sensorlink Corporation 1360 Stonegate Way Ferndale, WA 98248 / US | 03 /
ROTH, Nathanial Sensorlink Corporation 1360 Stonegate Way Ferndale, WA 98248 / US | [2022/03] |
Former [2018/31] | 01 /
HEFELFINGER, Kelly R. Sensorlink Corporation 1360 Stonegate Way Ferndale, WA Washington 98248 / US | ||
02 /
PENDERGRASS, Robert Sensorlink Corporation 1360 Stonegate Way Ferndale, WA Washington 98248 / US | |||
03 /
ROTH, Nathanial Sensorlink Corporation 1360 Stonegate Way Ferndale, WA Washington 98248 / US | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/31] | Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 18151104.9 | 10.01.2018 | [2018/31] | Priority number, date | US201715402959 | 10.01.2017 Original published format: US201715402959 | [2018/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3355069 | Date: | 01.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.06.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H01R4/2483, F16B21/06, F16B2/12, G01R1/22 | [2022/02] | CPC: |
F16B21/065 (EP,US);
F16B2/065 (US);
F16B2/12 (EP,US);
G01R1/22 (EP,US);
H01R4/2483 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2018/31] | G01R1/22, B21D53/36, F16B2/12, H01R4/2483 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/11] |
Former [2018/31] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KLEMMSENSORSYSTEME UND -VERFAHREN | [2018/31] | English: | CLAMP SENSOR SYSTEMS AND METHOD | [2018/31] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉ DE CAPTEUR DE PINCE | [2018/31] | Examination procedure | 01.02.2019 | Examination requested [2019/11] | 01.02.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.05.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.05.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.11.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.12.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.05.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/41] | 24.05.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2022/41] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 09.05.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 09.05.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.05.2019 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2022 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB1396645 (SADTEM) [X] 1-20 * figures 1,2 *; | [X]GB1554103 (BICC LTD) [X] 1-20 * figure 1 *; | [X]EP0067917 (MARS ALCATEL [FR]) [X] 1-20 * abstract *; | [A]AT385154B (MOSDORFER GMBH [AT], et al) [A] 1-20* the whole document *; | [X]EP0282116 (LOVINK TERBORG BV [NL]) [X] 1-20 * figures 1,2,3,4 * |